Snyder v. Phelps et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Albert Snyder
Defendant: Fred W. Phelps, Sr., Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., Shirley L. Phelps-Roper and Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis
Case Number: 1:2006cv01389
Filed: June 5, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2010 Filing 294 USCA Record sent to the U.S. Supreme Court (Volumes 1 thru 40). (sls, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2010 Filing 293 REPLY to Response in Opposition to Bill of Costs re 292 Response filed by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Signature line of pro se defendants.)(Katz, Jonathan)
April 26, 2010 Filing 292 RESPONSE to 291 Supplemental Reply to 287 Bill of Costs, filed by Albert Snyder. (Summers, Sean) Modified on 5/3/2010 (das, Deputy Clerk).
April 8, 2010 Filing 291 RESPONSE in Support re 288 MOTION re 287 Bill of Costs, Memorandum Supporting Bill of Costs filed by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Replies due by 4/26/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A- Fourth Circuit Order., # 2 Signature page for pro se defendants., # 3 Attachment B. Articles.)(Katz, Jonathan)
November 23, 2009 Filing 290 REPLY to Response to Motion re 288 MOTION re 287 Bill of Costs, Memorandum Supporting Bill of Costs, RESPONSE in Opposition ( Replies due by 12/7/2009.) filed by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' signatures to the main document (Reply re: Bill of Costs))(Katz, Jonathan)
November 13, 2009 Filing 289 RESPONSE re 287 Bill of Costs, filed by Albert Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Albert Snyder Declaration)(Summers, Sean)
October 30, 2009 Filing 288 MEMORANDUM in support re 287 Bill of Costs, Memorandum Supporting Bill of Costs by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. Responses due by 11/16/2009 (Katz, Jonathan) Modified on 10/30/2009 (eg, Deputy Clerk).
October 30, 2009 Filing 287 BILL OF COSTS by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of uploading of bulky attachments to the Internet., # 2 Affidavit Affidavit Supporting Bill of Costs, # 3 Memorandum supporting Bill of Costs.)(Katz, Jonathan) Modified on 10/30/2009 (eg, Deputy Clerk).(ATTACHMENTS/Exhibits FILED SEPARATELY - c/s Staff Attys') (recv'd 10/30/2009)
October 30, 2009 Filing 286 NOTICE by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. Notice of Filing of Lengthy Exhibit in Support of Bill of Costs (Katz, Jonathan) Modified on 10/30/2009 (eg, Deputy Clerk). (recv'd 10/30/09 c/s to Staff Attys') Modified on 10/30/2009 (eg, Deputy Clerk).(Exhibits Filed Separately, see Document #287)
October 19, 2009 Appeal Record Returned: (Volume 1 thru 15) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER of USCA "AWARDING" costs in the amount of $16,510.80 as to 222 Notice of Appeal filed by Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Fred W. Phelps, Sr. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2009 Filing 284 MANDATE of USCA as to 222 Notice of Appeal filed by Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Fred W. Phelps, Sr. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2009 Filing 283 JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy)"REVERSING" the judgment of the District Court and "DISCHARGING" the bonds as to 222 Notice of Appeal filed by Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Fred W. Phelps, Sr. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 9/10/08. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER of USCA "DENYING" petition for rehearing en banc as to 222 Notice of Appeal filed by Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Fred W. Phelps, Sr. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER of USCA "DENYING" motion for stay penbding appeal as to 222 Notice of Appeal filed by Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Fred W. Phelps, Sr. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
May 1, 2008 Filing 279 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 278 Amended Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
May 1, 2008 Filing 278 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 270 Order by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
May 1, 2008 Filing 277 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 276 Amended Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
April 24, 2008 Filing 276 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 271 Order on Motion to Stay,, by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (Katz, Jonathan)
April 18, 2008 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 222 Notice of Appeal, (Volumes 1 thru 9 - Transcripts, Volume 10 - Pleading #10, Volume 11 - Pleading #150, Volume 12 - Pleading #182, Volume 13 - Pleading #182 & Volume 14 - Pleading #204) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
April 18, 2008 Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit -- Initial. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2008 Filing 275 NOTICE by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. re 272 Motion Hearing,, Filing of Certified Deed Copies under seal (Katz, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2008: # 1 Sealed Document by Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., # 2 Sealed Document by Fred W. Phelps). (recv'd Sealed Documents c/s to Chambers) Modified on 4/17/2008 (eg, Deputy Clerk).
April 14, 2008 Filing 274 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed to Register of Deeds on 4/11/08 re Court's 271 Order. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
April 11, 2008 Filing 273 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 4/3/08 before Judge Bennett, re 222 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2008 Filing 272 Motion Hearing held on 4/7/2008 re 214 MOTION to Stay re 212 MOTION to Stay filed by Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., Fred W. Phelps, Sr.,-arguments of counsel GRANTED as to 212 MOTION to Stay filed by Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Shirley L. Phelps-Roper -arguments of counsel- Deft. Shirley Phelps-Davis DIRECTED to post a cash bond in the amount of $125,000 and Rebeka Phelps-Davis DIRECTED to post cash bond in the in the amount of $100,000 by 5/5/08 held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (Court Reporter L. Bankins.) (ggpb, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting 214 Post-Trial Motion for Stay; ORDERED that Defendants' Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. pledge its property and Fred W. Phelps, Sr. pledge his property; ORDERED that Westboro and Phelps, Sr. forward the deeds to the Clerk of Court; ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court send certified copy of this order to the Clerk of the USDC for the District of Kansas and the Register of Deeds at the Shawnee County District Court, Kansas. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 4/7/08. (c/m to pro se). (eg Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2008: # 1 receipt) (eg, Deputy Clerk).
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER re Motion to Stay and for Cash Bond. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 4/4/08. (c/m to pro se)(eg, Deputy Clerk)
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER denying 268 Motion to Continue Hearing. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 3/31/08. (c/m to pro se) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
March 28, 2008 Filing 268 MOTION to Continue Hearing on April 3, 2008 by Albert Snyder Responses due by 4/14/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Summers, Sean)
March 27, 2008 Filing 267 NOTICE by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. re 263 Order Submission of financial information, partially under seal and partially not under seal. (Attachments: # 1 Fred Phelps Declaration, # 2 Appraisal, 1414 SW Topeka Blvd., # 3 WBC Dec., # 4 Not for Profit Corp. Annual Report, # 5 Appraisal 3701 SW 12th St.)(Katz, Jonathan) Modified on 4/2/2008 (eg, Deputy Clerk). (rec'd 4/2/08 c/s to chambers) & (rec'd Sealed Documents)
March 26, 2008 Filing 266 Submission of Financial Information by Defendant in support of MOTION to Stay pending Appeal filed by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. (c/s)(c/s Finance) (Attachments: # 1 attachment, # 2 attachment)(eg, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2008: # 3 Sealed 2002 Tax Refund Shirley Phelps-Roper, # 4 2003 Tax Refund of Shirley Phelps-Roper, # 5 2004 Tax Refund Shirley Phelps-Roper, # 6 2005 Tax Refund Shirley Phelps-Roper, # 7 2006 Tax Refund Shirley Phelps-Roper, # 8 Advantage & Home Equity Shirley Phelps-Roper) (eg, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2008: # 9 2002 Tax Refund of Phelps-Davis) (egs, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2008: # 10 2003 Tax Refund of Phelps-Davis) (egs, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2008: # 11 2004 Tax Refund of Phelps-Davis, # 12 2005 Tax Refund of Phelps-Davis) (egs, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2008: # 13 2006 Tax Refund of Phelps-Davis, # 14 Free Checking and Mortgage Statement of Phelps-Davis) (egs, Deputy Clerk). (rec'd Sealed Documents)
March 17, 2008 Filing 265 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 3/4/08 before Judge Bennett, re 222 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2008 Filing 264 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 2/21/08 before Judge Bennett, re 222 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins.(Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 263 LETTER ORDER CONFIRMING the telephone conference held on 3/4/08; Rescheduling the Motions Hearing. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 3/4/08. (c/m to pro se)(eg, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2008 Telephone Conference held on 3/4/2008 held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2008 Filing 262 Correspondence re: financial statements. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pro se defendants' letter to court.)(Katz, Jonathan)
February 26, 2008 Filing 261 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 10/15/07 before Judge Bennett, re 222 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2008 Filing 260 MEMORANDUM CONFIRMING that upon submission of the tax returns and banking information by the parties, all tax returns will be subject to the seal of this court. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 2/25/08. (c/m to pro se)(eg, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2008 Filing 259 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 9/14/07 before Judge Bennett, re 222 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2008 Filing 258 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 10/30/07 before Judge Bennett, re 222 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins.(Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2008 Filing 257 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 10/29/07 before Judge Bennett, re 222 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins.(Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2008 Filing 256 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 10/26/07 before Judge Bennett, re 222 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins.(Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2008 Filing 255 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 10/23/07 before Judge Bennett, re 222 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2008 Filing 254 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 10/22/07 before Judge Bennett, re 222 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2008 Filing 253 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 10/31/07 before Judge Bennett, re 222 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2008 Filing 252 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 10/24/07 before Judge Bennett, re 222 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2008 Filing 251 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 10/25/07 before Judge Bennett, re 222 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2008 Filing 250 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 9/12/07 before Judge Bennett, re 222 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2008 Filing 249 Transmission of Amended Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 245 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 246 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 2/21/08.(c/m to pro se defendants) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 247 LETTER ORDER CONFIRMING Telephone Conference held re Motions Hearing Scheduled for 3/6/08. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 2/21/08. (c/m)(eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 2/21/2008 (eg, Deputy Clerk).
February 21, 2008 Telephone Conference held on 2/21/2008 held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
February 20, 2008 Filing 246 MOTION for Reconsideration re 243 Order on Motion for Judgment, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment, Order on Motion for New Trial, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,,,,, by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. Responses due by 3/10/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Motion signature page., # 2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 3 Points and Authorities signature page)(Katz, Jonathan)
February 13, 2008 Filing 245 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (Katz, Jonathan)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 244 LETTER ORDER SCHEDULING Hearing re pending motions. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 2/8/08. (c/m to pro se defendants)(eg, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 211 Motion of Defendants Shirley L. Phelphs-Roper and Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis; granting in part denying in part 215 Motion of Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 2/4/08. (c/m) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 2/4/08. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2008 Filing 241 RESPONSE re 240 Supplemental Post-Trial Document of Defendants Phelps-Davis and Phelps-Roper filed by Albert Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Summers, Sean)
January 30, 2008 Filing 240 Supplement in Support of Post-Trial Motions and Attachments. (c/s to chambers w/CD) (Attachments: # 1 attachments)(eg, Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2008 USCA Case Number 08-1026 for 222 Notice of Appeal filed by Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Fred W. Phelps, Sr. Case Manager - Sarah Carmichael (sls, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2007 Filing 239 MANDATE of USCA as to 97 Interlocutory Notice of Appeal filed by Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Fred W. Phelps, Sr. (sls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 1/9/2008 (sls, Deputy Clerk).
December 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 238 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 237 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 225 Response to Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 224 Response to Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 12/18/2007. (Bennett, Richard D.)
December 18, 2007 Filing 237 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 236 Reply to Response to Motion, 235 Reply to Response to Motion by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 1/4/2008 (Katz, Jonathan)
December 18, 2007 Filing 236 REPLY to Response to Motion re 215 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for Additional Relief filed by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (Katz, Jonathan)
December 18, 2007 Filing 235 REPLY to Response to Motion re 214 MOTION to Stay re 212 MOTION to Stay filed by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Phelps-Roper Opinion)(Katz, Jonathan)
December 14, 2007 Filing 234 RESPONSE re 223 Response to Defendants Fred Phelps and Westboro Baptist Church's Objections to Bill of Costs filed by Albert Snyder. (Summers, Sean)
December 10, 2007 Filing 233 RESPONSE re 232 Supplemental Reply of Defendants Phelps-Davis and Phelps-Roper to Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Stay filed by Albert Snyder. (Summers, Sean)
December 10, 2007 Filing 232 Supplemental to 230 Reply of Defendants to Plaintiff's Response to Post-Trial Motion for Stay filed by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment# 2 Attachment 2)(c/s)(eg, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER finding as moot 89 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting as moot 94 Motion for Extension of Time; granting as moot 109 Motion to Seal; finding as moot 118 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 12/07/07. (c/m) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2007 Filing 230 REPLY of Defendants to Plaintiff's Response to Post-Trial Motion for Stay and Exhibits filed by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. (EXHIBITS FILED SEPARATELY)(c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2007 Filing 229 REPLY of Defendants to Plaintiff's Response to Post-Trial Motions filed by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. (c/s)(eg, Deputy Clerk)
December 5, 2007 Filing 228 REPLY to Response to Motion re 221 MOTION to Strike 216 Bill of Costs MOTION to Stay MOTION for Reconsideration MOTION to Strike 216 Bill of Costs filed by Albert Snyder. (Summers, Sean)
December 4, 2007 Filing 227 JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy)"DISMISSING" this appeal as to 222 Notice of Appeal filed by Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Fred W. Phelps, Sr. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
December 4, 2007 Filing 226 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 222 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices. (Attachments: # 1 Fee Letter)(sls, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2007 USCA Appeal Fees received $455 receipt number 14637021550 re 222 Notice of Appeal filed by Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Fred W. Phelps, Sr. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2007 Filing 225 RESPONSE in Opposition re 215 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for Additional Relief filed by Albert Snyder.Replies due by 12/17/2007. (Summers, Sean)
December 3, 2007 Filing 224 RESPONSE in Opposition re 214 MOTION to Stay re 212 MOTION to Stay filed by Albert Snyder.Replies due by 12/17/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Summers, Sean)
November 30, 2007 Filing 223 RESPONSE re 216 Bill of Costs filed by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (Katz, Jonathan)
November 30, 2007 Filing 222 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Appeal Record due by 12/31/2007. (Katz, Jonathan)
November 27, 2007 Filing 221 OBJECTION and MOTION to Strike 216 Bill of Costs, MOTION to Reconsider Bill of Costs or any Award of Costs, and MOTION to Stay by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, pro se and Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, pro se. (c/s) (Attachments: # 1 attachment) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
November 26, 2007 Filing 220 RESPONSE in Opposition re 211 MOTION for Judgment MOTION for Reconsideration MOTION to Alter/Amend Judgment MOTION for New Trial filed by Albert Snyder.Replies due by 12/10/2007. (Summers, Sean)
November 26, 2007 Filing 219 RESPONSE in Opposition re 212 MOTION to Stay of Defendants Phelps-Davis and Phelps-Roper filed by Albert Snyder.Replies due by 12/10/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibits In Support of Response in Opposition)(Summers, Sean)
November 16, 2007 Filing 218 BILL OF COSTS Memorandum in Suppport of Taxation of Costs by Albert Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean)
November 16, 2007 Filing 217 AFFIDAVIT re 216 Bill of Costs by Albert Snyder. (Summers, Sean)
November 16, 2007 Filing 216 BILL OF COSTS by Albert Snyder. (Summers, Sean)
November 14, 2007 Filing 215 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for Additional Relief by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 12/3/2007 (Katz, Jonathan)
November 14, 2007 Filing 214 MOTION to Stay re 212 MOTION to Stay by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 12/3/2007 (Katz, Jonathan)
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDERED that the Court's Order of 11/1/07, sealing Court Exhibit 1 be vacated and said exhibit shall be made part of the public record of this case. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 11/13/07. (c/m 11/13/07)(slf, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2007 Filing 212 POST-TRIAL MOTION to Stay by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, pro se. (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2007 Filing 211 POST-TRIAL MOTIONS, MOTION for Judgment; MOTION for Reconsideration and Hearing; MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment; MOTION for New Trial, MOTION for Relief from Judgment and/or MOTION for any Other Relief in Law and Equity Warranted Under the Facts and Law and (CD as Attachment A) by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, pro se. (CD Filed Separately)(c/s) (Attachments: # 1 Brief)(eg, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2007 Filing 210 LETTER REQUEST from The Baltimore Sun for the release of Court Exhibit #1. (rec'd 11/7/07 in chambers)(eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/8/2007 (eg, Deputy Clerk).
November 6, 2007 Filing 209 AUTHORIZATION for Juror Meal. Signed by Clerk of Court, Felicia C. Cannon on 11/6/07. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER OF JUDGMENT ENTERED in favor of Plaintiff, Albert Snyder against Defendants, Phelps et al.. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 11/2/07. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2007 Filing 207 Registry fees paid w/ check #2607 for $163.86. (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/5/2007 (eg, Deputy Clerk).(Paperless document)
November 2, 2007 Filing 206 Stipulation re: Return of exhibits to Counsel. (Document #205 refiled by Clerk to correct the docket)(eg, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2007 Filing 205 (FILED IN ERROR) Stipulation re: Return of exhibits to Counsel. (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/2/2007 (eg, Deputy Clerk).
November 2, 2007 Filing 204 Jury Notes. (FILED SEPARATELY)(eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/2/2007 (eg, Deputy Clerk).
November 2, 2007 Filing 203 PUNITIVE DAMAGES (eg, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2007 Filing 202 VERDICT SHEET. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2007 Filing 201 DEFENDANTS' EXHIBITS LIST. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2007 Filing 200 PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS LIST. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2007 Filing 199 CERTIFICATION - EXHIBITS' TO BE SUBMITTED TO JURY (eg, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2007 Filing 198 Jury Instructions. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2007 Filing 197 Court's Exhibit #1. (egs, Deputy Clerk) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2007 (egs, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 11/14/2007 (egs, Deputy Clerk). (Pleading UNSEALED, see Order of 11/9/07, pleading No 213)
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER SEALING Court's Exhibit #1. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 11/1/07. (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/13/2007 (slf, Deputy Clerk).(pleading UNSEALED, see Order of 11/9/07, pleading No 213)
October 31, 2007 Court's charge to the jury as to the punitive damages. (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2007 Closing arguments of counsel as to Punitive damages (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2007 Oral Motion by Defendants for Mis-Trial "DENIED" for reasons stated in open court before Judge Richard D Bennett. (Court Reporter L. Bankins.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2007 VERDICT: in favor of the Plaintiff against the Defendants in the amount of 2,900,000.00 (two million nine hundred thousand dollars) in compensatory damages and $ 8,000,000.00 (eight million dollars)in punitive damages for a total of $10,900,000.00(ten million nine hundred thousand dollars) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2007 The members of the Jury returned to the Bar of the Court and upon being called retired to the jury room to resume their deliberations. (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2007 Jury Trial Day 8 completed on 10/31/2007 held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (Court Reporter L. Bankins.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2007 Closing arguments of counsel. Court's charge to the jury. Verdict sheet submitted to the jury for their deliberations. Jurors were not able to agree upon their verdict at this time, therefore they were allowed to disband for the evening with instructions to return tomorrow morning at 930 am. (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2007 Jury Trial Day 7 held on 10/30/2007 held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (Court Reporter L. Bankins.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2007 Oral Motion by Defendants for Judgment as a Matter of Law renewed at the conclusion of all the evidence "DENIED" for reasons stated in open court before Judge Richard D Bennett. (Court Reporter L. Bankins.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2007 Jury Trial Day 6 held on 10/29/2007 held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (Court Reporter L. Bankins.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 195 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/23/09. (c/m)(eg, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2007 Filing 194 MOTION for Mistrial by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. Responses due by 11/15/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(eg, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2007 Filing 193 MOTION for Appropriate Relief by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 11/15/2007 (Attachments: # 1)(Katz, Jonathan)
October 26, 2007 Jury Trial Day 5 held on 10/26/2007 held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (Court Reporter L. Bankins.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2007 Oral Motion by Defendant for Judgment as a Matter of Law (FRCP50)made at the close of the Plaintiff's case "DENIED" for reasons stated in open court held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (Court Reporter L. Bankins.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2007 Jury Trial Day 4 held on 10/25/2007 held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (Court Reporter L. Bankins.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2007 Filing 192 Stipulation re: Return of exhibits to Counsel. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2007 Jury Trial Day 3 held on 10/24/2007 held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (Court Reporter L. Bankins.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2007 Jury Trial Day 2 held on 10/23/2007 held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (Court Reporter L. Bankins.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2007 Filing 191 MOTION to reconsider and standing objection by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. (c/s) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2007 Request for sequestration of witnesses by the curt. (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2007 Jury Impaneled. (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2007 Jury Trial Day 1 held on 10/22/2007 held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (Court Reporter L. Bankins.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2007 Voir Dire held on 10/22/2007 held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (Court Reporter L. Bankins.) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2007 Filing 188 RESPONSE to Motion re 174 MOTION in Limine re jury challenges filed by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2007 Filing 187 RESPONSE to Motion re 179 MOTION in Limine re various exhibits filed by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER re financial records. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/19/07. (c/m 10/22/07 jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER re expert witnesses. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/19/07. (c/m 10/22/07 jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2007 Filing 186 MEMORANDUM to Counsel and Individual Defendants. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/19/07. (Fax'd & e-mailed by Chambers 10/19/07) (mcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER denying 180 Motion of defendants to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/19/07.(c/m 10/19/07) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/19/07. (slf, Deputy Clerk) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2007 (eg, Deputy Clerk).
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER denying 182 Motion of defendants to clarify and ; denying 182 renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/19/07.(C/M 10/19/07) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2007 Filing 182 MOTION to clarify and renewed motion for summary judgment by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. Responses due by 11/5/2007 Responses due by 11/5/2007 (slf, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER GRANTING re 153 Motion of Plaintiff in Limine to Preclude Any Evidence or Testimony Concerning Sexual Issues filed by Albert Snyder. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/19/07. (c/m 10/19/07)(slf, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2007 Filing 180 MOTION to Change Venue by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 11/5/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2)(Katz, Jonathan)
October 18, 2007 Filing 179 MOTION in Limine by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 11/5/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean)
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting 175 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rees Griffiths terminated. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/17/07. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2007 Filing 177 Correspondence re: Expert Witnesses (Summers, Sean)
October 17, 2007 Filing 176 Correspondence re: Expert witnesses (Katz, Jonathan)
October 17, 2007 Filing 175 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 11/5/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean)
October 17, 2007 Filing 174 MOTION in Limine by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 11/5/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit News Release# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean)
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion of Defendants for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 126 Motion of Defendants for Summary Judgment; granting 149 Motion of Plaintiff to Exclude a Portion of Professor Balmer's Expert Report; granting 156 Motion of Plaintiff to Preclude Experts Who Have not Produced an Expert Report; denying 157 Motion of Plaintiff to Preclude a "First Amendment Defense"; declaring as moot 160 Motion of Plaintiff to Prevent Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., from Changing its Corporate Designee; denying 161 Motion of Plaintiff to Exclude References to Life Insurance and Benefits Received from the Military; granting 163 Motion of Plaintiff to Limit the Number of Fact Witnesses the Defendants are Able to Present; granting in part and denying in part 164 Defendants Motion in Limine; denying 166 Motion of Plaintiff to Exclude any Evidence Concerning Plaintiff's "Court File". Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/16/07. (mcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MARGINAL ORDER granting 170 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/16/07. (slfs, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2007 Filing 170 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Voir Dire, Jury Instructions, and Memorandum on Experts Remaining in Courtroom by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 11/2/2007 (Katz, Jonathan)
October 15, 2007 Filing 172 ADDITIONAL AUTHORITIES in support of 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2007 Filing 169 RESPONSE to 151 Motion in Limine to Preclude any Evidence or Testimony Concerning Sexual Issues filed by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis.Replies due by 10/29/2007. (c/s)(cag, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2007 Filing 168 RESPONSE to 149 MOTION in Limine to Exclude a Portion of Professor Balmer's Expert Report, 157 MOTION in Limine to Preclude a "First Amendment Defense" filed by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis.Replies due by 10/29/2007 (c/s) (cags, Deputy Clerk) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2007 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
October 15, 2007 Filing 167 RESPONSE to 154 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Dr. Blumberg from Presenting Hearsay Evidence filed by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis.Replies due by 10/29/2007. (c/s)(cag, Deputy Clerk) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2007 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
October 11, 2007 Filing 166 MOTION in Limine to Exclude any Evidence Concerning Plaintiff's "Court File" in his Divorce Action by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 10/29/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean)
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER re motions hearing. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/11/07. (c/m chambers)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2007 Filing 164 MOTION in Limine by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2007 Filing 163 MOTION in Limine to Limit the Number of Fact Witnesses the Defendants are Able to Present by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 10/29/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean)
October 10, 2007 Filing 162 (FILED IN ERROR, NOT A MOTION) MOTION in Limine to Limit the Number of Fact Witnesses Defendants are Able to Present by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 10/29/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean) Modified on 10/10/2007 (slf, Deputy Clerk).
October 9, 2007 Filing 161 MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Life Insurance and Benefits Received from the Military by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 10/26/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean)
October 8, 2007 Filing 160 MOTION in Limine to Prevent Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., from Changing its Corporate Designee by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 10/25/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean)
October 8, 2007 Filing 159 Proposed Pretrial Order submitted by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Albert Snyder, Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Exhibit List)(Summers, Sean)
October 5, 2007 Filing 158 REPLY to Response to Motion re 126 MOTION to Seal Summary Judgment Motion filed by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (Katz, Jonathan)
October 5, 2007 Filing 157 MOTION in Limine to Preclude a "First Amendment Defense" by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 10/22/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean)
October 5, 2007 Filing 156 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Experts Who Have Not Produced an Expert Report by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 10/22/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean)
October 5, 2007 Filing 155 Correspondence re: responding to pro se defendants' memo of October 2, 2007 (Summers, Sean)
October 4, 2007 Filing 154 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Dr. Blumberg from Presenting Hearsay Evidence by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 10/22/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean)
October 4, 2007 Filing 153 NOTICE by Albert Snyder of Filing Under Seal Motion in Limine to Preclude any Evidence or Testimony Concerning Sexual Issues (Summers, Sean) (SEALED DOCUMENT REC'D 10/9/07)
October 4, 2007 Filing 152 NOTICE by Albert Snyder of Filing of Document Under Seal (Report of Neil Blumberg, M.D., F.A.P.A. (Summers, Sean)(SEALED DOCUMENT REC'D 10/9/07)
October 4, 2007 Filing 151 MOTION to Seal Report of Neil Blumberg, M.D., F.A.P.A.(Exhibit A to Motion in Limine to Preclude Dr. Blumberg from Presenting Hearsay Evidence), and Motion in Limine to Preclude any Evidence or Testimony Concerning Sexual Issues by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 10/22/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean)
October 3, 2007 Closing arguments of counsel, cout's charge to the Jury, Verdict sheet submitted to the jury for their deliberations. Jurors were unable to agree upon a erdict at this time, therefore they were allowed to disband for the evening with instrustructions to return on tomorrow morning at 9:30 am. (pat, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2007 Filing 150 REPLY by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis to Plaintiff's Response to their Motion 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment; attachments and CD of St. Johns Catholic Church Walk Around July 13, 2007 (FILED SEPARATELY) (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2007 Filing 149 MOTION in Limine to Exclude a Portion of Professor Balmer's Expert Report by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 10/22/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Balmer Report# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean)
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER re: Jury questionnaire questions. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/2/07. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed jury questionnaire questions)(c/m chambers) (jnl, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/3/2007 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting 141 Motion to Seal Appendix, Pursuant to L.R. 104.13(c). Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/1/07. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2007 Filing 146 RESPONSE in Opposition re 126 MOTION to Seal Summary Judgment Motion, 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Fred Phelps and Westboro Baptist Chuch's Statement of Material Facts filed by Albert Snyder.Replies due by 10/5/2007. (Summers, Sean)
September 21, 2007 Filing 145 RESPONSE in Opposition re 126 MOTION to Seal Summary Judgment Motion, 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Response in Opposition Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendants Fred W. Phelps and Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. filed by Albert Snyder.Replies due by 10/5/2007. (Summers, Sean)
September 21, 2007 Filing 144 RESPONSE in Opposition re 76 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment, 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Phelps-Davis and Phelps-Roper's Statement of Facts filed by Albert Snyder.Replies due by 10/5/2007. (Summers, Sean)
September 21, 2007 Filing 143 RESPONSE in Opposition re 76 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment, 125 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Albert Snyder.Replies due by 10/5/2007. (Summers, Sean)
September 21, 2007 Filing 142 SEALED - NOTICE by Albert Snyder of Filing Under Seal the Appendix of Plaintiff in Support of Responses to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motions (Summers, Sean) Modified on 9/24/2007 (slf, Deputy Clerk).(rec'd 2 sealed copies 9/24/07)
September 21, 2007 Filing 141 MOTION to Seal Appendix, Pursuant to L.R. 104.13(c) by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 10/9/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean)
September 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER denying 107 Motion of defendants Westboro Baptist Church and Fred W. Phelps, Sr., for Reconsideration ; granting in part and denying in part 108 Motion for Reconsideration of defendants Shirley Phelps-Roper and Rebekan Phelps-Davis. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 9/20/07.(c/m 9/20/07) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2007 Filing 139 NOTICE/OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Proposed Questions to the Jury by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. (hml, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2007 Filing 138 NOTICE by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. Exceptions to Plaintiff's proposed jury questionnaire questions. (Katz, Jonathan)
September 13, 2007 Filing 137 NOTICE of Filing Document Under Seale re: Discovery by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis (cag, Deputy Clerk) (SEALED MATERIAL REC'D 9/14/07) Modified on 9/18/2007 (hml, Deputy Clerk).
September 13, 2007 Filing 136 NOTICE by Albert Snyder of Filing of Document Under Seal: Plaintiff's Objections to Proposed Jury Questionnaire Questions Submitted by Defendants Fred Phelps, Sr., and Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. (Summers, Sean) (Sealed Copy received 9/20/07) Modified on 9/20/2007 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
September 13, 2007 Filing 135 NOTICE by Albert Snyder of Filing of Document Under Seal -- Plaintiff's Objections to Proposed Questions for Jury Questionnaire Submitted by Defendants Phelps-Davis and Phelps-Roper (Summers, Sean) Modified on 9/20/2007 (Sealed copy received 9/20/07)(cag, Deputy Clerk).
September 12, 2007 Telephone Conference held on 9/12/2007 held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2007 Judge James K. Bredar no longer assigned to case. (hml, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER VACATING the Settlement Conference set for 9/13/07; TERMINATING the Settlement Referral to Judge Bredar; DENYING AS MOOT 129 Motion to Continue Settlement, 131 Motion to Reschedule or Strike Settlement, and 132 Amended Motion to Reschedule or Strike Settlement. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 9/12/07. (c/m to pro se parties) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2007 Filing 133 Correspondence re: Conference call (Katz, Jonathan)
September 11, 2007 Filing 132 MOTION Reschedule or strike settlement conference re 131 MOTION Reschedule or Strike Settlement Conference re 129 MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference Amendment to Motion by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 9/28/2007 (Katz, Jonathan)
September 11, 2007 Filing 131 MOTION Reschedule or Strike Settlement Conference re 129 MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 9/28/2007 (Katz, Jonathan)
September 10, 2007 Filing 130 Correspondence re: Discovery Conference 9.12.07 (Summers, Sean)
September 6, 2007 Filing 129 MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 9/24/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean)
September 4, 2007 Filing 128 MOTION for Reconsideration re 118 MOTION to Seal Reply to Opposition to Motion to Reconsider Amended Reply filed, at direction of clerk's office by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 9/21/2007 (Katz, Jonathan)
September 4, 2007 Filing 127 MOTION to Seal Proposed Jury Questionnaire by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 9/21/2007 (Katz, Jonathan)
September 4, 2007 Filing 126 MOTION to Seal Summary Judgment Motion by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 9/21/2007 (Katz, Jonathan)
September 4, 2007 Filing 125 SEALED - RENEWED MOTION for Summary Judgment & Incorporation of prior/other Summary judgment Motions & Preservation of Issue,and MOTION to Clarify Supplement to Motion for Summary Judgment by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. (file separately) Responses due by 9/21/2007 Responses due by 9/21/2007 (slf, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2007 Filing 124 Proposed Questions for Jury Questionair by Phelps-Davis & Phelps-Roper (slf, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2007 Filing 123 (SEALED) Supplemental to (76) Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis and Shirley L. Phelps-Roper. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2007 Filing 122 Paperless ORDER granting 121 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time, nunc pro tunc to 8/31/2007. (Bennett, Richard)
August 31, 2007 Filing 121 MOTION for Extension of Time to File SJ Motion and Jury Questionnaire by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 9/17/2007 (Katz, Jonathan)
August 31, 2007 Filing 120 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Seal Amended Seal Motion by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 9/17/2007 (Katz, Jonathan) Modified on 9/4/2007 (slf, Deputy Clerk).
August 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 119 LETTER ORDER scheduling a settlement conference. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 8/30/07. (c/m 8/31/07)(slf, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2007 Filing 118 MOTION to Seal Reply to Opposition to Motion to Reconsider by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 9/17/2007 (Katz, Jonathan)
August 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar for Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 8/27/07 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2007 Filing 116 STATUS REPORT by Albert Snyder. (Summers, Sean)
August 21, 2007 Filing 115 STATUS REPORT by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2007 Filing 114 STATUS REPORT Second Supplement by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (Katz, Jonathan)
August 17, 2007 Filing 113 SEALED - RESPONSE in Opposition re 107 MOTION for Reconsideration re 106 MOTION for Reconsideration Regarding Limits On Discovery Corrected MOTION for Reconsideration re 106 MOTION for Reconsideration Regarding Limits On Discovery Corrected filed by Albert Snyder.Replies due by 8/31/2007. (Summers, Sean)(rec'd 2 sealed copies 8/20/07) Modified on 8/20/2007 (slf, Deputy Clerk).
August 17, 2007 Filing 112 STATUS REPORT Supplement by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (Katz, Jonathan)
August 17, 2007 Filing 111 STATUS REPORT by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (Katz, Jonathan)
August 16, 2007 Filing 110 RESPONSE in Opposition re 108 MOTION for Reconsideration , Motion to Compel and Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline filed by Albert Snyder.Replies due by 8/30/2007. (Summers, Sean) (Sealed document rec'd 8/17/07) Modified on 8/17/2007 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
August 16, 2007 Filing 109 MOTION to Seal Responses to Motions for Reconsideration by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 9/4/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean)
August 6, 2007 Filing 108 MOTION for Reconsideration of motion to compel and motion to extend discovery deadline by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2007 Filing 107 MOTION for Reconsideration Regarding Limits On Discovery and motion to seal, Corrected by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. Responses due by 8/23/2007 (Katz, Jonathan) (Sealed documents rec'd 8/6/07) Modified on 8/6/2007 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
August 6, 2007 Filing 106 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Reconsideration Regarding Limits On Discovery by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 8/23/2007 (Katz, Jonathan) Modified on 8/6/2007 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
August 1, 2007 Filing 105 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 6/11/07 before Judge Bennett, re 97 Notice of Appeal, Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2007 Filing 104 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 5/29/07 before Judge Bennett, re 97 Notice of Appeal, Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins.(Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2007 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 2/23/07 before Judge Bennett, re 97 Notice of Appeal, Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2007 Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 1/29/07 before Judge Bennett, re 97 Notice of Appeal, Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2007 Filing 101 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 1/24/07 before Judge Bennett, re 97 Notice of Appeal, Court Reporter: Lisa Bankins. (Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2007 Telephone Conference re: discovery held on 7/30/2007 before Judge Richard D Bennett. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2007 Filing 100 Correspondence from Clerk re: ECF Warning. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2007 Filing 99 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. re 57 Notice (Other) Supplemental Expert Disclosure (Katz, Jonathan) Modified on 7/18/2007 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
July 10, 2007 Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit -- Initial (sls, Deputy Clerk)
June 29, 2007 USCA Case Number 07-6968 for 97 Notice of Appeal, filed by Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Shirley L. Phelps-Roper. Case Manager - Shirley Beasley (sls, Deputy Clerk)
June 26, 2007 Filing 98 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 97 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
June 26, 2007 Filing 97 INTERLOCUTORY NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 84 Memorandum Opinion, 85 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. Filing fee $455 Receipt #14637017919. (sls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/26/2007 (sls, Deputy Clerk).
June 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER RETURNING pleading to Rebekah Phelps-Davis and Shirley Phelps-Roper for non-compliance. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 6/26/07. (Attachments: # 1 Returned Pleading)(hml, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 92 Motion of defendants for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 6/19/07. (hml, Deputy Clerk) (c/m to pro se parties)
June 19, 2007 Filing 94 MOTION for Extension of Time for Rule 26(a)(2) Submission by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. Responses due by 7/6/2007. (hml, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2007 Filing 93 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. (THE ATTACHMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED DUE TO ERROR)(hml, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/19/2007 (hml, Deputy Clerk).
June 18, 2007 Filing 92 MOTION for Extension of Time for Relion Experts by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 7/5/2007 (Katz, Jonathan)
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 88 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 6/13/07. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
June 13, 2007 Filing 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re 88 MOTION for Reconsideration Regarding IME Lenght and Memorandum Regarding IME Scope filed by Albert Snyder.Replies due by 6/27/2007. (Summers, Sean)
June 13, 2007 Filing 89 MOTION to Amend/Correct 88 MOTION for Reconsideration Regarding IME Lenght and Memorandum Regarding IME Scope by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 7/2/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Signature page of Neil Blumberg, M.D.)(Katz, Jonathan)
June 12, 2007 Filing 88 MOTION for Reconsideration Regarding IME Lenght and Memorandum Regarding IME Scope by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 6/29/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Blumberg Declaration)(Katz, Jonathan)
June 8, 2007 Filing 87 Correspondence re: telephone conference to be held on Monday, June 11, 2007 (Summers, Sean)
June 8, 2007 Filing 86 Request for Conference (Attachments: # 1 Blumberg Declaration)(Katz, Jonathan)
June 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying 76 Motion to Dismiss; DIRECTING that Defendants' Phelps-Roper and Phelps-Davis answer within 20 days. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 6/4/07. (c/m) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 6/4/07. (c/m)(eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/5/2007 (eg, Deputy Clerk).
May 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 LETTER ORDER modifying Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 5/30/07. (c/m)(eg, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2007 Filing 82 Memo from Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis and Shirley L. Phelps-Roper re: telephone conference. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2007 Telephone Conference held on 5/29/2007 held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2007 Filing 81 Request for Conference (Summers, Sean)
May 23, 2007 Filing 80 REPLY to Response to Motion re 76 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17# 2 Exhibit 18# 3 Exhibit 19# 4 Exhibit 20# 5 Exhibit 21)(hml, Deputy Clerk)
May 17, 2007 Filing 79 NOTICE by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. re 57 Notice (Other) Supplemental Expert Disclosure (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Katz, Jonathan)
May 11, 2007 Filing 78 NOTICE by Albert Snyder re 77 Response in Opposition to Motion of Filing of Lengthy Exhibit (Summers, Sean)
May 10, 2007 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re 76 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Albert Snyder.Replies due by 5/24/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Summers, Sean)
April 24, 2007 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss, for Summary Judgment by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. and (Attachments 1 through 16 Filed Separately) (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum# 2 Affidavits & Attachments# 3 Affidavit of Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis# 4 Affidavit of Shirley L. Phelps-Roper)(eg, Deputy Clerk)
April 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying 72 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 4/17/07. (c/m to pro se) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
April 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 4/17/07. (c/m to pro se) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
April 17, 2007 Filing 73 Memorandum re 72 MOTION to Stay, 71 MOTION for Extension of Time Brief in Opposition to Motions of Defendants Phelps-Roper and Phelps-Davis, filed by Albert Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E-mail# 2 Exhibit Web page)(Summers, Sean)
April 16, 2007 Filing 72 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(eg, Deputy Clerk)
April 16, 2007 Filing 71 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Answer and Motion To Dismiss by Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum# 2 Current Address# 3 Proposed Order)(eg, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2007 Filing 70 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Shirley L. Phelps-Roper on 03-26-07, filed by Albert Snyder. (Summers, Sean)
March 30, 2007 Filing 69 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis on 03/26/07, filed by Albert Snyder. (Summers, Sean)
March 19, 2007 Filing 68 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc..(Katz, Jonathan)
February 27, 2007 Filing 67 Summons Issued 20 days as to Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis. (hml, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 PROTECTIVE/CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 2/27/07. (hml, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2007 Filing 65 STIPULATION and Request for Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material by Albert Snyder, Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (Summers, Sean)
February 23, 2007 Filing 64 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shirley L. Phelps-Roper, Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis, Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., filed by Albert Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Redline Version)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER Status Report due by 7/6/2007. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 2/23/07. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER directing defendant Fred Phelps shall appear for his scheduled deposition; granting 53 Motion of plaintiff to Amend/Correct complaint; granting 58 Motion of defendants for Extension of Time regarding expert witnesses. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 2/23/07. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2007 Telephone Conference held on 2/23/2007 held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2007 Filing 61 Correspondence re: Feb. 23 conference call. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Plaintiff Jan. 26 Stipul.# 2 Exhibit Ex. 2- Def. stipul.# 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Parties' e-mails# 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Plaintiff's circled document.)(Katz, Jonathan)
February 22, 2007 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc..Replies due by 3/8/2007. (Attachments: # 1)(Katz, Jonathan)
February 21, 2007 Filing 59 Request for Conference (Summers, Sean)
February 21, 2007 Filing 58 MOTION for Extension of Time by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 3/12/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Points and Authorities.)(Katz, Jonathan)
February 20, 2007 Filing 57 NOTICE by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. re 31 Scheduling Order Expert Disclosure (Attachments: # 1 Blumberg CV# 2 Blumberg Retainer# 3 Stout CV# 4 FredSr CV# 5 Fred, Jr, CV# 6 Brent CV)(Katz, Jonathan)
February 6, 2007 Filing 56 MANDATE of USCA as to 34 Notice of Appeal filed by Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., Fred W. Phelps, Sr. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
February 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER of USCA dismissing the appeal as to 34 Notice of Appeal filed by Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., Fred W. Phelps, Sr. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2007 Filing 54 Memorandum re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by Albert Snyder. (Summers, Sean)
February 5, 2007 Filing 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 2/22/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint# 2 Exhibit Amended Complaint# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean)
January 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 LETTER ORDER re Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 1/30/07. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2007 Telephone Conference held on 1/29/2007 held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
January 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 LETTER ORDER to Counsel re Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 1/24/07. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
January 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 LETTER ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 1/24/07. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2007 Telephone Conference held on 1/24/2007 re disputed discovery issues. held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2007 Filing 48 NOTICE by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. Certificate Regarding Discovery (Katz, Jonathan)
January 23, 2007 Filing 47 Correspondence re: Discovery conference call (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Timothy Phelps Aff. 1# 2 Affidavit Timothy Phelps Aff. 2)(Katz, Jonathan)
January 22, 2007 Filing 46 Request for Conference (Summers, Sean)
January 7, 2007 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 MOTION to Stay re 33 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Lewis v. ACS# 2 Letter to Plaintiff's counsel# 3 Phelps v. Phelps filing)(Katz, Jonathan)
January 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 38 Motion of plaintiff for Extension of Time to joint additional parties and amend the pleadings. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 12/29/06. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
December 29, 2006 Filing 43 RESPONSE to Motion re 37 MOTION to Stay re 33 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Albert Snyder.Replies due by 1/12/2007. (Summers, Sean)
December 28, 2006 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re 38 MOTION for Extension of Time For Joinder of Additional Parties and Amendment of Pleadings filed by Albert Snyder. (Summers, Sean)
December 28, 2006 USCA Case Number 06-2333 for 34 Notice of Appeal filed by Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., Fred W. Phelps, Sr. Case Manager - Jackie J. Brown (sls, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2006 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re 38 MOTION for Extension of Time For Joinder of Additional Parties and Amendment of Pleadings filed by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc..Replies due by 1/8/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Katz, Jonathan)
December 22, 2006 Filing 40 NOTICE by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. Certificate of Discovery (Katz, Jonathan)
December 22, 2006 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Support re 38 MOTION for Extension of Time For Joinder of Additional Parties and Amendment of Pleadings filed by Albert Snyder.Replies due by 1/5/2007. (Summers, Sean)
December 22, 2006 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time For Joinder of Additional Parties and Amendment of Pleadings by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 1/8/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Order)(Summers, Sean)
December 21, 2006 Filing 37 MOTION to Stay re 33 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 1/8/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities# 2 Exhibit)(Katz, Jonathan)
December 21, 2006 Filing 36 Certificate of Clerk certifying the record is complete for appeal purposes re: 34 Notice of Appeal (sls, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2006 Filing 35 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 34 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2006 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 14637013239 re 34 Notice of Appeal filed by Westboro Baptist Church, Inc., Fred W. Phelps, Sr. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2006 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 32 Memorandum Opinion, 33 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. (Katz, Jonathan) Modified on 12/21/2006 (sls, Deputy Clerk).
December 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Costs and Fees in the amount of $3150.00, jointly and severally, for the service of the summons and complaint on defendants. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 12/11/06. (hml, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 12/11/06. (hml, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 11/28/06. (Attachments: # 1 Scheduling Order) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
November 28, 2006 Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 11/28/2006 held before Judge Richard D Bennett. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2006 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc..(Katz, Jonathan)
November 20, 2006 Filing 29 NOTICE by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. Corporate Disclosure (Katz, Jonathan)
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 23 Motion of Defendants' to Dismiss; DIRECTING that Defendants' answer within 20 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/30/06. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/30/06. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2006 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (Katz, Jonathan)
October 5, 2006 Filing 25 Memorandum re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Albert Snyder. (Summers, Sean)
September 19, 2006 Filing 24 Memorandum re 20 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 4(d) in Reply to Defendants' Opposition to an Award of Costs and Fees filed by Albert Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unreported Opinion)(Summers, Sean)
September 18, 2006 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 10/5/2006 (Attachments: # 1 Points and Authorities)(Katz, Jonathan)
September 15, 2006 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 4(d) filed by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc..Replies due by 9/29/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Letter)(Katz, Jonathan)
August 29, 2006 Filing 21 Memorandum re 20 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 4(d) filed by Albert Snyder. (Summers, Sean)
August 29, 2006 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 4(d) by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 9/15/2006 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean)
August 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MARGINAL ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Fred W. Phelps, Sr and Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. answer due 9/18/2006.. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 8/23/06. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2006 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. Responses due by 9/11/2006 (Katz, Jonathan)
August 23, 2006 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Lawrence Katz on behalf of Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. (Katz, Jonathan)
August 8, 2006 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Albert Snyder. Fred W. Phelps, Sr served on 8/7/2006, answer due 8/28/2006. (Summers, Sean)
August 8, 2006 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Albert Snyder. Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. served on 8/7/2006, answer due 8/28/2006. (Summers, Sean)
August 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 12 Motion of Plaintiff for Alternative Service. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 8/2/06. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2006 Filing 13 Memorandum re 12 MOTION for Alternative Service filed by Albert Snyder. (Summers, Sean) Modified on 8/4/2006 (eg, Deputy Clerk). (rec'd 8/4/06 sent to Chambers)
August 2, 2006 Filing 12 MOTION for Alternative Service by Albert Snyder. Responses due by 8/21/2006 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Summers, Sean) Modified on 8/4/2006 (eg, Deputy Clerk). (rec'd 8/4/06 sent to Chambers)
June 9, 2006 Filing 11 (Paperless)The link to DOCUMENT #10 has been reset so that non-court users may not access it and the docket text has been modified to indicate that it was filed in error. It was filed in the wrong case (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/9/2006 (eg, Deputy Clerk).
June 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR IN WRONG CASE) ORDER SCHEDULING Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Beth P. Gesner on 6/8/06. (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/9/2006 (eg, Deputy Clerk).
June 9, 2006 Filing 9 MARGINAL ORDER granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice the admission of Rees Griffiths. Signed by Clerk on 6/7/06. (FOR DOCUMENT #9 SEE DOCUMENT #8)(eg, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2006 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice the admission of Rees Griffiths by Albert Snyder. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2006 Filing 7 MARGINAL ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice the admission of Sean C. Summers. Signed by Clerk on 6/7/06. (FOR DOCUMENT #7 SEE DOCUMENT #6) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2006 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice the admission of Sean E. Summers by Albert Snyder. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2006 Filing 5 MARGINAL ORDER granting 4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice the admission of Craig T. Trebilcock. Signed by Clerk on 6/7/06. (FOR DOCUMENT #5 SEE DOCUMENT #4) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2006 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice the admission of Craig T. Trebilcock by Albert Snyder. (eg, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2006 Filing 3 Summons Issued 20 days as to Fred W. Phelps, Sr, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.. (aap, Deputy Clerk) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2006 (aap, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 6/6/2006 (aap, Deputy Clerk).
June 5, 2006 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3, Disclosure of Corporate Interest filed by Albert Snyder. (aap, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2006 Jury Trial Demand by Albert Snyder. (aap, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fred W. Phelps, Sr, John Does, Jane Does, Westboro Baptist Church, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 paid receipt number 84637005641), filed by Albert Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aap, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder v. Phelps et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Snyder
Represented By: Paul W Minnich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred W. Phelps, Sr.
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westboro Baptist Church, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley L. Phelps-Roper
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebekah A. Phelps-Davis
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?