Johnson v. Great Windows/ Next Day Blinds
Plaintiff: Roger A. Johnson
Defendant: Great Windows/ Next Day Blinds
Case Number: 1:2009cv02069
Filed: August 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: William M Nickerson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 140 Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 2/20/13. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 11/1/12. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 108 Plaintiff's Motion for Finding of Spoliation and for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 7/11/12. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 10/3/11. (apl, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Great Windows/ Next Day Blinds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Windows/ Next Day Blinds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?