McCaffrey et al v. Apple, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Kevin McCaffrey and Linda Wrinn
Defendant: Apple, Inc. and AT&T, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv01776
Filed: June 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2010 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of California (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2010 Filing 12 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER transferring this case to the Northern District of California (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2010 Filing 11 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Entry of Transfer Order (Westman, Daniel)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MARGINAL ORDER granting 9 Unopposed Motion of Apple Inc. to Stay proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 8/18/10. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Against Defendant Apple, Inc. by Apple, Inc. Responses due by 9/7/2010 (Westman, Daniel)
August 17, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P Westman on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Westman, Daniel)
August 9, 2010 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Linda Wrinn ONLY without prejudice by Linda Wrinn Responses due by 8/26/2010 (Gilman, Charles)
August 2, 2010 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Linda Wrinn, Kevin McCaffrey as to AT&T Mobility LLC. (Ward, Daniel)
August 2, 2010 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Linda Wrinn, Kevin McCaffrey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ward, Daniel)
August 2, 2010 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Wrinn, Kevin McCaffrey. Apple, Inc. served on 7/12/2010, answer due 8/2/2010. (Ward, Daniel)
August 2, 2010 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kevin McCaffrey.(Ward, Daniel) Modified on 8/2/2010 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
July 1, 2010 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to AT&T, Inc., Apple, Inc.. (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
June 30, 2010 Jury Trial Demand by Kevin McCaffrey, Linda Wrinn. (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
June 30, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., AT&T, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0416-2585999.), filed by Linda Wrinn, Kevin McCaffrey. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Apple, Inc., # 3 Summons for AT&T, Inc.)(Ward, Daniel) Modified on 7/1/2010 (ljs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCaffrey et al v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McCaffrey
Represented By: Charles A Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Wrinn
Represented By: Charles A Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?