Price v. Atlantic Ro-Ro Carriers et al
Plaintiff: Troy D. Price, Jr.
Defendant: Atlantic Ro-Ro Carriers, Mos Shipping Co., Ltd. and Baltic Mercur Joint Stock Co.
Case Number: 1:2011cv01735
Filed: June 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: Catherine C. Blake
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/7/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/6/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake on 5/12/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake on 12/22/2014. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/18/14. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Atlantic Ro-Ro Carriers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy D. Price, Jr.
Represented By: Gerald F Gay
Represented By: Bernard J Sevel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Ro-Ro Carriers
Represented By: Kirk M Lyons
Represented By: Marios John Monopolis
Represented By: J Stephen Simms
Represented By: John Thomas Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mos Shipping Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kirk M Lyons
Represented By: Marios John Monopolis
Represented By: J Stephen Simms
Represented By: John Thomas Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltic Mercur Joint Stock Co.
Represented By: Kirk M Lyons
Represented By: Marios John Monopolis
Represented By: J Stephen Simms
Represented By: John Thomas Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?