Aeons Centro De Administracao De Empresas LTD v. Central Bank of Nigeria
Plaintiff: Aeons Centro De Administracao De Empresas LTD
Defendant: Central Bank of Nigeria
Case Number: 1:2011cv03447
Filed: November 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: 99999
Presiding Judge: Paul W. Grimm
Presiding Judge: Benson Everett Legg
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 12:1725
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Benson Everett Legg on 8/3/2012. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 MOTION to Vacate Confessed Judgment and to Dismiss Complaint (Limited Appearance Noted) filed by Central Bank of Nigeria Signed by: Judge Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm Objections to R&R due by 7/20/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/3/2012. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint against CENTRAL BANK OF NIGERIA, filed by Aeons Centro De Administracao De Empresas LTD. Objections to R&R due by 2/10/2012 Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/24/2012. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aeons Centro De Administracao De Empresas LTD v. Central Bank of Nigeria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Bank of Nigeria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aeons Centro De Administracao De Empresas LTD
Represented By: William S Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?