Neal et al v. Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.

Plaintiff: Marquis Neal and Xanthe Neal
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv03707
Filed: December 21, 2011
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: James K. Bredar
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Negotiable Instrumen
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 39 Motion to Reopen Case; denying without Prejudice 40 Defendant's Motion for Sanctions; setting date for telephonic scheduling conference. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 4/11/2013. (c/s 4/11/2013 aos, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 2/1/2013. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
April 24, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice 14 Motion by Plaintiff to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 17 MOTION by Defendant for Leave to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 4/24/2012. (aos, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal et al v. Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquis Neal
Represented By: Jason A Ostendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xanthe Neal
Represented By: Jason A Ostendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ralph John DiPietro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?