Lain v. Erickson et al
Appellee: Paul L. Erickson, Cynthia A. Plungis, Jeffrey W. Ferguson, Bruce R. Rick Grindrod, Jr., David Horrocks, Jeffrey A. Jacobson, Harry Kraemer, Jr., Robert J. Lambrix, Earl Linehan, Peter B. McMillan, Scott D. Miller, Dan K. O'Brien, James W. Pryde, Jr., Morton I. Rapoport, Sherrie L. Rovnan, Maryam Wehe, Mark R. Erickson, The Baltimore Community Foundation, Inc., William R. Brody, George Comfort, Baltimore Community Foundation, Inc., Michael J. Erickson, Scott Erickson, John C. Erickson, Nancy Erickson, Andrea Erikson Wlihelm and Craig A. Erickson
Debtor: Dan Lain
Appellant: Dan Lain
Case Number: 1:2011cv03736
Filed: December 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: William D Quarles
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 12/3/2014. (nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 12/6/13. (am2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 5/31/12. (mps, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lain v. Erickson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Paul L. Erickson
Represented By: William Paul Blackford
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Represented By: William Paul Blackford
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Cynthia A. Plungis
Represented By: William Paul Blackford
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Represented By: William Paul Blackford
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jeffrey W. Ferguson
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bruce R. Rick Grindrod, Jr.
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: David Horrocks
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jeffrey A. Jacobson
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Harry Kraemer, Jr.
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Robert J. Lambrix
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Earl Linehan
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Peter B. McMillan
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Scott D. Miller
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dan K. O'Brien
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: James W. Pryde, Jr.
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Morton I. Rapoport
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sherrie L. Rovnan
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Maryam Wehe
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mark R. Erickson
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Baltimore Community Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: William R. Brody
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: George Comfort
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Baltimore Community Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: John J Connolly
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael J. Erickson
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: John J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Scott Erickson
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: John J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John C. Erickson
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: John J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nancy Erickson
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: John J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Andrea Erikson Wlihelm
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: John J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Craig A. Erickson
Represented By: G Stewart Webb, Jr
Represented By: Richard L Wasserman
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: John J Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Dan Lain
Represented By: Harold M Walter
Represented By: Bryn Hope Sherman
Represented By: Kristin A McLaurin
Represented By: James Martin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dan Lain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?