Rangarajan v. Johns Hopkins Health System Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Mitra Rangarajan
Defendant: Johns Hopkins Health System Corp., Johns Hopkins University, Johns Hopkins Hospital, Inc. and Anthony Kalloo
Movant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2012cv01953
Filed: June 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: William M Nickerson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 6/16/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01953-WMN, 1:13-cv-03630-WMN(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 60 Motion of plaintiff for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint; the Parties shall submit a joint status report within 14 days after the scheduled settlement conference should that conference prove unsuccessful. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 4/14/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 11/21/2014. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rangarajan v. Johns Hopkins Health System Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitra Rangarajan
Represented By: David A Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johns Hopkins Health System Corp.
Represented By: Claudia Callaway
Represented By: Jennifer Baker Loeb
Represented By: Robert Thomas Smith
Represented By: Gil M Soffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johns Hopkins University
Represented By: Claudia Callaway
Represented By: Jennifer Baker Loeb
Represented By: Robert Thomas Smith
Represented By: Gil M Soffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johns Hopkins Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Claudia Callaway
Represented By: Jennifer Baker Loeb
Represented By: Robert Thomas Smith
Represented By: Gil M Soffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Kalloo
Represented By: Claudia Callaway
Represented By: Jennifer Baker Loeb
Represented By: Robert Thomas Smith
Represented By: Gil M Soffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas F Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?