Andrews et al v. Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC.

Plaintiff: Ishmael Andrews and Kyle Camp
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC.
Case Number: 1:2012cv02909
Filed: October 1, 2012
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: William M Nickerson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 10/22/2015. (ca2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2015 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 2/11/2015. (ca2s, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 7/15/14. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 31 Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint; and dismissing Count III of the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 6/28/13. (apls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews et al v. Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ishmael Andrews
Represented By: Daniel Adlai Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Camp
Represented By: Daniel Adlai Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?