General Insurance Company of America v. The Walter E. Campbell Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: General Insurance Company of America
Defendant: The Walter E. Campbell Company, Inc., The Continental Insurance Company, National Indemnity Company, Federal Insurance Company, Crum & Forster Corporation, United States Fire Insurance Company, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association Insurance Company and Property & Casualty Insurance Guaranty Corporation
Case Number: 1:2012cv03307
Filed: November 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Howard
Presiding Judge: William M Nickerson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 390 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 3/10/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 5/12/2016. (nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 5/26/2015. (nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 167 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal ; granting 177 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by Walter E. Campbell Company and Federal Insurance Company ; granting 189 MOTION for Joinder in Doc 186 Joint Motion of Defendnats Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association Insurance Company and Walter E. Campbell Company for Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 41 and For Substitution of Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(C); granting 194 MOTION to Seal Certain Portions of Reply in Support of Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 and For Substitution of Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25 (c) and Exhibits Filed in Support Thereof. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 5/14/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 113 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaims and Crossclaims; granting 114 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint against The Travelers Indemnity Company; granting 137 MOTION for Joinder in General Insurance Co. of America's Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Opposition to WECCO's Motion to Dismiss ; granting 138 MOTION for Joinder IN GENERAL INSURANCE'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO WALTER E. CAMPBELL COMPANY, INC' ;S MOTION TO DISMISS; granting 139 MOTION for Joinder in General Insurance's Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Opposition to WECCO's Motion to Dismiss; directing that the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 1/16/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 6/11/2013. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Insurance Company of America v. The Walter E. Campbell Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Benjamin Rodes Dryden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walter E. Campbell Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Continental Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crum & Forster Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property & Casualty Insurance Guaranty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?