Fyfe Co., LLC et al v. Structural Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Fyfe Co., LLC, Fibrwrap Construction Services, Inc. and Fibrwrap Construction Services USA, Inc.
Defendant: Structural Group, Inc., Jason Alexander, Mark Geraghty, Shaun Loeding and Anna Pridmore
Case Number: 1:2013cv00176
Filed: January 16, 2013
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Anne Arundel
Presiding Judge: Catherine C. Blake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2014 124 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/11/14. (mps, Deputy Clerk)
February 9, 2015 147 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER OPINION re: Plaintiffs' 145 Motion to Compel submitted in accordance with Local Rule 104.7; Denying motion as to Request for Production of Documents No. 20 and Interrogatories Nos. 25 and 26 and Found Moot as to Plaintiffs' other requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 2/9/2015. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2015 158 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 149 Motion to Strike the Untimely Expert Reports of Patrick F. Kennedy, Ph.D., and Michael Bandemer. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 3/20/2015. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2015 161 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING IN PART AS MOOT and GRANTING IN PART 148 Local Rule 104.8 Certificate. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 3/25/2015. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 5/30/13. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey on 2/10/14. (mps, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fyfe Co., LLC et al v. Structural Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fyfe Co., LLC
Represented By: Louis Joseph Cannon, Jr
Represented By: Eileen Carr Riley
Represented By: Stephen M Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fibrwrap Construction Services, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Joseph Cannon, Jr
Represented By: Eileen Carr Riley
Represented By: Stephen M Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fibrwrap Construction Services USA, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Joseph Cannon, Jr
Represented By: Eileen Carr Riley
Represented By: Stephen M Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Structural Group, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel B Chammas
Represented By: Thomas H Strong
Represented By: Ronald W Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Alexander
Represented By: Sarah K Biran
Represented By: Daniel E Farrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Geraghty
Represented By: Sarah K Biran
Represented By: Daniel E Farrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Loeding
Represented By: Sarah K Biran
Represented By: Daniel E Farrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Pridmore
Represented By: Sarah K Biran
Represented By: Daniel E Farrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.