Streiff v. Anne Arundel County Board of Education

Defendant: Anne Arundel County Board of Education
Plaintiff: Adriane Streiff
Case Number: 1:2013cv00845
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Anne Arundel
Presiding Judge: Catherine C. Blake
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/25/13. (mps, Deputy Clerk)
December 18, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake on 12/18/2014. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 20, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 47 Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake on 1/20/2015. (dass, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streiff v. Anne Arundel County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Arundel County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriane Streiff
Represented By: Hnin N Khaing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.