Cognate Bioservices, Inc. et al v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Cognate Bioservices, Inc., Healthbank, Inc., Oncocidex, Inc., Theradigm, Inc. and Vesta Therapeutics, Inc.
Defendant: Alan K. Smith and Alan Smith Consulting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01797
Filed: June 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Allegany
Presiding Judge: William D Quarles
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake on 2/27/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake on 3/10/2016. (nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 200 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Rulings on its Case Dispositive Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 9/23/2015. (nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 8/31/2015. (nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 3/17/2015. (nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Response to Request of Israeli Court for Supplemental Information Regarding Hague Convention Request. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 3/11/2015. (nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 3/11/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cognate Bioservices, Inc. et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cognate Bioservices, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Steven Fried
Represented By: John H Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthbank, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Steven Fried
Represented By: John H Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oncocidex, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Steven Fried
Represented By: John H Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theradigm, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Steven Fried
Represented By: John H Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vesta Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Steven Fried
Represented By: John H Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan K. Smith
Represented By: William W Carrier, III
Represented By: Kelly M Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Smith Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: William W Carrier, III
Represented By: Kelly M Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?