Costley v. County Wide Home Loan et al
Plaintiff: Nathaniel M. Costley, Sr.
Defendant: County Wide Home Loan, Bank of America, Green Tree Lending and Nation Star
Case Number: 1:2013cv02488
Filed: August 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Carroll
Presiding Judge: J. Frederick Motz
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/17/2018. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/20/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/5/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER setting a scheduling. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/2/2016. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Denying in all respects 48 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Scheduling telephone conference for 4/16/2015. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/9/2015. (nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER ORDER to pro se plaintiff and counsel ordering that counsel be appointed to represent defendant. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/10/2014. (c/m 1/10/2014 aos, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Costley v. County Wide Home Loan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel M. Costley, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Wide Home Loan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Lending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nation Star
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?