The Estate of Robert Ethan Saylor et al v. Regal Cinemas, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: The Estate of Robert Ethan Saylor, Patricia Saylor and Ronald Saylor
Defendant: Regal Cinemas, Inc., Richard Rochford, Scott Jewell, James Harris, Hill Management Services, Inc., Frederick County, Maryland Sheriff's Department and Frederick County, Maryland
Case Number: 1:2013cv03089
Filed: October 17, 2013
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Frederick
Presiding Judge: William M Nickerson
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order 119 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 9/9/2016. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 65 Motion to Prohibit the Carrying of Firearms and Wearing of Law Enforcement Uniforms at Depositions. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 2/26/2015. (ca2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order 48 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 10/16/2014. (bas, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Robert Ethan Saylor et al v. Regal Cinemas, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Robert Ethan Saylor
Represented By: Joseph B Espo
Represented By: Sharon Krevor Weisbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Saylor
Represented By: Joseph B Espo
Represented By: Sharon Krevor Weisbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Saylor
Represented By: Joseph B Espo
Represented By: Sharon Krevor Weisbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Cinemas, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald George Guziak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Rochford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Anthony Kozlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick County, Maryland Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick County, Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?