Shapiro v. McManus Featured Case

Plaintiff: O. John Benisek, Stephen M. Shapiro and Maria B. Pycha
Defendant: Bobby S. Mack and Linda H. Lamone
Case Number: 1:2013cv03233
Filed: November 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: James K. Bredar
Nature of Suit: State Reapportionment
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Bivens-Prisoner
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MEMORANDUM OPINION(cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MEMORANDUM Before NIEMEYER, Circuit Judge, and BREDAR and RUSSELL, District Judges.(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER directing three-judge court of Judge Niemeyer, Judge Bredar, and Judge Russell affirms the orders of Judge Bredar dated January 31, 2017, and February 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Paul V. Niemeyer on 3/13/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 144 Motion of Stephen M. Shapiro for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 2/15/2017. (c/m 2/16/17 jnls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 2/16/2017 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 118 Motion for Protective Order from Rule 30(b)(6) deposition notice by Linda H. Lamone, David J. McManus, Jr.; the notice issued by Plaintiffs under Rule 30(b)(6) is QUASHED. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 2/14/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 125 Motion to Compel Defendants Production of Documents Responsive to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production, Defendants Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, and Defendants Answers to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Admissions filed by Alonnie L. Ropp, Jeremiah DeWolf, O. John Benisek, Edmund Cueman, Sharon Strine, Kat O'Connor, Charles W. Eyler. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 2/13/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 111 Motion of plaintiffs to Compel; denying 112 Motion for Protective Order to quash non-party deposition subpoenas by Thomas V. Mike Miller, Jr, Michael E. Busch, Richard Stewart, Jeanne Hitchcock ; denying 114 Corrected Motion for Protective Order to quash non-party deposition subpoenas by Michael E. Busch, Jeanne Hitchcock, Thomas V. Mike Miller, Jr, Richard Stewart. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 1/31/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 109 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 1/27/2017. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 OPINION (filed 8/24/16) (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 4/8/14. (c/m 4/8/14 jnls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shapiro v. McManus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O. John Benisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen M. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria B. Pycha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby S. Mack
Represented By: Dan Friedman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda H. Lamone
Represented By: Dan Friedman
Represented By: Jennifer L. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?