M.T. v. Officer Craig Medley

Defendant: Annapolis Police Department, Craig Medley and The City of Annapolis
Plaintiff: M.T.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00424
Filed: February 12, 2014
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Anne Arundel
Presiding Judge: Ellen L. Hollander
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 11/19/2014. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's 11 Motion to Strike Answer; directing 12 Amended Answer is stricken; directing Defendants to file a Second Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/13/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/13/2014 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
April 9, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/9/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.T. v. Officer Craig Medley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annapolis Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Medley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Annapolis
Represented By: Gary M Elson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.T.
Represented By: Neil E Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?