Montgomery v. CSX Tranportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lou Montgomery
Defendant: CSX Tranportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01520
Filed: May 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Allegany
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 1/19/2017. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Denying 96 Motion to Strike Report and Preclude Testimony of Plaintiff Lou Montgomery's Liability Expert Witness, Craig D. Clauser, P.D. ; Granting in Part and Denying as Moot 97 Motion to Strike Report and Preclude Te stimony of Defendant Jamco Products, Inc.'s Liability Expert Witness, Dhyana Ranjan Pattanayak, Ph.D.; Granting 98 Motion in Limine to Exclude, in Part, Testimony of Plaintiff Lou Montgomery's Expert Witness Mark Lieberman, MA, CRC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 9/26/2016. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 72 Motion to Compel More Specific Answers from Defendant Jamco Products, Inc.,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 10/27/2015. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery v. CSX Tranportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Montgomery
Represented By: Lawrence Alan Katz
Represented By: Michael J Olley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Tranportation, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Alexander Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?