June v. Thomasson
Plaintiff: Vincent E. June, Jr.
Defendant: E. Thomasson
Case Number: 1:2014cv02450
Filed: July 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Anne Arundel
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/24/2017. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/20/2016. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING w/out prejudice 45 Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/6/2016. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/18/2015. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: June v. Thomasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent E. June, Jr.
Represented By: Wes Patrick Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Thomasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?