Harris v. Baltimore City Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Darrell P. Harris
Defendant: Baltimore City Police Department, Anthony W. Batts, Nathan Ulmer, 6 Unknown Polices & K9 Dog, Natalie Preston, Mayor & City Council of Baltimore City, Stephanie Rawlings-Blake, Governor & The State of Maryland and Martin O Malley
Case Number: 1:2014cv02470
Filed: August 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Extending Discovery Deadline date to November 24, 2015. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/24/2015. (c/m 9/24/15 bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Denying 67 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/17/2015. (c/m 6/18/15 bas, Deputy Clerk).
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM Denying as Moot 47 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Granting 54 Motion to Amend Complaint; Granting 55 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend and Amended Complaint; Granting 56 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/17/2015. (c/m 4/17/15 bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/25/2015. (c/m 2/25/15 bas, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Baltimore City Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore City Police Department
Represented By: Dorrell Antone Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony W. Batts
Represented By: Dorrell Antone Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Ulmer
Represented By: Merrilyn E Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6 Unknown Polices & K9 Dog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Preston
Represented By: Merrilyn E Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor & City Council of Baltimore City
Represented By: Frederic Nelson Smalkin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Rawlings-Blake
Represented By: Frederic Nelson Smalkin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor & The State of Maryland
Represented By: Elizabeth Lynn Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin O Malley
Represented By: Elizabeth Lynn Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?