Ericksen v. Kaplan Higher Education, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Karen Ericksen
Defendant: Kaplan Higher Education, LLC and TESST-KAP, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2014cv03106
Filed: October 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING 64 Motion to Vacate 62 Memorandum Order re Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/20/2016. (c/m)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM ORDER ADOPTING 58 Report and Recommendations; GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 51 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 2/22/2016. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 51 MOTION for Sanctions Defendants' Motion for Sanctions filed by TESST-KAP, L.L.C., Kaplan Higher Education, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 10/21/2015. (c/m)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ericksen v. Kaplan Higher Education, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Ericksen
Represented By: Stephen B Lebau
Represented By: Devan Michael Wae Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaplan Higher Education, LLC
Represented By: Eric Hemmendinger
Represented By: Teresa D Teare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TESST-KAP, L.L.C.
Represented By: Eric Hemmendinger
Represented By: Teresa D Teare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?