M-Edge International Corporation v. LifeWorks Technology Group LLC
Plaintiff: M-Edge International Corporation
Defendant: LifeWorks Technology Group LLC
Counter_claimant: LifeWorks Technology Group LLC
Counter_defendant: M-Edge International Corporation
Case Number: 1:2014cv03627
Filed: November 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Anne Arundel
Presiding Judge: William D Quarles
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 112 Defendant Lifeworks' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Renewed Motion to Strike Portions of the Malguarnera Expert Report; directing Plaintiff to arrange a telephone conference regarding the scheduling of further proceedings and trial. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 3/8/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 105 Motion for Reconsideration and/or to Preclude Plaintiff from Pursuing Claims of Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 8/29/2016. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 87 Motion to Strike ; denying 88 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 8/1/2016. (ca2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: Patent Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 2/16/2016. (nd2s, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M-Edge International Corporation v. LifeWorks Technology Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M-Edge International Corporation
Represented By: Brianna Lynn Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LifeWorks Technology Group LLC
Represented By: Frederick N Samuels
Represented By: Ezra Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: LifeWorks Technology Group LLC
Represented By: Frederick N Samuels
Represented By: Ezra Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: M-Edge International Corporation
Represented By: Brianna Lynn Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?