TBC, Inc. v. DEI Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
TBC, Inc. |
Defendant: |
DEI Holdings, Inc., DEI Sales, Inc., Polk Audio, Inc., Polk Audio, LLC, Boom Movement, LLC, Definitive Technology, LLC and Sound United, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv03644 |
Filed: |
November 20, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Maryland |
Office: |
Baltimore Office |
County: |
Baltimore City |
Presiding Judge: |
Catherine C. Blake |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 19, 2017 |
Filing
116
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/18/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
|
March 24, 2015 |
Filing
30
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake on 3/24/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: TBC, Inc. v. DEI Holdings, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: TBC, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Raymond F Altman |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: DEI Holdings, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Nina Basu |
Represented By: |
Samuel Blibaum |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: DEI Sales, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Nina Basu |
Represented By: |
Samuel Blibaum |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Polk Audio, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Nina Basu |
Represented By: |
Samuel Blibaum |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Polk Audio, LLC |
Represented By: |
Nina Basu |
Represented By: |
Samuel Blibaum |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Boom Movement, LLC |
Represented By: |
Nina Basu |
Represented By: |
Samuel Blibaum |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Definitive Technology, LLC |
Represented By: |
Nina Basu |
Represented By: |
Samuel Blibaum |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Sound United, LLC |
Represented By: |
Nina Basu |
Represented By: |
Samuel Blibaum |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?