CTP Innovations LLC v. EBSCO Industries Inc
Plaintiff: |
CTP Innovations LLC |
Defendant: |
EBSCO Industries Inc |
Counter_claimant: |
EBSCO Industries Inc |
Counter_defendant: |
CTP Innovations LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv03884 |
Filed: |
December 16, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Maryland |
Office: |
Baltimore Office |
County: |
88888 |
Presiding Judge: |
Marvin J. Garbis |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. § 271 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 30, 2016 |
Filing
109
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Resolving Motions in case 1:14-md-02581-MJG et al; denying as moot (343) Consolidated Motion of defendants to Dismiss under 35 U.S.C. Section 101; denying as moot (345) Consolidated Motion of defendants to Dismiss or alternative ly for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying as moot (346) 12(b)(6) Motion of defendants to Dismiss Willful Infringement; granting (354) Joint Rule 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Due to Plaintiff's Lack of Standi ng in case 1:14-md-02581-MJG; denying (130) Motion to Dismiss; denying (132) Motion to Dismiss; granting (136) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:14-cv-03894-MJG; denying (96) Motion to Dismiss; denying (99) Motion to Dismiss; granting (103) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:14-cv-03893-MJG; denying (118) Motion to Dismiss; denying (120) Motion to Dismiss; granting (124) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:14-cv-03888-MJG; denying (97) Motion to Dismiss; denying (99) Motion to Dismiss; granting (104) Mot ion to Dismiss in case 1:14-cv-03887-MJG; denying (122) Motion to Dismiss; denying (124) Motion to Dismiss; denying (125) Motion to Dismiss; granting (129) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:14-cv-03886-MJG; denying (121) Motion to Dismiss; denying (12 3) Motion to Dismiss; granting (128) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:14-cv-03890-MJG; denying (81) Motion to Dismiss; denying (83) Motion to Dismiss; denying (84) Motion to Dismiss; granting (88) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:14-cv-03884-MJG; denying (115) Motion to Dismiss; denying (117) Motion to Dismiss; denying (118) Motion to Dismiss; granting (122) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:14-cv-03889-MJG; denying (57) Motion to Dismiss; denying (59) Motion to Dismiss; denying (60) Motion to Dism iss; granting (64) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-01469-MJG; denying (56) Motion to Dismiss; denying (58) Motion to Dismiss; denying (59) Motion to Dismiss; granting (63) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-01470-MJG; denying (60) Motion to Di smiss; denying (62) Motion to Dismiss; denying (63) Motion to Dismiss; granting (67) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-01471-MJG; denying (60) Motion to Dismiss; denying (62) Motion to Dismiss; denying (63) Motion to Dismiss; granting (67) Mot ion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-01550-MJG; denying (54) Motion to Dismiss; denying (56) Motion to Dismiss; denying (57) Motion to Dismiss; granting (61) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-01646-MJG; denying (50) Motion to Dismiss; denying (52) Mo tion to Dismiss; denying (54) Motion to Dismiss; granting (58) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-01693-MJG; denying (61) Motion to Dismiss; denying (63) Motion to Dismiss; denying (64) Motion to Dismiss; granting (68) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-01692-MJG; denying (50) Motion to Dismiss; denying (52) Motion to Dismiss; denying (54) Motion to Dismiss; granting (58) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-01813-MJG; denying (45) Motion to Dismiss; denying (47) Motion to Dismiss; denyin g (48) Motion to Dismiss; granting (54) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-01807-MJG; denying (41) Motion to Dismiss; denying (44) Motion to Dismiss; denying (45) Motion to Dismiss; granting (50) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-01975-MJG; deny ing (37) Motion to Dismiss; denying (38) Motion to Dismiss; granting (42) Motion to Dismiss; denying (35) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-02016-MJG; denying (38) Motion to Dismiss; denying (40) Motion to Dismiss; denying (42) Motion to Dismi ss; granting (46) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-02052-MJG; denying (48) Motion to Dismiss; denying (50) Motion to Dismiss; denying (51) Motion to Dismiss; granting (55) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-02391-MJG; denying (59) Motion to Dis miss; denying (62) Motion to Dismiss; denying (63) Motion to Dismiss; granting (67) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-02389-MJG; granting (38) Motion to Dismiss; denying (31) Motion to Dismiss; denying (33) Motion to Dismiss; denying (34) Moti on to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-02682-MJG; denying (35) Motion to Dismiss; granting (38) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-03123-MJG; denying (45) Motion to Dismiss; denying (47) Motion to Dismiss; denying (48) Motion to Dismiss; granting (52) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-03124-MJG. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 11/29/2016. Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02581-MJG et al.(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
|
January 23, 2015 |
Filing
33
INITIAL PROCEDURAL MEMORANDUM AND ORDER in case 1:14-md-02581-MJG in case 1:14-cv-03894-MJG in case 1:14-cv-03893-MJG in case 1:14-cv-03888-MJG in case 1:14-cv-03887-MJG in case 1:14-cv-03886-MJG in case 1:14-cv-03892-MJG in case 1:14-cv-03890-MJG i n case 1:14-cv-03884-MJG in case 1:14-cv-03889-MJG; granting in part (12) Motion to Stay Pending Re-examination in case 1:14-md-02581-MJG, etc. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 1/23/2015 Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02581-MJG et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?