Under A Foot Plant, Co. v. Exterior Design, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Under A Foot Plant, Co.
Defendant: Exterior Design, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00871
Filed: March 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: James K. Bredar
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 152 Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Prejudgment Interest. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 12/14/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 123 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 8/31/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 135 Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 8/18/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 9/1/2016. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's request for judicial notice 11 is GRANTED. Defendant's motion to dismiss or transfer venue 8 is GRANTED. This case shall be transferred to the District of Maryland. See formal OPINION AND ORDER. Signed on 3/24/2015 by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Under A Foot Plant, Co. v. Exterior Design, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Under A Foot Plant, Co.
Represented By: Jan Ingham Berlage
Represented By: Michael Dell Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exterior Design, Inc.
Represented By: Charles A Arcodia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?