Dorman et al v. Anne Arundel Medical Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Sheena Dorman, Dillon Ming and B.M. |
Defendant: |
Anne Arundel Medical Center, Inc., Annapolis OB-GYN Associates, P.A. and Richard G. Welch |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv01102 |
Filed: |
April 17, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Maryland |
Office: |
Baltimore Office |
County: |
88888 |
Presiding Judge: |
Marvin J. Garbis |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 25, 2018 |
Filing
181
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 167 Defendants Richard Welch, M.D. and Annapolis OB/GYN Associates, P.A.'s Corrected Motion for Judgment. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 6/25/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
|
May 30, 2018 |
Filing
126
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: Motions in Limine denying as moot 89 Defendants' Motion in Limine; denying as moot 92 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine; denying 93 Defendants' Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice 94 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine; denying 95 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 96 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine; denying 97 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 98 Defendants' Motion in Limine;denying without prejudice 99 Defendants' Motion in Limine; denying as moot 100 Defendants' Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 103 Defendants' Omnibus Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 5/29/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
|
May 4, 2018 |
Filing
88
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 62 Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Defendant's Expert Causation Opinions; granting in part and denying in part 63 Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony on Lost Future Income and Request for H earing; denying 65 Defendants' Motion to Preclude Opinion Testimony of Robert Allen, Ph.D. and Request for Hearing; denying 67 Defendant's Motion and Supplemental Memorandum Supplying Testimony and Supporting Exclusion of Causation Opinions of Fred Duboe, M.D. and Scott Kozin, M.D.; and denying Plaintiffs' 70 request for attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 5/4/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?