Callahan et al v. Toys "R" US-Delaware, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Virginia Callahan and T.G.
Defendant: Toys "R" US-Delaware, Inc. and Pacific Cycle Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv02815
Filed: September 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Howard
Presiding Judge: James K. Bredar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 125 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 5/17/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 119 Motion to enforce the offer of judgment; denying Defendants' 121 request for sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 2/22/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part Defendants' 81 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 1/19/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 28 Motion to Strike Dr. Price's Untimely New Expert Opinions. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 5/17/2016. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callahan et al v. Toys "R" US-Delaware, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Callahan
Represented By: Francis J Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.G.
Represented By: Francis J Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toys "R" US-Delaware, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey David Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Cycle Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey David Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?