CX Reinsurance Company Limited v. Homewood Realty Inc. et al
Plaintiff: CX Reinsurance Company Limited
Defendant: Homewood Realty Inc. and Stanley E. Sugarman
Case Number: 1:2015cv03136
Filed: October 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: William M Nickerson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER GRANTING 160 Correspondence re: Requesting Court to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 9/27/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 138 Substantive legal issues CONSTRUED as a Motion having been filed by Streeter and Liles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 9/17/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER GRANTING 120 Motion of CX Re for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 3/9/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 2/21/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER DENYING 106 Motion to Deem Facts Admitted by Intervenor-Defendant Shyliyah Streeter, though Streeter is ordered to make reasonable inquiry and to amend her responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 1/31/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re: Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 4/20/2017. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING 34 Motion of Liles, Streeter, Moore and Watson to Intervene; GRANTING 36 Motion of McKnight to Intervene; DIRECTING [36-2] be docketed as an Answer and Counterclaim; DENYING AS MOOT 56 Motion of defendants for Protective Order; DIRECTING all parties to confer and submit a proposed scheduling order within 10 days. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 1/25/2017. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 47 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 11/14/2016. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CX Reinsurance Company Limited v. Homewood Realty Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CX Reinsurance Company Limited
Represented By: Stuart M G Seraina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homewood Realty Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley E. Sugarman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?