Drury v. Dziwanowski et al
Plaintiff: Edwin Drury
Defendant: P. Dziwanowski, W. Hicks and Anne Arundel County, Maryland
Case Number: 1:2015cv03845
Filed: December 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Anne Arundel
Presiding Judge: Marvin J. Garbis
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants P. Dziwanowski and W. Hick' 21 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Defendants partial summary judgment; dismissing counts IV malicious prosecution claims and V conspiracy claims; dismissing any "summary punishment" and any denial of medical treatment § 1983 claims; directing the case shall proceed on count I Battery, Count II False Arrest, Count III False Imprisonment and State and Federal Constitutional Claims set forth; setting date for Plaintiff to arrange a telephone conference to address trial scheduling. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 3/24/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying P. Dziwanowski's 18 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 8/29/2016. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Defendant Anne Arundel County, Maryland's 3 Motion to Dismiss; denying Defendants' 12 Motion to Bifurcate; setting telephone conference. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 3/15/2016. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drury v. Dziwanowski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Drury
Represented By: Anton L Iamele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Dziwanowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Arundel County, Maryland
Represented By: Philip E Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?