Dickman et al v Banner Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Richard Dickman and Kent Alderson
Defendant: Banner Life Insurance Company, Legal & General America, Inc. and Legal & General Group PLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00192
Filed: January 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: William M Nickerson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 375 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master. Signed by Frederic N. Smalkin, Special Master on 11/17/2020. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 119 Motion to Modify or Set Aside Order. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/29/2017 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/28/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CORRECTED MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 12/21/2016. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickman et al v Banner Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dickman
Represented By: Rachel Nichole Boyd
Represented By: Andrew E Brashier
Represented By: Marybeth V Gibson
Represented By: Frank H Hupfl
Represented By: Geoffrey R McDonald
Represented By: W Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Barry J Nace
Represented By: Christopher T Nace
Represented By: Justin M Sheldon
Represented By: George Walton Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Alderson
Represented By: Rachel Nichole Boyd
Represented By: Andrew E Brashier
Represented By: Marybeth V Gibson
Represented By: Frank H Hupfl
Represented By: Geoffrey R McDonald
Represented By: W Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Barry J Nace
Represented By: Christopher T Nace
Represented By: Justin M Sheldon
Represented By: George Walton Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banner Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal & General America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal & General Group PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?