Strickland-Lucas et al v. Citibank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Jowanda Strickland-Lucas and James Strickland-Lucas
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00805
Filed: March 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Harford
Presiding Judge: Ellen L. Hollander
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/18/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 7/18/17- das)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OPINION of June 8, 2017 with technical corrections for publication by West. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/8/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 7/6/17-das)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/8/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 6/9/17-das)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/29/2016. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 11/29/16-das)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strickland-Lucas et al v. Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jowanda Strickland-Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Strickland-Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?