Maryland Restorative Justice Initiative et al v. Hogan et al

Plaintiff: Maryland Restorative Justice Initiative, Calvin McNeill, Nathaniel Foster and Kenneth Tucker
Defendant: Larry Hogan, David Blumberg, Stephen Moyer and Wayne Webb
Case Number: 1:2016cv01021
Filed: April 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: Ellen L. Hollander
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 7/15/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 10/25/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 10/17/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 9/27/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/3/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/30/2016. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maryland Restorative Justice Initiative et al v. Hogan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryland Restorative Justice Initiative
Represented By: Barry J Fleishman
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin McNeill
Represented By: Barry J Fleishman
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Foster
Represented By: Barry J Fleishman
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Tucker
Represented By: Barry J Fleishman
Represented By: Deborah A Jeon
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?