Rhodes et al v. MCIC, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Esther Rhodes, Bette Rhodes Beachy, Cathy Joyce Varela, James Rhodes and Dale Rhodes
Defendant: MCIC, Inc, Uniroyal, Inc., CBS Corporation of Delaware, General Refractories, Co., E.L. Stebbings & Company, Hampshire Industries, Inc., Georgia Pacific Corporation, Foster Wheeler Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Owens-Illinois, Inc., Foseco, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, A.W. Chesterton Co., Ingersoll-Rand Co., Inc., Warren Pumps, Inc., Honeywell International Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Cutler-Hammer, Inc., General Electric Company, Pneumo Abex LLC., The A. O. Smith Corporation, GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust, Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc., Crown, Cork and Seal, Co. Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Dana Corporation, Crane Co., Foster Wheeler, LLC. and Warren Pumps, LLC
Cross_claimant: Foster Wheeler, LLC., Pneumo Abex LLC., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Crane Co., The A. O. Smith Corporation, Arvinmeritor, Inc. and A.W. Chesterton Co.
Cross_defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC., A.W. Chesterton Co., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CBS Corporation of Delaware, Certainteed Corporation, Crane Co., Crown, Cork and Seal, Co. Inc., Cutler-Hammer, Inc., Dana Corporation, E.L. Stebbings & Company, Foseco, Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation, General Electric Company, General Refractories, Co., Georgia Pacific Corporation, Hampshire Industries, Inc., Honeywell International Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Co., Inc., Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc., MCIC, Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Owens-Illinois, Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., The A. O. Smith Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Uniroyal, Inc., Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust and Warren Pumps, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv02459
Filed: June 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Carroll
Presiding Judge: James K. Bredar
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 466 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 3/7/2017. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 403 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 190 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 193 MOTION for Judgment Ingersoll-Rand Company's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 1/3/2017. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 154 Motion to Remand; setting deadline for parties to file a proposed scheduling order. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 9/29/2016. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes et al v. MCIC, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Rhodes
Represented By: Teresa Epps Cummings
Represented By: Michael Timothy Edmonds
Represented By: Peter T Nicholl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bette Rhodes Beachy
Represented By: Teresa Epps Cummings
Represented By: Michael Timothy Edmonds
Represented By: Peter T Nicholl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Joyce Varela
Represented By: Teresa Epps Cummings
Represented By: Michael Timothy Edmonds
Represented By: Peter T Nicholl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rhodes
Represented By: Teresa Epps Cummings
Represented By: Michael Timothy Edmonds
Represented By: Peter T Nicholl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Rhodes
Represented By: Teresa Epps Cummings
Represented By: Michael Timothy Edmonds
Represented By: Peter T Nicholl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCIC, Inc
Represented By: Louis E Grenzer, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Represented By: John Stewart Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation of Delaware
Represented By: Philip A Kulinski
Represented By: Clare Marie Maisano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Refractories, Co.
Represented By: John Stewart Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.L. Stebbings & Company
Represented By: Louis E Grenzer, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampshire Industries, Inc.
Represented By: David W Allen
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Represented By: Terri Lynn Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific Corporation
Represented By: Leianne S McEvoy
Represented By: Douglas B Pfeiffer
Represented By: Robin Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: Steven J Parrott
Represented By: R Thomas Radcliffe, Jr
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Richard Damon Albert
Represented By: Jamie Michelle Hertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foseco, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas B Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Thurman W Zollicoffer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience, Inc.
Represented By: Thurman W Zollicoffer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Represented By: Laura A Cellucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Co.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Bernier
Represented By: Scott J McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael Alan Brown
Represented By: Michael L Haslup
Represented By: Joshua Franklin Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Represented By: Terri Lynn Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan James Huber
Represented By: Alicia N Ritchie
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutler-Hammer, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Noorani
Represented By: Warren N Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Donald S Meringer
Represented By: David J Quigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC.
Represented By: R Thomas Radcliffe, Jr
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The A. O. Smith Corporation
Represented By: Thomas L Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation
Represented By: F Ford Loker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust
Represented By: Scott Mason Richmond
Represented By: Theodore F Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc.
Represented By: Helyna M Haussler
Represented By: Jason Richard Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown, Cork and Seal, Co. Inc.
Represented By: Scott Mason Richmond
Represented By: Theodore F Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvinmeritor, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Bernier
Represented By: Scott J McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Corporation
Represented By: Steven J Parrott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC.
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Terri Lynn Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Foster Wheeler, LLC.
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Pneumo Abex LLC.
Represented By: R Thomas Radcliffe, Jr
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: The A. O. Smith Corporation
Represented By: Thomas L Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Arvinmeritor, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Bernier
Represented By: Scott J McDowell
Represented By: Thomas Peter Bernier
Represented By: Scott J McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: A.W. Chesterton Co.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Bernier
Represented By: Scott J McDowell
Represented By: Thomas Peter Bernier
Represented By: Scott J McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC.
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: A.W. Chesterton Co.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Bernier
Represented By: Thomas Peter Bernier
Represented By: Thomas Peter Bernier
Represented By: Thomas Peter Bernier
Represented By: Thomas Peter Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Arvinmeritor, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Bernier
Represented By: Thomas Peter Bernier
Represented By: Scott J McDowell
Represented By: Thomas Peter Bernier
Represented By: Scott J McDowell
Represented By: Thomas Peter Bernier
Represented By: Scott J McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Bayer Cropscience, Inc.
Represented By: Thurman W Zollicoffer, Jr
Represented By: Thurman W Zollicoffer, Jr
Represented By: Thurman W Zollicoffer, Jr
Represented By: Thurman W Zollicoffer, Jr
Represented By: Thurman W Zollicoffer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: CBS Corporation of Delaware
Represented By: Philip A Kulinski
Represented By: Philip A Kulinski
Represented By: Philip A Kulinski
Represented By: Clare Marie Maisano
Represented By: Philip A Kulinski
Represented By: Clare Marie Maisano
Represented By: Philip A Kulinski
Represented By: Clare Marie Maisano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Represented By: Laura A Cellucci
Represented By: Laura A Cellucci
Represented By: Laura A Cellucci
Represented By: Laura A Cellucci
Represented By: Laura A Cellucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Crown, Cork and Seal, Co. Inc.
Represented By: Theodore F Roberts
Represented By: Theodore F Roberts
Represented By: Scott Mason Richmond
Represented By: Theodore F Roberts
Represented By: Scott Mason Richmond
Represented By: Theodore F Roberts
Represented By: Scott Mason Richmond
Represented By: Theodore F Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Cutler-Hammer, Inc.
Represented By: Warren N Weaver
Represented By: Warren N Weaver
Represented By: Warren N Weaver
Represented By: Warren N Weaver
Represented By: Michelle Noorani
Represented By: Warren N Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Dana Corporation
Represented By: Steven J Parrott
Represented By: Steven J Parrott
Represented By: Steven J Parrott
Represented By: Steven J Parrott
Represented By: Steven J Parrott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: E.L. Stebbings & Company
Represented By: Louis E Grenzer, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanna
Represented By: Louis E Grenzer, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanna
Represented By: Louis E Grenzer, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanna
Represented By: Louis E Grenzer, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanna
Represented By: Louis E Grenzer, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Foseco, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas B Pfeiffer
Represented By: Douglas B Pfeiffer
Represented By: Douglas B Pfeiffer
Represented By: Douglas B Pfeiffer
Represented By: Douglas B Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: Steven J Parrott
Represented By: R Thomas Radcliffe, Jr
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Represented By: Steven J Parrott
Represented By: R Thomas Radcliffe, Jr
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Represented By: Steven J Parrott
Represented By: R Thomas Radcliffe, Jr
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Represented By: Steven J Parrott
Represented By: R Thomas Radcliffe, Jr
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Represented By: Steven J Parrott
Represented By: R Thomas Radcliffe, Jr
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: GTE Products of Connecticut Corporation
Represented By: F Ford Loker, Jr
Represented By: F Ford Loker, Jr
Represented By: F Ford Loker, Jr
Represented By: F Ford Loker, Jr
Represented By: F Ford Loker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Donald S Meringer
Represented By: David J Quigg
Represented By: Donald S Meringer
Represented By: David J Quigg
Represented By: Donald S Meringer
Represented By: David J Quigg
Represented By: Donald S Meringer
Represented By: David J Quigg
Represented By: Donald S Meringer
Represented By: David J Quigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: General Refractories, Co.
Represented By: John Stewart Cobb
Represented By: John Stewart Cobb
Represented By: John Stewart Cobb
Represented By: John Stewart Cobb
Represented By: John Stewart Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Georgia Pacific Corporation
Represented By: Douglas B Pfeiffer
Represented By: Robin Silver
Represented By: Douglas B Pfeiffer
Represented By: Robin Silver
Represented By: Leianne S McEvoy
Represented By: Douglas B Pfeiffer
Represented By: Robin Silver
Represented By: Leianne S McEvoy
Represented By: Douglas B Pfeiffer
Represented By: Robin Silver
Represented By: Leianne S McEvoy
Represented By: Douglas B Pfeiffer
Represented By: Robin Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Hampshire Industries, Inc.
Represented By: David W Allen
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Represented By: David W Allen
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Represented By: David W Allen
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Represented By: David W Allen
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Represented By: David W Allen
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Wagman
Represented By: Jonathan James Huber
Represented By: Alicia N Ritchie
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Wagman
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Wagman
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Wagman
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Wagman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael Alan Brown
Represented By: Michael L Haslup
Represented By: Joshua Franklin Kahn
Represented By: Michael Alan Brown
Represented By: Michael L Haslup
Represented By: Joshua Franklin Kahn
Represented By: Michael Alan Brown
Represented By: Michael L Haslup
Represented By: Joshua Franklin Kahn
Represented By: Michael Alan Brown
Represented By: Michael L Haslup
Represented By: Joshua Franklin Kahn
Represented By: Michael Alan Brown
Represented By: Michael L Haslup
Represented By: Joshua Franklin Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc.
Represented By: Helyna M Haussler
Represented By: Jason Richard Waters
Represented By: Helyna M Haussler
Represented By: Jason Richard Waters
Represented By: Helyna M Haussler
Represented By: Jason Richard Waters
Represented By: Helyna M Haussler
Represented By: Jason Richard Waters
Represented By: Helyna M Haussler
Represented By: Jason Richard Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: MCIC, Inc
Represented By: Louis E Grenzer, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanna
Represented By: Louis E Grenzer, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanna
Represented By: Louis E Grenzer, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanna
Represented By: Louis E Grenzer, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanna
Represented By: Louis E Grenzer, Jr
Represented By: Thomas M. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Richard Damon Albert
Represented By: Richard Damon Albert
Represented By: Richard Damon Albert
Represented By: Jamie Michelle Hertz
Represented By: Richard Damon Albert
Represented By: Jamie Michelle Hertz
Represented By: Richard Damon Albert
Represented By: Jamie Michelle Hertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC.
Represented By: R Thomas Radcliffe, Jr
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Represented By: R Thomas Radcliffe, Jr
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Represented By: R Thomas Radcliffe, Jr
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Represented By: R Thomas Radcliffe, Jr
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Represented By: R Thomas Radcliffe, Jr
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Represented By: R Thomas Radcliffe, Jr
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Represented By: R Thomas Radcliffe, Jr
Represented By: Patrick C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Represented By: Neil Joseph MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The A. O. Smith Corporation
Represented By: Thomas L Doran
Represented By: Thomas L Doran
Represented By: Thomas L Doran
Represented By: Thomas L Doran
Represented By: Thomas L Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Thurman W Zollicoffer, Jr
Represented By: Thurman W Zollicoffer, Jr
Represented By: Thurman W Zollicoffer, Jr
Represented By: Thurman W Zollicoffer, Jr
Represented By: Thurman W Zollicoffer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Represented By: John Stewart Cobb
Represented By: John Stewart Cobb
Represented By: John Stewart Cobb
Represented By: John Stewart Cobb
Represented By: John Stewart Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust
Represented By: Theodore F Roberts
Represented By: Theodore F Roberts
Represented By: Scott Mason Richmond
Represented By: Theodore F Roberts
Represented By: Scott Mason Richmond
Represented By: Theodore F Roberts
Represented By: Scott Mason Richmond
Represented By: Theodore F Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Warren Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?