Kelly et al v. The Johns Hopkins University
Plaintiff: Margaret E. Kelly, Katrina Allen, Jeremiah M Daley, Jr., Treva N Boney, Tracey L McCracken, Jerrell Baker, Lourdes Cordero and Francine Lampros-Klein
Defendant: The Johns Hopkins University
Case Number: 1:2016cv02835
Filed: August 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Fees, reimbursement of expenses, and case contribution awarded to named Plaintiffs, Class Counsel, and Class Representatives. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 1/28/2010. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 51 Motion for Partial Reconsideration of 45 Order. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/13/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Johns Hopkins University's 29 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/28/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly et al v. The Johns Hopkins University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Johns Hopkins University
Represented By: Jeremy P Blumenfeld
Represented By: Melissa D Hill
Represented By: Christopher A Weals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret E. Kelly
Represented By: Gregory P Care
Represented By: Troy A Doles
Represented By: Stephen M Hoeplinger
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Jerome J Schlichter
Represented By: Kurt C Struckhoff
Represented By: Michael A Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Allen
Represented By: Gregory P Care
Represented By: Troy A Doles
Represented By: Stephen M Hoeplinger
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Jerome J Schlichter
Represented By: Kurt C Struckhoff
Represented By: Michael A Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah M Daley, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory P Care
Represented By: Troy A Doles
Represented By: Stephen M Hoeplinger
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Jerome J Schlichter
Represented By: Kurt C Struckhoff
Represented By: Michael A Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treva N Boney
Represented By: Gregory P Care
Represented By: Troy A Doles
Represented By: Stephen M Hoeplinger
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Jerome J Schlichter
Represented By: Kurt C Struckhoff
Represented By: Michael A Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey L McCracken
Represented By: Gregory P Care
Represented By: Troy A Doles
Represented By: Stephen M Hoeplinger
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Jerome J Schlichter
Represented By: Kurt C Struckhoff
Represented By: Michael A Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrell Baker
Represented By: Gregory P Care
Represented By: Troy A Doles
Represented By: Stephen M Hoeplinger
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Jerome J Schlichter
Represented By: Kurt C Struckhoff
Represented By: Michael A Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lourdes Cordero
Represented By: Gregory P Care
Represented By: Troy A Doles
Represented By: Stephen M Hoeplinger
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Jerome J Schlichter
Represented By: Kurt C Struckhoff
Represented By: Michael A Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine Lampros-Klein
Represented By: Gregory P Care
Represented By: Troy A Doles
Represented By: Stephen M Hoeplinger
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Jerome J Schlichter
Represented By: Kurt C Struckhoff
Represented By: Michael A Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?