White Marlin Open, Inc. v. Heasley et al
Plaintiff: White Marlin Open, Inc.
Defendant: Phillip G. Heasley, Jim Conway, Richard Kosztyu, Mark Hutchison, Pat Horning, Dave Arnold, Richard Hammond, Brian Leader, Daniel Stuart, Josh Sharp, Brian Russell, John Gudelsky, Hunter Pusey and J. D. Messler
Case Number: 1:2016cv03105
Filed: September 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Allegany
Presiding Judge: Richard D. Bennett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Heasely's 159 Motion to Stay this Court's Judgment; granting insofar as execution of this Court's Judgment shall be stayed; directing the Interpleaded Prize Money shall remai n in the Courts Registry pending the resolution of his appeal; denying insofar as he requests that no supersedeas bond be required; directing Heasley shall post a bond with this Court in the amount of $281,866.00 within fourteen (14)days of this Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/10/2017. (c/em finance 8/10/17-das)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/14/2017. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Mark Hutchison and Richard Kosztyu's 97 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/24/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's 89 and 90 Motions to Exclude the report and polygraph examinations of Dr. John Palmatier as set forth. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/14/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING 80 Motion for Protective Order on Post-Complaint Polygraph Information (Non-Testifying Experts) as therein set forth. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/29/2017. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/3/2017. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White Marlin Open, Inc. v. Heasley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Marlin Open, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Esham Moore
Represented By: Christopher T Woodley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip G. Heasley
Represented By: William N Erickson
Represented By: Jason M St John
Represented By: Christopher P Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kosztyu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Horning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Leader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gudelsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Pusey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. D. Messler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?