Santander Bank, NA v. Gaver et al
Plaintiff: Santander Bank, NA
Defendant: Mark Gaver, Gaver Properties, LLC, Gaver Consulting, LLC, Fawley Family Partnership and Pelican Colony Partnership, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00374
Filed: February 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Frederick
Presiding Judge: J. Frederick Motz
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 91 Motion of plaintiff for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; denying as moot 96 Motion of plaintiff for Default Judgment without prejudice; Setting Aside Clerk's Entries of Default, 69 and 73 ; denying 101 Motion of Mark Gaver for Contempt of Court. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/7/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 81 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/23/2018. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 68 Motion of Defendant Gaver Properties to Set Aside Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/30/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/28/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santander Bank, NA v. Gaver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santander Bank, NA
Represented By: Jeff E Butler
Represented By: Tonya Esposito
Represented By: Elizabeth Carlisle Overbey
Represented By: Jason N Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Gaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaver Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaver Consulting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fawley Family Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelican Colony Partnership, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?