Al-Sabah v. Agbodjogbe et al
Plaintiff: Alia Salem Al-Sabah
Defendant: Jean Agbodjogbe, Nandi A. Scott, N&A Kitchen, LLC, N&A Kitchen II, LLC, 5722 York Road, LLC, 9 Jewels, LLC and ASA Foundation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00730
Filed: March 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: Ellen L. Hollander
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 346 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/14/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 341 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/26/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 327 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/14/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/9/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/19/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/9/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/4/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/19/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/13/2020. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/3/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/30/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/17/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/3/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 4.3.19)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 1/14/2019. (c/m 1/15/19 bas, Deputy Clerk) .
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/7/2017. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/5/2017. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Sabah v. Agbodjogbe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Agbodjogbe
Represented By: David Jay Polashuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nandi A. Scott
Represented By: David Jay Polashuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N&A Kitchen, LLC
Represented By: David Jay Polashuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N&A Kitchen II, LLC
Represented By: David Jay Polashuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5722 York Road, LLC
Represented By: David Jay Polashuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9 Jewels, LLC
Represented By: David Jay Polashuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASA Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: David Jay Polashuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alia Salem Al-Sabah
Represented By: Michael B MacWilliams
Represented By: Michael Jackman Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?