Hunt Valley Baptist Church, Inc. v. Baltimore County Maryland et al
Plaintiff: Hunt Valley Baptist Church, Inc.
Defendant: Baltimore County Maryland and The Board of Appeals of Baltimore County, Maryland
Case Number: 1:2017cv00804
Filed: March 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: Ellen L. Hollander
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/10/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/17/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying 91 REQUEST by plaintiff to reopen discovery and for sanctions; Denying Alternative Request by plaintiff that Defendants be barred from making any argument or introducing evidence at trial regarding the specific topics at issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 1/16/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion of plaintiff to Quash and Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 11/5/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/6/2018. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/29/2018. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/24/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/17/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt Valley Baptist Church, Inc. v. Baltimore County Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunt Valley Baptist Church, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence E Schmidt
Represented By: Blair Lazarus Storzer
Represented By: Roman Paul Storzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Appeals of Baltimore County, Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?