Alvarez v. Magana Alvarez
Petitioner: Enedina Alvarez
Respondent: Jose Carmen Magana Alvarez
Case Number: 1:2017cv01010
Filed: April 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Frederick
Presiding Judge: Marvin J. Garbis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:11603
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re Motions in Liminedenying 36 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Respondent's Proposed Expert; denying 39 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Portions of Respondent's Article 14 Declaration. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 6/2/2017. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: COMITY Granting 26 Motion in Limine with Incorporated Memorandum of Law Requesting Order According Comity to Mexico Hague Convention Proceedings ; Denying as Moot 2 Motion to Expedite Consideration of Verified Petition for Return of Children to Mexico and Issuance of Show Cause Order. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 5/26/2017. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Granting in Part 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 5/19/2017. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez v. Magana Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jose Carmen Magana Alvarez
Represented By: Keith Ryan Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Enedina Alvarez
Represented By: Stephen John Cullen
Represented By: Leah Marie Hauser
Represented By: Kelly A Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?