Farm Fresh Direct By A Cut Above, LLC v. Steven Downey et al
Plaintiff: Farm Fresh Direct Direct by a Cut Above, LLC
Defendant: Steven Downey, Farm Fresh Direct Home Food Services, LLC, Clipper City Lending, LLC and Jessica Michele Sinsky
Case Number: 1:2017cv01760
Filed: June 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: Ellen L. Hollander
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/23/2018. (c/m 5/24/18 bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/1/2018. (c/m 5/1/18 bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/26/2017. (c/m 10/27/17 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farm Fresh Direct By A Cut Above, LLC v. Steven Downey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Fresh Direct Direct by a Cut Above, LLC
Represented By: J Stephen Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Fresh Direct Home Food Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clipper City Lending, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Michele Sinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?