Kirkwood V. Financial West Group, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: David Kirkwood
Defendant: Capital Synergy Partners, Inc., Financial West Group, Inc. and Financial West Investment Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv02005
Filed: July 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Frederick
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 79 USCA Case Number 19-2231 for #77 Notice of Appeal filed by David Kirkwood - Case Manager - Michael Radday. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 78 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #77 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEAL by David Kirkwood. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0416-8321866.(Costello, Thomas)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #68 Motion to Compel Arbitration; dismissing this case without prejudice pending the results of arbitration; closing this case. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 10/3/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2019 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 10/3/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2019 Telephone Conference held on 10/1/2019 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER confirming the results of the telephone conference call held on 10/1/2019; cancelling the trial date of 10/15/2019. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 10/1/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 73 Correspondence re: ECF No. 72 (Walsh, Brian)
June 14, 2019 Filing 72 REPLY to Response to Motion re #68 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Financial West Group, Inc., Financial West Investment Group, Inc..(Walsh, Brian)
May 30, 2019 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by David Kirkwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Costello, Thomas)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply re #68 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 5/13/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 69 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #68 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by David Kirkwood (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Holley, Matthew)
May 3, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Financial West Group, Inc., Financial West Investment Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Renewed Motion To Compel Arbitration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Eng, Kevin)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 PAPERLESS ORDER: A conference call was held with counsel today to determine whether a settlement conference should be scheduled. The parties agree that a settlement conference would not serve any purpose at this time. The parties were advised that if they find that a settlement conference would be helpful, they may contact my chambers directly for scheduling. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 4/18/2019. (Chambers)
April 18, 2019 Telephone Conference re settlement held on 4/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 PAPERLESS ORDER CONFIRMING that a telephone conference has been scheduled for Thursday, April 18, 2019 at 2:00 pm. Defendants counsel is asked to initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 4/16/2019. (Chambers)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER confirming results of telephone conference; setting due date for defendant's renewed motion to compel arbitration; directing this case will be referred back to Judge Copperthite; directing counsel and the court will hold dates for jury trial. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 4/11/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Telephone Conference held on 4/10/2019 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kams, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying without prejudice Defendant Financial West Investment Group, Inc.'s #57 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 1/30/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2019 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 1/30/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2018 Filing 62 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by Financial West Investment Group, Inc.(Eng, Kevin)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PAPERLESS ORDER. Defendants request for a continuance of the Settlement Conference is Granted. The Settlement scheduled for November 14, 2018 is Cancelled. Counsel are to Contact Chambers to reschedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 10/30/2018. (Chambers)
July 3, 2018 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Financial West Investment Group, Inc. re #59 Reply to Response to Motion (Walsh, Brian)
July 3, 2018 Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re #57 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Financial West Investment Group, Inc..(Walsh, Brian)
June 20, 2018 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by David Kirkwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Costello, Thomas)
June 6, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Financial West Investment Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Brian)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 4/9/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/6/2018. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 4/6/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2018 Telephone Conference re: Scheduling held on 4/5/2018 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kams, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2018 Filing 54 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kevin Eng. Directing attorney Kevin Eng to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 23, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kevin Eng (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7227677.) by Financial West Investment Group, Inc.(Walsh, Brian)
February 23, 2018 Filing 52 Miscellaneous correspondence to counsel advising of a conference call to discuss attached proposed schedule. (Blake, Catherine)
February 6, 2018 Filing 51 Status Report Submitted by David Kirkwood (Costello, Thomas)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PAPERLESS ORDER notifying counsel that, as requested, the settlement conference scheduled for February 5, 2018 has been cancelled and will be rescheduled after completion of discovery. Counsel are directed to contact Judge Blake's Chambers regarding issuance of a scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 1/22/2018. (Chambers)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING #40 Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction; GRANTING #23 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; CSP dismissed w/out prejudice. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/17/2017. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 17, 2017 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/17/2017. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Rescheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 11/16/2017 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 10/31/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2017 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion re #40 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction in Opposition filed by Capital Synergy Partners, Inc..(Schulman, Robert)
October 30, 2017 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Reply Memorandum filed by Capital Synergy Partners, Inc..(Schulman, Robert)
October 16, 2017 Filing 43 Miscellaneous Correspondence to counsel. (Blake, Catherine)
October 16, 2017 Filing 42 Request for Hearing re #40 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction (Costello, Thomas)
October 16, 2017 Filing 41 Memorandum re #40 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction filed by David Kirkwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Costello, Thomas)
October 16, 2017 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction by David Kirkwood (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Costello, Thomas)
October 16, 2017 Filing 39 Request for Hearing re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Costello, Thomas)
October 16, 2017 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by David Kirkwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Costello, Thomas)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for Settlement. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 10/16/2017 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2017 Filing 36 Joint Correspondence re: Scheduling (Costello, Thomas)
October 10, 2017 Telephone Conference re: Scheduling held on 10/10/2017 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2017 Filing 35 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brandon Reif. Directing attorney Brandon Reif to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2017 Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jared Ahern. Directing attorney Jared Ahern to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #31 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #23 MOTION to Dismiss . Signed by Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/26/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2017 Filing 32 Miscellaneous Correspondence to counsel advising of telephone conference to discuss attached proposed schedule. (Blake, Catherine)
September 25, 2017 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by David Kirkwood (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Costello, Thomas)
September 21, 2017 Filing 30 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Financial West Investment Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Paradox Holdings, Inc. for Financial West Investment Group, Inc..(Walsh, Brian)
September 20, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brandon S. Reif (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6900989.) by Capital Synergy Partners, Inc.(Schulman, Robert)
September 20, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jared M. Ahern (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6900925.) by Capital Synergy Partners, Inc.(Schulman, Robert)
September 20, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Ryan Schulman on behalf of Capital Synergy Partners, Inc. (Schulman, Craig)
September 20, 2017 Filing 26 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Capital Synergy Partners, Inc. (Schulman, Robert)
September 20, 2017 Filing 25 QC NOTICE re: #24 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Financial West Investment Group, Inc. ** Two Party Defendants were selected as filers to the answer. Financial West Group, Inc., was selected in error. Financial West Group, Inc. was terminated as a Party Defendant on 7/20/17. Please select only Financial West Investment Group, Inc. in the future. The Clerk has made the necessary corrections to the answer. No further Action required. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2017 Filing 24 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, Financial West Investment Group, Inc.(Walsh, Brian) Modified on 9/20/2017 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
September 20, 2017 Deficiency Notice -- Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 9/27/2017 (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Capital Synergy Partners, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulman, Robert)
September 5, 2017 Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Edward Zusman. Directing attorney Edward Zusman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/5/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2017 Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amir Tadjedin. Directing attorney Amir Tadjedin to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/5/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2017 Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ryan Probstfeld. Directing attorney Ryan Probstfeld to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/5/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2017 Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Barry S Gold. Directing attorney Barry S Gold to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/5/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint to and including September 20, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/29/2017 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edward Zusman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6856113.) by Financial West Group, Inc., Financial West Investment Group, Inc.(Walsh, Brian)
August 28, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amir Tadjedin (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6856099.) by Financial West Group, Inc., Financial West Investment Group, Inc.(Walsh, Brian)
August 28, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ryan Probstfeld (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6856096.) by Financial West Group, Inc., Financial West Investment Group, Inc.(Walsh, Brian)
August 28, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Barry Gold (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6856089.) by Financial West Group, Inc., Financial West Investment Group, Inc.(Walsh, Brian)
August 28, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Amended Complaint, by Financial West Group, Inc., Financial West Investment Group, Inc.(Walsh, Brian)
August 28, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Matthew Walsh on behalf of Financial West Investment Group, Inc. (Walsh, Brian)
August 11, 2017 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Kirkwood. Capital Synergy Partners, Inc. served on 7/31/2017, answer due 8/21/2017.(Costello, Thomas)
August 11, 2017 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Kirkwood. Financial West Investment Group, Inc. served on 7/31/2017, answer due 8/21/2017.(Costello, Thomas)
August 11, 2017 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: #7 Affidavit of Service and #8 Affidavit of Service filed by David Kirkwood were filed incorrectly. **Please re-file using the event "Summons Returned Executed" and follow the prompts so the answer deadline can be set in the system. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2017 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Capital Synergy Partners, Inc. served on Resident Agent on July 31, 2017, filed by David Kirkwood.(Costello, Thomas) Modified on 8/11/2017 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
August 10, 2017 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Financial West Investment group, Inc. served on Resident Agent on July 31, 2017, filed by David Kirkwood.(Costello, Thomas) Modified on 8/11/2017 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
July 24, 2017 Filing 6 Supplemental to #3 Amended Complaint, filed by David Kirkwood Redline Comparison Copy of First Amended Complaint (Costello, Thomas)
July 21, 2017 Filing 5 QC NOTICE re: #3 Amended Complaint, filed by David Kirkwood. The following corrective actions are needed regarding missing or incomplete information: **Redline (comparison) copy has not been filed. Please file the redline version using the civil event "supplemental" found in other filings - other documents - and link it to #3 amended complaint. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 21, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Capital Synergy Partners, Inc., Financial West Investment Group, Inc.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 20, 2017 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Kirkwood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Text of Proposed Order Amended Summons to FWG, #3 Text of Proposed Order Amended Summons to CSP)(Costello, Thomas)
July 18, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Capital Synergy Partners, Inc., Financial West Group, Inc.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6783831.), filed by David Kirkwood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Summons to Financial West Group, Inc., #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Summons to Capital Synergy Partners, Inc.)(Costello, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkwood V. Financial West Group, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Synergy Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Jared Ahern
Represented By: Robert B Schulman
Represented By: Craig Ryan Schulman
Represented By: Brandon Reif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial West Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan T Probstfeld
Represented By: Amir Tadjedin
Represented By: Barry Steven Gold
Represented By: Brian Matthew Walsh
Represented By: Kevin Eng
Represented By: Edward Zusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial West Investment Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan T Probstfeld
Represented By: Kevin Eng
Represented By: Amir Tadjedin
Represented By: Barry Steven Gold
Represented By: Brian Matthew Walsh
Represented By: Edward Zusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kirkwood
Represented By: Thomas C Costello
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?