Cunningham v. Homeside Financial LLC
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Defendant: Homeside Financial LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv02088
Filed: July 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Howard
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 227
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #35 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice; denying as moot #30 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; closing this case. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/15/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2018 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/15/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2018 Filing 41 REDACTED DOCUMENT to #38 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, by Homeside Financial LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-C, #2 Exhibit 2-A)(Colonna, Hillary)
August 28, 2018 Filing 40 REDACTED DOCUMENT to #39 Reply to Response to Motion, Exhibit 2 to Misny Declaration by Craig Cunningham(Misny, Jonathan)
August 10, 2018 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice and Memorandum in Support filed by Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jonathan P. Misny, #2 Exhibit 1 to Misny Declaration, #3 [UNREDACTED DOCUMENT] Exhibit 2 to Misny Declaration)(Misny, Jonathan) Modified on 8/28/2018 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
August 7, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. Judge Marvin J. Garbis no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 27, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice and Memorandum in Support filed by Homeside Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1-B, #4 [UNREDACTED DOCUMENT] Exhibit Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1-D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1-E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 1-F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 1-G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 1-H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 1-I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 1-J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 1-K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 1-L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 1-M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 1-N, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 1-O, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 1-P, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Q, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 1-R, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 1-S, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 1-T, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 1-U, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 1-V, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 1-W, #25 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1-Y, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Z, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 1-AA, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 1-BB, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 1-CC, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #31 [UNREDACTED DOCUMENT] Exhibit Exhibit 2-A, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 2-B, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 2-C, #34 Exhibit Exhibit 2-D, #35 Exhibit Exhibit 2-E, #36 Exhibit Exhibit 2-F)(Buckler, Patrick) Modified on 7/30/2018 (krs, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 8/28/2018 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Stay Judgment Briefing Schedule. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/17/2018. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 13, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by Homeside Financial LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Colonna, Hillary)
July 13, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice and Memorandum in Support by Craig Cunningham (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Misny, Jonathan) Modified on 7/30/2018 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
May 22, 2018 Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Matthew McCue. Directing attorney Matthew McCue to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 5/22/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew McCue (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7340769.) by Craig Cunningham (Attachments: #1 certificate of MA admission)(Ring, Stephen)
May 21, 2018 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Homeside Financial LLC.(Colonna, Hillary)
May 7, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Craig Cunningham.(Misny, Jonathan)
April 20, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Homeside Financial LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Colonna, Hillary)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 4/13/2018. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 13, 2018 Telephone Conference Call re: scheduling held on 4/12/2018 before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 4, 2018 Filing 28 STATUS REPORT by Homeside Financial LLC(Buckler, Patrick)
March 22, 2018 Filing 27 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Attachments: #1 Appendix ACA Int'l v. FCC, No 15-1211, slip op. (D.C. Cir. Mar. 16, 2018))(Buckler, Patrick)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #17 Motion to Stay Proceedings; staying case until further order. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 11/30/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion Requesting Leave of Court to Commence Discovery and Usse a Third Party Subpoena. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 11/13/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2017 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Discovery REQUESTING LEAVE OF COURT TO COMMENCE DISCOVERY AND ISSUE A THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA by Craig Cunningham (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Proposed Subpoena to Quote Logic)(Paronich, Anthony)
November 3, 2017 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Homeside Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Mark A. Greaves)(Colonna, Hillary)
November 3, 2017 Filing 22 QC NOTICE: #20 Response in Support of Motion filed by Homeside Financial LLC was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. Refile using "Reply to Response to Motion". It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE by Homeside Financial LLC of Law Firm Name Change (Buckler, Patrick)
November 3, 2017 Filing 20 [FILED IN ERROR] RESPONSE in Support re #17 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Homeside Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Mark A. Greaves)(Colonna, Hillary) Modified on 11/3/2017 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
October 20, 2017 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Chart of Retention Periods of Telecommunications Providers)(Paronich, Anthony)
October 18, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary Victoria Colonna on behalf of Homeside Financial LLC (Colonna, Hillary)
October 18, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Homeside Financial LLC (Attachments: #1 Appendix Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Buckler, Patrick)
October 18, 2017 Filing 16 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Homeside Financial LLC (Buckler, Patrick)
October 18, 2017 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Homeside Financial LLC.(Buckler, Patrick)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Consent Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Move with Respect to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 9/13/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2017 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Move with Respect to the Complaint by Homeside Financial LLC (Attachments: #1 Institutional Coordinator Letter)(Buckler, Patrick)
September 13, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick R Buckler on behalf of Homeside Financial LLC (Buckler, Patrick)
August 31, 2017 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Cunningham. Homeside Financial LLC served on 8/30/2017, answer due 9/20/2017.(Murphy, Brian)
August 15, 2017 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jonathan Misny. Directing attorney Jonathan Misny to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 11, 2017 Filing 9 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan Misny by Craig Cunningham. The fee has already been paid.(Ring, Stephen)
August 10, 2017 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Craig Cunningham needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding missing or incomplete information. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2017 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brian K Murphy. Attorney Brian K Murphy will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 8/10/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2017 Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Anthony I Paronich. Directing attorney Anthony I Paronich to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/3/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
July 27, 2017 Filing 5 -SEALED- MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan P. Misny NOT TO BE SEALED (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6802433.) by Craig Cunningham(Ring, Stephen)
July 27, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian K. Murphy (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6802431.) by Craig Cunningham(Ring, Stephen)
July 27, 2017 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anthony I. Paronich (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6802430.) by Craig Cunningham(Ring, Stephen)
July 26, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Homeside Financial LLC.(kr2, Deputy Clerk)
July 25, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT , Class Action against Homeside Financial LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6796918.), filed by Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ring, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Homeside Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Represented By: Jonathan P Misny
Represented By: Stephen Howard Ring
Represented By: Anthony I Paronich
Represented By: Matthew McCue
Represented By: Brian K Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeside Financial LLC
Represented By: Patrick R Buckler
Represented By: Hillary Victoria Colonna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?