Burrell et al v. 911 Restoration Franchise, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ms. April Burrell, 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., Mr. Donald C Burrell, Donald Burrell and April Burrell
Defendant: Mr. Idan Shpizear, 911 Restoration Franchise, Inc., Mr. Shay Kalmanovich, Mr. Peleg Lindenberg, Idan Shpizear, Peleg Lindenberg and Shay Kalmanovich
Case Number: 1:2017cv02278
Filed: August 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Howard
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Filing 27 MANDATE of USCA as to #21 Notice of Appeal filed by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell (slss, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2018 Filing 26 JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy)"Dismissing" this appeal as to #21 Notice of Appeal filed by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #24 Request to Allow Late Filed Notice of Appeal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 3/1/2018. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2018 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 14637104422 re #21 Notice of Appeal filed by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell (slss, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time FOR Appeal by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell (Attachments: #1 Affidavit OF COUNSEL)(Rifkin, Harry)
January 16, 2018 Filing 23 USCA Case Number 18-1055 for #21 Notice of Appeal filed by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell. Case Manager - Emily Borneisen (slss, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2017 Filing 22 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #21 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEAL by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell.(Fee Status: Filing Fee Not Paid) (Rifkin, Harry) Modified on 3/5/2018 (slss, Deputy Clerk).
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Defendants' motion, construed as a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(1) and to compel arbitration; dismissing and closing the case. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 11/16/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 17, 2017 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 11/16/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2017 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 911 Restoration Franchise, Inc., Peleg Lindenberg, Idan Shpizear.(Maneche, Mark)
October 12, 2017 Filing 17 Supplemental to #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell (Rifkin, Harry)
October 12, 2017 Filing 16 QC NOTICE: #15 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell, #14 Response in Support of Motion filed by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect events used. Refile using the Supplemental event and link to Response in Opposition. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2017 Filing 15 [FILED IN ERROR] RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Supplemental filed by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell.(Rifkin, Harry) Modified on 10/17/2017 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
October 9, 2017 Filing 14 [FILED IN ERROR] RESPONSE in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Supplemental filed by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell.(Rifkin, Harry) Modified on 10/17/2017 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
October 2, 2017 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 cover page, #2 Exhibit 1 Consent Order, #3 Exhibit 2)(Rifkin, Harry)
October 2, 2017 Filing 12 (FILED IN ERROR: re-filed as ECF#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 cover page, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rifkin, Harry) Modified on 10/3/2017 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
September 19, 2017 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by 911 Restoration Franchise, Inc. Corporate afiliate Milestone SEO, Inc as to 911 Restoration Franchise, Inc. Corporate (Maneche, Mark) Modified on 9/20/2017 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
September 15, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by 911 Restoration Franchise, Inc., Peleg Lindenberg, Idan Shpizear (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Maneche, Mark)
September 15, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D Maneche on behalf of 911 Restoration Franchise, Inc., Peleg Lindenberg, Idan Shpizear (Maneche, Mark)
August 14, 2017 Filing 8 Summons Issued 21 days as to 911 Restoration Franchise, Inc., Shay Kalmanovich, Peleg Lindenberg, Idan Shpizear.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2017 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell (Rifkin, Harry)
August 10, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell re #1 Complaint, #5 Notice (Other), #3 Notice (Other), #4 Notice (Other) proposed summons on Shay Kalmonovich (Rifkin, Harry)
August 10, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell re #1 Complaint, #3 Notice (Other), #4 Notice (Other) proposed summons on Peleg Lindenberg (Rifkin, Harry)
August 10, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell re #1 Complaint, #3 Notice (Other) proposed summons on Idan Shpizear (Rifkin, Harry)
August 10, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell re #1 Complaint proposed summons on 911 Restoration Franchise, Inc. (Rifkin, Harry)
August 10, 2017 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell, Donald Burrell was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed summonses. To correct this problem, file Proposed summonses using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed summonses to #1 . (kr2, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2017 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. Please file the statement using the event "Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement" located under "Other Documents" and enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. The Statement must be filed by 8/17/2017 (kr2, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6823281.), filed by Donald C Burrell, 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc., April Burrell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rifkin, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burrell et al v. 911 Restoration Franchise, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. April Burrell
Represented By: Harry M Rifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 911 Restoration of Baltimore, Inc.
Represented By: Harry M Rifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Donald C Burrell
Represented By: Harry M Rifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Burrell
Represented By: Harry M Rifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Burrell
Represented By: Harry M Rifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Idan Shpizear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 911 Restoration Franchise, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D Maneche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Shay Kalmanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Peleg Lindenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idan Shpizear
Represented By: Mark D Maneche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peleg Lindenberg
Represented By: Mark D Maneche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shay Kalmanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?