Smith et al v. Westminster Management, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tenae Smith and Howard Smith
Defendant: Westminster Management, LLC, JK2 Westminster, LLC, Carroll Park Holdings, LLC and Dutch Village, LLC
Intervenor: The Baltimore Sun, The Washington Post and ProPublica
Case Number: 1:2017cv03282
Filed: November 7, 2017
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: James K. Bredar
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2018 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 2/13/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
January 26, 2018 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 21 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Removal Statement Under Seal And For Confidentiality Order; and granting 31 the Media Intervenors' Motion to Intervene. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/26/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 1/26/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
January 11, 2018 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/11/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Westminster Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tenae Smith
Represented By: Andrew David Freeman
Represented By: Charles Matthew Hill
Represented By: Chelsea Ortega
Represented By: Jane Santoni
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Vocci
Represented By: Jean Mary Zachariasiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Smith
Represented By: Andrew David Freeman
Represented By: Charles Matthew Hill
Represented By: Chelsea Ortega
Represented By: Jane Santoni
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Vocci
Represented By: Jean Mary Zachariasiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westminster Management, LLC
Represented By: Cynthia L Maskol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JK2 Westminster, LLC
Represented By: Cynthia L Maskol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carroll Park Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Cynthia L Maskol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dutch Village, LLC
Represented By: Cynthia L Maskol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: The Baltimore Sun
Represented By: Lisa Beth Zycherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: The Washington Post
Represented By: Lisa Beth Zycherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ProPublica
Represented By: Lisa Beth Zycherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?