Godwin v. Piepszak et al

Plaintiff: Paul Godwin
Defendant: Jennifer Piepszak and Chase Card
Case Number: 1:2017cv03575
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Anne Arundel
Presiding Judge: James K. Bredar
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Defendant's 16 Motion to Dismiss; closing case. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/9/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 7/10/18-das)
April 11, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER directing Clerk shall amend 13 Amended Complaint to be reflected as a Supplemental Complaint; terminating Jennifer Piepszak as a party in the case; setting deadline for Plaintiff to file UNDER SEAL a copy of his Experian cred it report and to mail a copy to counsel for Defendant Chase Bank at address therein; directing Defendant shall treat Plaintiff's credit report as confidential; setting deadline for Defendant to file response to complaint and supplemental complaint. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 4/10/2018. (c/m 4/11/18-das)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Chase Bank's 9 Motion for More Definite Statement; setting deadline for Plaintiff to file amended complaint as directed; directing clerk shall amend docket to reflect the correct name of the corporate entity sued is Chase Bank USA, N.A. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 2/20/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 2/21/18-das)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godwin v. Piepszak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Piepszak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Card
Represented By: Edward Hutchinson Robbins, Jr
Represented By: Zachary Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?