State of Maryland v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Defendant: Cumberland Farms, Inc., Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Chevron Corporation, Sun Company, Inc., PJSC Lukoil, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., Getty Petroleum Marketing Inc., The Premcor Refining Group Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, Texaco Inc., BP America Inc., Kinder Morgan Transmix Company, LLC, Western Refining Yorktown, Inc., NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P., El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Sheetz, Inc., Lukoil Americas Corporation, Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P., Vitol S.A., Marathon Petroleum Corporation, ConocoPhillips Company, TOTAL Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc., Hess Corporation, Wawa, Inc., Lukoil Pan America, LLC, Mobile Corporation, Getty Properties Corp., Shell Oil Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., TRMI-H LLC, Gulf Oil Limited Partnership, BP Products North America Inc., Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. A, Valero Energy Corporation, Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, ETP Holdco Corporation, Valero Refining and Marketing Company, CITGO Petroleum Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Holtzman Oil Corporation, Atlantic Richfield Company, Transmontaigne Product Services, LLC, Guttman Energy, Inc., Lukoil North America LLC, Apex Oil Company, Inc., Premcor USA Inc., George E. Warren Corporation, Phillips 66 Company, TMR Company, 7-Eleven, Inc., Marathon Oil Corporation, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Astra Oil Company, LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Shell Trading (US) Company, Equilon Enterprises LLC, ConocoPhillips, Sunoco, Inc., Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Hartree Partners, LP, Duke Energy Merchants, LLC, Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), BP Corporation North America Inc., Getty Properties Corporation and TotalEnergies Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.
Intervenor Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv00459
Filed: February 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Anne Arundel
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Referring Judge: Marvin J Garbis
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 750 Correspondence re: Defendants Reply Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Testimony (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Pardo, James)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 749 Correspondence re: Opposition to Defendants Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Testimony (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Appendix)(Sugimura, Derek)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 748 QC NOTICE: #746 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by State of Maryland needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 747 QC NOTICE: #745 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by State of Maryland needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 746 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William A. Walsh by State of Maryland. The fee has already been paid.(Sugimura, Derek)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 745 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William A. Walsh (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10919080.) by State of Maryland(Sugimura, Derek)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 744 ORDER scheduling a Motions Hearing for December 11, 2023 at 9:15 a.m. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/7/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 743 Correspondence re: Corrected Correspondence re #742 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Pardo, James)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 742 (FILED IN ERROR BY COUNSEL) Correspondence re: Defendants Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Testimony (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Pardo, James) Modified on 11/6/2023 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 741 Joint Correspondence re: status (Pardo, James)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 740 LETTER ORDER TO COUNSEL scheduling an in-person Status Hearing for November 2, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/25/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 739 Joint Correspondence re: Status Update (Pardo, James)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 738 Joint Correspondence re: Status Update on Focus Site Deposition (Pardo, James)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 737 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #736 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Martin L. Roth. Directing attorney Martin L. Roth to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 8/14/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 736 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Martin L. Roth (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10757021.) by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc.(Isbister, John)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 735 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #734 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Timothy Bazzle. Directing attorney Timothy Bazzle to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 7/31/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 734 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Timothy Bazzle (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10736858.) by Cumberland Farms, Inc., Gulf Oil Limited Partnership(Smith, Tierney)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 733 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/19/2023, before Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Court Reporter Patricia G. Mitchell, 410-962-3858; trish_mitchell@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 40. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/15/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/25/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2023.(pms, Court Reporter)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 732 LETTER TO COUNSEL scheduling an in-person Status Hearing for September 29, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/19/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 731 ORDER memorializing the July 19, 20203 in-person hearing. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/19/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 730 Status Conference held on 7/19/2023 before Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. (Court Reporter: Patricia Mitchell) (rm2s, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 729 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/18/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 728 NOTICE by ETP Holdco Corporation, Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Sun Company, Inc., Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P., Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) re #725 MOTION to Compel (Eisenberg, Daniel)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 727 QC NOTICE: #725 Motion to Compel,, filed by Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P., Sunoco, Inc., Sun Company, Inc., Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., ETP Holdco Corporation, Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Order. To correct this problem, file Proposed Order using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Order to #725 . (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 726 Joint Correspondence re: Status Update on Discovery (Pardo, James)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 725 MOTION to Compel by ETP Holdco Corporation, Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Sun Company, Inc., Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P., Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Letter Motion re Deliberative Process with Exhibits, #2 Attachment 2 - Opposition to Letter Motion re Deliberative Process with Exhibits, #3 Attachment 3 - Letter Reply re Deliberative Process, #4 Attachment 4 - Local Rule 104.7 Certificate of Compliance with Exhibits)(Eisenberg, Daniel)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 724 LETTER TO COUNSEL rescheduling the in-person Status Hearing to July 19, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/4/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ORDER re #722 Joint Correspondence re: Status Update and Proposed Stipulated Order on No MTBE Sites. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/26/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 722 Joint Correspondence re: Status Update and Proposed Stipulated Order on No MTBE Sites (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Joint Stipulation on No MTBE Sites)(Pardo, James)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 721 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Energy Transfer, L.P. for Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P..(Eisenberg, Daniel)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 720 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sunoco, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Energy Transfer, L.P. for Sunoco, Inc..(Eisenberg, Daniel)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 719 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) identifying Corporate Parent Energy Transfer, L.P. for Sunoco, Inc. (R&M).(Eisenberg, Daniel)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 718 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ETP Holdco Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Energy Transfer, L.P. for ETP Holdco Corporation.(Eisenberg, Daniel)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 717 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Energy Transfer Partners, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Energy Transfer, L.P. for Energy Transfer Partners, L.P..(Eisenberg, Daniel)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 716 QC NOTICE: #712 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by ETP Holdco Corporation, #714 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Sunoco, Inc., #713 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), #711 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., #715 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P. was filed incorrectly. Please re-file. **Enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 715 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P. (Eisenberg, Daniel) Modified on 4/17/2023 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 714 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sunoco, Inc. (Eisenberg, Daniel) Modified on 4/17/2023 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 713 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) (Eisenberg, Daniel) Modified on 4/17/2023 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 712 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ETP Holdco Corporation (Eisenberg, Daniel) Modified on 4/17/2023 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 711 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Energy Transfer Partners, L.P. (Eisenberg, Daniel) Modified on 4/17/2023 (ybs, Deputy Clerk).
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 710 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #709 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David A Langer. Directing attorney David A Langer to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/6/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 709 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David A. Langer (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10531496.) by State of Maryland(Sugimura, Derek)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 708 PAPERLESS ORDER The parties are directed to meet and confer in advance of the Status Hearing scheduled for Tuesday, May 2, 2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7C, and shall file a joint report by the close of business on Tuesday, April 25, 2023 regarding the status of discovery and the parties' suggested topics for discussion at the hearing. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/21/2023. (kc2s, Chamber)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 707 LETTER ORDER to Counsel; rescheduling Status Hearing for May 2, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/13/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 706 Status Report Submitted re Final Joint Status Letter for March Conference by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Pardo, James)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 705 NOTICE by ETP Holdco Corporation, Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Sun Company, Inc., Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P., Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) Notice of Address Change of Daniel M. Krainin (Eisenberg, Daniel)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 704 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #703 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Erin M Reynolds terminated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/23/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 703 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Erin Reynolds by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(Isbister, John)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 702 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/17/2023, before Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Court Reporter Patricia G. Mitchell, 410-962-3858, trish_mitchell@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 49. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/10/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/21/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/20/2023.(pms, Court Reporter)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 701 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #700 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Emily Sullivan. Directing attorney Emily Sullivan to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 1/19/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 700 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Emily Sullivan (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10382318.) by CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P.(Hovermill, Joseph)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 699 PAPERLESS ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at yesterday's hearing, it is this 18th day of January 2023, ordered that Defendants' Motion to Compel, ECF 686, is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/18/2023. (kc2s, Chamber)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 698 LETTER ORDER that an in-person Status Hearing has been scheduled for March 21, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 7C. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/17/2023. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 697 Motion Hearing held on 1/17/2023 re #686 ; MOTION to Compel filed by Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P., Sunoco, Inc., Sun Company, Inc., Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., ETP Holdco Corporation, Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) before Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher.(Court Reporter: Trish Mitchell) (yks, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 696 ORDER Approving #695 Privilege Logs in Connection with Deposition Notices. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/17/2023. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 695 Joint Correspondence re: Joint Proposed Stipulated Order Regarding Privilege Logs (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pardo, James)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 694 Status Report Submitted in advance of the January 17, 2023 Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Pardo, James)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 693 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #692 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Graham C. Zorn. Directing attorney Graham C. Zorn to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 1/5/2023. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 692 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Graham C. Zorn (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10358316.) by ETP Holdco Corporation, Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Sun Company, Inc., Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P., Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M)(Eisenberg, Daniel)
January 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 691 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Andrew Walsh on behalf of 7-Eleven, Inc. (Walsh, Michael)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 690 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #688 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Pamela R. Hanebutt for CITGO Defendants. Attorney Pamela R Hanebutt terminated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/27/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 689 REPLY to Response to Motion re #686 MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INFORMATION WITHHELD ON THE BASIS OF DELIBERATIVE PROCESS PRIVILEGE filed by ETP Holdco Corporation, Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Sun Company, Inc., Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P., Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 13)(Eisenberg, Daniel)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 688 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Pamela R. Hanebutt for CITGO Defendants by CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hanebutt, Pamela)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 687 RESPONSE in Opposition re #686 MOTION to Compel filed by State of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Kauff, Scott)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 686 MOTION to Compel by ETP Holdco Corporation, Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Sun Company, Inc., Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P., Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Local Rule 104.7 Certificate of Compliance, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Eisenberg, Daniel)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 685 DISCOVERY BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/7/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 684 LETTER ORDER rescheduling the in-person Motions Hearing/Status Conference to January 17, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/3/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 683 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #682 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kelli M. Mulder. Directing attorney Kelli M. Mulder to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 10/27/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 682 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kelli M. Mulder (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10220742.) by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc.(Isbister, John)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 681 Case Management Order #8. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/22/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 680 Correspondence re: Joint Proposed Order Re: Submission of Discovery Disputes (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pardo, James)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 679 ORDER Rescheduling Motions Hearing/Status Conference. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/6/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 678 PAPERLESS ORDER Approving #677 Notice (Other)(Withdrawal of Counsel) filed by Guttman Energy, Inc.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/12/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 677 NOTICE by Guttman Energy, Inc. (Withdrawal of Counsel) (Amundson, Martin)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 676 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey G Grivner on behalf of Guttman Energy, Inc. (Grivner, Geoffrey)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 675 QC NOTICE: #674 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by TRMI-H LLC, Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding missing or incomplete information. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 674 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Robert Sheppard, III (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10061243.) by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., TRMI-H LLC, Texaco Inc.(Sale, Daniel)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 673 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #672 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeremiah J Anderson terminated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/18/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 672 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jeremiah J. Anderson by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., TRMI-H LLC, Texaco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sale, Daniel)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 671 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #670 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Meghan E Ball terminated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/24/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 670 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Meghan E. Ball by Premcor USA Inc., The Premcor Refining Group Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave to Withdraw the Appearance of Meghan E. Ball)(Ball, Meghan)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 669 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 7. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/26/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 668 Correspondence re: Joint Proposed Case Management Order No. 7 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for CMO 7)(Sugimura, Derek)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 667 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/27/2022, before Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Court Reporter Ronda Thomas, Telephone number 410-962-4504. Total number of pages filed: 54. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/1/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2022.(rt, Court Reporter)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 666 NOTICE by Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation of Suggestion of Bankruptcy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Voluntary Petition)(Thomsen, Martha)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 665 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #663 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Xena Burwell. Directing attorney Xena Burwell to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. Signed by Clerk on 4/29/2022. (dm4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 664 Telephone Conference held on 4/27/2022 before Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher.(Court Reporter: FTR) (R. Carrick - Courtroom 7C FTR) (rc2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 663 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Xena Burwell by NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P.. The fee has already been paid.(Goodstein, Michael)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 662 QC NOTICE: #661 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (dm4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 661 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Xena Burwell (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-9887505.) by NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P.(Goodstein, Michael)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 660 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #659 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ani M Esenyan terminated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/18/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 659 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ani M. Esenyan by NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Esenyan, Ani)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 658 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by BP America Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c., Corporate Parent BP Holdings North America Limited, Corporate Parent BP America Limited for BP America Inc..(Isbister, John)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 657 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by BP Amoco Chemical Company identifying Corporate Parent BP Corporation North America Inc., Corporate Parent BP Company North America Inc., Corporate Parent BP Company North America Inc., Corporate Parent BP America Limited, Other Affiliate INEOS US Chemicals Company for BP Amoco Chemical Company.(Isbister, John)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 656 PAPERLESS ORDER scheduling a telephonic status conference on Wednesday, April 27, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/8/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 655 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Ruth Greene on behalf of Hartree Partners, LP (Greene, Emily)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 654 PAPERLESS ORDER CONFIRMING that a telephonic Case Management Conference has been scheduled for February 9, 2022 at 10 a.m. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/22/2021. (vals, Chambers)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER granting #642 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to "Closed Sites". Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/3/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 652 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/3/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 651 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #648 MOTION NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE AND MOTION TO CHANGE DEFENDANT NAME. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/2/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 650 NOTICE by State of Maryland of Supplemental Information (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher H. Ralston)(Kauff, Scott)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 649 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 10/18/2021, before Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Court Reporter Patricia G. Mitchell, 410-962-3858, trish_mitchell@mdd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/22/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2022.(pm, Court Reporter)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Telephonic Motions Hearing held on 10/18/2021 before Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 648 MOTION NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE AND MOTION TO CHANGE DEFENDANT NAME by TOTAL Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Einik, Daniella)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER re: Rescheduling telephonic Motions Hearing. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/8/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER re: CANCELLATION of Telephonic Status Conference. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/27/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 645 REPLY to Response to Motion re #642 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to "Closed Sites" filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation.(Pardo, James)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 644 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Yoshio Sugimura on behalf of State of Maryland (Sugimura, Derek)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 643 RESPONSE in Opposition re #642 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to "Closed Sites" filed by State of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott E. Kauff in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Kauff, Scott)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 642 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to "Closed Sites" by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of James A. Pardo in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Pardo, James)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 641 PAPERLESS ORDER CONFIRMING re #640 A telephonic Case Management Conference has been scheduled for September 30, 2021 at 10 a.m. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/13/2021. (vals, Chambers)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 640 STATUS REPORT - Joint Letter re: Scheduling Case Management Conference by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation(Lias Booker, Ava)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 639 NOTICE of Appearance by James Pardo on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation (Pardo, James)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER to Counsel. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/28/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 637 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 6. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/28/2021. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 636 STATUS REPORT / Joint Status Report in response to the Court's May 25, 2021 Order by Mobile Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pardo, James)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 635 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #630 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael D Hall. Directing attorney Michael D Hall to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/23/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 634 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #632 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Erin M Reynolds. Directing attorney Erin M Reynolds to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/23/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER re #629 Status Report filed by ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Mobile Corporation. The May 26, 2021 Case Management Conference call has been cancelled and is rescheduled to June 30, 2021 at 10 a.m. The parties are directed to submit, by 5 p.m. on June 25, 2021, a joint report identifying issues requiring the Court's attention or, if appropriate, the absence of such issues. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/25/2021. (wc, Chambers)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 632 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Erin M. Reynolds (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9293140.) by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc.(Isbister, John)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 631 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Update in Advance of May 26, 2021 Case Management Conference by State of Maryland(Kauff, Scott)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 630 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael D. Hall (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9287103.) by Guttman Energy, Inc.(Amundson, Martin)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 629 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation(Martinez, Melissa)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 628 QC NOTICE: #627 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Guttman Energy, Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (dm4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 627 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael D. Hall (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9277565.) by Guttman Energy, Inc.(Amundson, Martin)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 626 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/27/2021, before Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mary M Zajac, Telephone number 410-962-4544. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/21/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2021.(mmz, Court Reporter)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ORDER denying #582 MOTION Regarding Discovery Plan and Eventual Trial Structure. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/27/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 624 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 5. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/27/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 623 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #622 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Crooks. Directing attorney James Crooks to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/26/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 622 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James Crooks (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9241452.) by State of Maryland(Kauff, Scott)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ORDER A telephonic hearing is scheduled for April 27, 2021 at 3 p.m. regarding ECF 582 and related filings. Dial-in information will be circulated to the parties prior to the teleconference. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/22/2021. (wc, Chambers)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER re #619 Status Report filed by ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Mobile Corporation. The March 31, 2021 Case Management Conference call has been cancelled and is rescheduled to May 26, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are directed to submit, by 5 p.m. on May 21, 2021, a joint report identifying issues requiring the Court's attention or, if appropriate, the absence of such issues. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/31/2021. (wc, Chambers)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 619 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation(Lias Booker, Ava)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 618 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #616 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Peter R Kahana. Directing attorney Peter R Kahana to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/19/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 617 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #615 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Yechiel Michael Twersky. Directing attorney Yechiel Michael Twersky to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/19/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 616 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Peter R. Kahana (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9168006.) by State of Maryland(Kauff, Scott)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 615 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Yechiel Michael Twersky (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9167938.) by State of Maryland(Kauff, Scott)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 614 REPLY to Response to Motion re #582 MOTION Regarding Discovery Plan and Eventual Trial Structure filed by State of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kauff, Scott)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 613 MARGINAL ORDER granting #612 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING AUTHENTICITY OF DOCUMENTS filed by ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Mobile Corporation. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/17/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 612 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING AUTHENTICITY OF DOCUMENTS by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation(Lias Booker, Ava)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 611 PAPERLESS ORDER re 602 Order. The March 24, 2021 Case Management Conference call has been cancelled and is rescheduled to March 31, 2021 at 11:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/16/2021. (vals, Chambers)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 610 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #607 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Anne J Hudson. Directing attorney Anne J Hudson to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/5/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 609 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #608 Status Report filed by State of Maryland. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/1/2021. (vals, Chambers)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 608 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report regarding Authenticity Agreement by State of Maryland(Kauff, Scott)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 607 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anne Julie Esther Hudson by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Isbister, John)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 606 RESPONSE in Opposition re #582 MOTION Regarding Discovery Plan and Eventual Trial Structure filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Martinez, Melissa)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 605 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #599 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Thomas Leahy. Directing attorney Thomas Leahy to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/29/2021. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 604 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #603 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Katherine Katchen terminated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/27/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 603 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Lukoil Americas Corporation, Lukoil North America LLC, Lukoil Pan America, LLC, PJSC Lukoil(Paterno, Lide)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 602 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #601 Status Report. The January 29, 2021 Case Management Conference call has been cancelled and is rescheduled to March 24, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/26/2021. (vals, Chambers)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 601 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report regarding January 29, 2021 Case Management Conference by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation(Martinez, Melissa)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 600 QC NOTICE: #598 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by BP Products North America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 599 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas James Leahy by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Isbister, John)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 598 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anne Julie Esther Hudson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9076793.) by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc.(Isbister, John)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 597 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cumberland Farms, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent EG America, LLC, Other Affiliate EG Group Limited for Cumberland Farms, Inc..(Smith, Tierney)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 596 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #595 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brian Burgess terminated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/12/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 595 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cumberland Farms, Inc., Gulf Oil Limited Partnership (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Brian)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 594 NOTICE of Appearance by Tierney Smith on behalf of Cumberland Farms, Inc., Gulf Oil Limited Partnership (Smith, Tierney)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 593 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #590 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.Motion for Leave to Substitute Counsel Attorney Stanley E Woodward, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/8/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 592 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Wawa, Inc. (Ellison, Dawn)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 591 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Apex Oil Company, Inc. (Ellison, Dawn)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 590 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion for Leave to Substitute Counsel by Lukoil Americas Corporation, Lukoil North America LLC, Lukoil Pan America, LLC, PJSC Lukoil(Paterno, Lide)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 589 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report regarding Site Selection by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Martinez, Melissa)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 588 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/4/2020, before Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Court Reporter Patricia G. Mitchell, 410-962-3858, trish_mitchell@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 45. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/4/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2021.(pm, Court Reporter)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 587 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #586 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ani M Esenyan. Directing attorney Ani M Esenyan to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 586 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ani M.Esenyan (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8999896.) by NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P.(Goodstein, Michael)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 585 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.4. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/4/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 584 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #583 Request for Extension of Time to File filed by ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Mobile Corporation. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/3/2020. (vals, Chambers)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 583 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File response to Plaintiff's "Motion Regarding Discovery Plan and Eventual Trial Structure" (ECF No. 582) (Lias Booker, Ava)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 582 MOTION Regarding Discovery Plan and Eventual Trial Structure by State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of its Motion Regarding Discovery Plan and Eventual Trial Structure, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Kauff, Scott)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 581 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Lias Booker, Ava)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 580 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #579 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Caleb J Holmes. Directing attorney Caleb J Holmes to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/10/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 579 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Caleb J. Holmes (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8950850.) by Apex Oil Company, Inc.(Ellison, Dawn)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER granting #577 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nathaniel Paul Short terminated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/29/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 577 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Short, Nathaniel)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 576 RESPONSE re #573 Order ConocoPhillips Defendants' Response to Case Management Order No. 3, Section 1 filed by ConocoPhillips.(Dillard, Stephen)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 575 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Beth Kuspa on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kuspa, Julie)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 574 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/30/2020, before Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Court Reporter Patricia G. Mitchell, 410-962-3858, trish_mitchell@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 44. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/30/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2021.(pm, Court Reporter)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 573 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/30/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 572 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/30/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 571 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #570 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney /Counsel. Attorney Benjamin O'Connor terminated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/30/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 570 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney /Counsel by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Motion to Withdraw As Counsel [proposed] Order)(Isbister, John)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Telephone Status Conference held on 9/30/2020 before Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher.(Court Reporter: Patricia Mitchell) (chs, Deputy Clerk)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 569 Correspondence re: the Parties' Agreed-To Case Management Order Provisions (Martinez, Melissa)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 568 PAPERLESS ORDER directing the parties to confer and to file jointly, by close of business tomorrow, a submission indicating which portions of the competing CMOs can be agreed by both sides, if any. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/28/2020. (Gallagher, Stephanie)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 567 Correspondence re: Defendants' Proposed CMO 3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Martinez, Melissa)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 566 Correspondence re: Plaintiff's Proposed Case Management Order No. 3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Proposed] Case Management Order No. 3)(Kauff, Scott)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 565 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 2. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/21/2020 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 564 Correspondence re: Joint Proposed Case Management Order No. 2 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Joint Proposed] Case Management Order No. 2)(Martinez, Melissa)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 563 PAPERLESS ORDER re #502 CONFIRMING that the the deadline to submit the proposed case management order has been extended to September 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/15/2020. (vals, Chambers)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 562 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation. (Martinez, Melissa)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 561 AMENDED ANSWER to by El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redlined Answer)(Messenger, James)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 560 AMENDED ANSWER to by Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc., Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. A, Kinder Morgan Transmix Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Redlined Answer)(Messenger, James)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 559 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P.. (Attachments: #1 2nd Amended Answer - Redlined)(Zagon, Brian)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER denying #551 MOTION to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(F) and 12(C). Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/26/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 557 REPLY to Response to Motion re #551 MOTION to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(F) and 12(C) filed by State of Maryland.(Kauff, Scott)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 556 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #555 Motion. Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to the Motion to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses shall be due on or before August 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/30/2020. (vals, Chambers)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 555 Consent MOTION to Extend a Certain Deadline by State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Short, Nathaniel)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 554 RESPONSE in Opposition re #551 MOTION to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(F) and 12(C) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation.(Martinez, Melissa)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 553 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #552 Consent MOTION TO MODIFY CERTAIN DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/1/2020. (vals, Chambers)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 552 Consent MOTION TO MODIFY CERTAIN DEADLINES by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Melissa)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 551 MOTION to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(F) and 12(C) by State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kauff, Scott)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 550 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Akihiko Redd on behalf of Hartree Partners, LP (Redd, Justin)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 549 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Andrew Walsh on behalf of 7-Eleven, Inc. (Walsh, Michael)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 548 ORDER Granting #547 RESPONSE in Support re #507 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses ; Consent Motion for Scheduling Order filed by State of Maryland. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/6/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 547 RESPONSE in Support re #507 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses ; Consent Motion for Scheduling Order filed by State of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kauff, Scott)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 546 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #545 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Susan M Razzano. Directing attorney Susan M Razzano to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 545 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Susan M. Razzano (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8533786.) by CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P.(Hovermill, Joseph)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 544 AMENDED ANSWER to by Wawa, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Red-Lined))(Ellison, Dawn)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 543 AMENDED ANSWER to by Sheetz, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Red-Lined))(Ellison, Dawn)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 542 AMENDED ANSWER to by Transmontaigne Product Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Red-Lined))(Ellison, Dawn)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 541 AMENDED ANSWER to by Apex Oil Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Red-Lined))(Ellison, Dawn)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 540 AMENDED ANSWER to by Guttman Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Answer - Redline)(Amundson, Martin)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 539 AMENDED ANSWER to by Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Redlined Version)(Anderson, Erika)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 538 AMENDED ANSWER to by Premcor USA Inc., The Premcor Refining Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Redlined Version)(Anderson, Erika)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 537 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Hartree Partners, LP. (Attachments: #1 Amended Answer - Blackline)(Healy, Francis)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 536 AMENDED ANSWER to by El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Redline Answer)(Messenger, James)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 535 AMENDED ANSWER to by Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc., Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. A, Kinder Morgan Transmix Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Redline Answer)(Messenger, James)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 534 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Western Refining Yorktown, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Amended Answer - Redline)(Thomsen, Martha)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 533 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Marathon Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Amended Answer - Redline)(Thomsen, Martha)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 532 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Marathon Petroleum Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Amended Answer - Redline)(Thomsen, Martha)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 531 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Amended Answer (redline))(Hanebutt, Pamela)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 530 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Marathon Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Amended Answer - Redline)(Thomsen, Martha)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 529 AMENDED ANSWER to by 7-Eleven, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Walsh, Michael)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 528 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Amended Answer - Redline)(Thomsen, Martha)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 527 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Hess Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Amended Answer - Redline)(Thomsen, Martha)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 526 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Cumberland Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redline Copy of Amended Answer and Additional Defenses)(Burgess, Brian)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 525 AMENDED ANSWER to by Getty Properties Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Tracked Changes to Amended Answer)(McMeekin, John)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 524 AMENDED ANSWER to by ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Redlined Amended Answer)(Dillard, Stephen)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 523 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Gulf Oil Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Redline Copy of Amended Answer and Additional Defenses)(Burgess, Brian)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 522 AMENDED ANSWER to by Holtzman Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Redline Copy of Amended Answer)(Alfano, Alphonse)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 521 AMENDED ANSWER to by NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses of NuStar (Redlined))(Lynch, Anne)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 520 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Lukoil Pan America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Redline Copy)(Woodward, Stanley)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 519 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by George E. Warren Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Donovan, Priscilla)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 518 AMENDED ANSWER to by Duke Energy Merchants, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Redline Copy)(Wedeking, James)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 517 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Lukoil Americas Corporation, Lukoil North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Redline Copy)(Woodward, Stanley)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 516 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by ETP Holdco Corporation, Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Sun Company, Inc., Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P., Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M). (Attachments: #1 Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Red-Lined))(Eisenberg, Daniel)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 515 (FILED IN ERROR PER COUNSEL)NOTICE by Wawa, Inc. Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Red-Lined))(Ellison, Dawn) Modified on 2/21/2020 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 514 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by TOTAL Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Answer (redline))(Einik, Daniella)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 513 (FILED IN ERROR PER COUNSEL)NOTICE by Sheetz, Inc. Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Red-Lined))(Ellison, Dawn) Modified on 2/21/2020 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 512 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., TRMI-H LLC, Texaco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Redline Amended Answer)(Sale, Daniel)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 511 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment RedLined Amended Answer)(Carrier, William)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 510 (FILED IN ERROR PER COUNSEL)NOTICE by Transmontaigne Product Services, LLC Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Red-Lined))(Ellison, Dawn) Modified on 2/21/2020 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 509 (FILED IN ERROR PER COUNSEL)NOTICE by Apex Oil Company, Inc. Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Red-Lined))(Ellison, Dawn) Modified on 2/21/2020 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 508 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Trading (US) Company, TMR Company. (Attachments: #1 Amended Answer of Shell Defendants (redline))(Condron, Peter)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 507 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #2 Attachment Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Red-Lined), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Melissa)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 506 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #505 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ashley Moore Drake. Directing attorney Ashley Moore Drake to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/14/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 505 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ashley Moore Drake (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8510396.) by Cumberland Farms, Inc., Gulf Oil Limited Partnership(Burgess, Brian)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 504 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #503 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nathan Sanders. Directing attorney Nathan Sanders to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/7/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 503 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nathan C. Sanders (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8501441.) by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Melissa)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 502 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/6/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 501 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #500 Correspondence re: Proposed Orders. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/3/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 500 Correspondence re: Proposed Orders (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Melissa)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 499 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P. (Eisenberg, Daniel)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 498 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sunoco, Inc. (Eisenberg, Daniel)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 497 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) (Eisenberg, Daniel)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 496 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ETP Holdco Corporation (Eisenberg, Daniel)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 495 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Energy Transfer Partners, L.P. (Eisenberg, Daniel)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 494 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Eisenberg on behalf of ETP Holdco Corporation, Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Sun Company, Inc., Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P., Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) (Eisenberg, Daniel)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 493 NOTICE of Appearance by Hilary Tess Jacobs on behalf of ETP Holdco Corporation, Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Sun Company, Inc., Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P., Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) (Jacobs, Hilary)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER Granting #488 Miscellaneous Correspondence, Stipulated Order Regarding Production of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") And Hard-Copy Documents). Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/21/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER Granting #488 Miscellaneous Correspondence, Stipulated Clawback Order. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/21/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER GRANTING #488 Miscellaneous Correspondence, Stipulated Order Authorizing Electronic Service of Documents. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/21/2020. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 489 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #488 Miscellaneous Correspondence,. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/21/2020. (vals, Chambers)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 488 Correspondence re: Stipulated Orders and Request for Extension (Attachments: #1 Attachment [Proposed] Stipulated Order Authorizing Electronic Service of Documents, #2 Attachment [Proposed] Stipulated Clawback Order, #3 Attachment [Proposed] Stipulated Order Regarding Production of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") And Hard-Copy Documents)(Kauff, Scott)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER granting #486 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses to Feb. 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/15/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 486 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Melissa)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 485 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #484 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel M Krainin. Directing attorney Daniel M Krainin to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 1/13/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 484 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel M. Krainin (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8443633.) by ETP Holdco Corporation, Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Sun Company, Inc., Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P., Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M)(Guttmann, John)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 483 MOTION to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses by State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses, #2 Declaration of Yechiel M. Twersky, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Kauff, Scott)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 482 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #481 NOTICE by Exxon Mobil Corporation as a status update regarding proposed discovery orders and proposed CMO filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/23/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 481 NOTICE by Exxon Mobil Corporation as a status update regarding proposed discovery orders and proposed CMO (Pardo, James)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order (FILED IN ERROR)Deficiency Notice as to Transmontaigne Product Services, LLC-- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 12/26/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/18/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Transmontaigne Product Services, LLC.(Ellison, Dawn)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 479 Defendant Getty Properties Corp.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Getty Properties Corporation.(Dean, Susan)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 478 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Getty Properties Corporation (Dean, Susan)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 477 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #476 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael P. Cullen, Mr terminated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/26/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 476 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MICHAEL P. CULLEN by Apex Oil Company, Inc.(Ellison, Dawn)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 475 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #469 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Anne M Evans. Directing attorney Anne M Evans to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/12/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 474 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #468 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph Lee Sorkin. Attorney Joseph Lee Sorkin will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 11/12/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Lukoil Pan America, LLC.(Woodward, Stanley)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Lukoil Americas Corporation, Lukoil North America LLC.(Woodward, Stanley)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc., Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. A, Kinder Morgan Transmix Company, LLC.(Messenger, James)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company.(Messenger, James)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 469 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anne M. Evans (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8336877.) by Lukoil Americas Corporation, Lukoil North America LLC, Lukoil Pan America, LLC(Woodward, Stanley)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 468 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph L. Sorkin (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8336844.) by Lukoil Americas Corporation, Lukoil North America LLC, Lukoil Pan America, LLC(Woodward, Stanley)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER granting #466 Consent MOTION to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Answers. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/5/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 466 Consent MOTION to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Answers by State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Short, Nathaniel)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc..(Isbister, John)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 464 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #462 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ira Brad Matetsky. Directing attorney Ira Brad Matetsky to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/24/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 463 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re #460 Status Report filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/23/2019. (vals, Chambers)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 462 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ira Brad Matetsky (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8307300.) by George E. Warren Corporation(Donovan, Priscilla)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 461 NOTICE of Appearance by Priscilla Alden Donovan on behalf of George E. Warren Corporation (Donovan, Priscilla)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 460 STATUS REPORT by Exxon Mobil Corporation(Pardo, James)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 459 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #428 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Getty Properties Corporation answer due 12/2/2019. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/21/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, and Affirmative Defenses by CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P..(Hanebutt, Pamela)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Holtzman Oil Corporation.(Alfano, Alphonse)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Trading (US) Company, TMR Company.(Condron, Peter)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation.(Martinez, Melissa)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 454 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Duke Energy Merchants, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Duke Energy Corporation, Corporate Parent Duke Energy Americas LLC for Duke Energy Merchants, LLC.(Wedeking, James)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 453 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by TMR Company identifying Corporate Parent Equilon Enterprises LLC, Corporate Parent Shell Trading (US) Company, Corporate Parent Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Corporate Parent Shell Oil Company for TMR Company.(Condron, Peter)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 452 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Shell Trading (US) Company identifying Corporate Parent Equilon Enterprises LLC, Corporate Parent TMR Company, Corporate Parent Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Corporate Parent Shell Oil Company for Shell Trading (US) Company.(Condron, Peter)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 451 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Shell Oil Products Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equilon Enterprises LLC, Corporate Parent Shell Trading (US) Company, Corporate Parent TMR Company, Corporate Parent Shell Oil Company for Shell Oil Products Company LLC.(Condron, Peter)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Shell Oil Company identifying Corporate Parent Equilon Enterprises LLC, Corporate Parent Shell Trading (US) Company, Corporate Parent TMR Company, Corporate Parent Shell Oil Products Company LLC for Shell Oil Company.(Condron, Peter)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 449 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Motiva Enterprises LLC identifying Corporate Parent Saudi Refining, Inc., Corporate Parent Saudi Aramco for Motiva Enterprises LLC.(Condron, Peter)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by TOTAL Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc..(Einik, Daniella)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 447 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Equilon Enterprises LLC identifying Corporate Parent Shell Trading (US) Company, Corporate Parent TMR Company, Corporate Parent Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Corporate Parent Shell Oil Company for Equilon Enterprises LLC.(Condron, Peter)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, and Affirmative Defenses by ETP Holdco Corporation, Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Sun Company, Inc., Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P., Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M).(Guttmann, John)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 445 Sheetz, Inc.'s ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Sheetz, Inc..(Ellison, Dawn)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 444 Chevron Defendants' ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, and Affirmative Defenses by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc..(Sale, Daniel)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by 7-Eleven, Inc..(Walsh, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 442 Wawa, Inc.'s ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Wawa, Inc..(Ellison, Dawn)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 441 Apex Oil Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Apex Oil Company, Inc..(Ellison, Dawn)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 440 Original Answer of ConocoPhillips Defendants ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by ConocoPhillips Company.(Dillard, Stephen)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Hartree Partners, LP.(Healy, Francis)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Cumberland Farms, Inc..(Burgess, Brian)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Gulf Oil Limited Partnership.(Burgess, Brian)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Duke Energy Merchants, LLC.(Wedeking, James)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by George E. Warren Corporation.(Donovan, Daniel)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 434 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by George E. Warren Corporation (Donovan, Daniel)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P..(Lynch, Anne)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, Valero Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company.(Anderson, Erika)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, Premcor Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Premcor USA Inc., The Premcor Refining Group Inc..(Anderson, Erika)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, And Affirmative Defenses by Guttman Energy, Inc..(Amundson, Martin)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 429 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin John Amundson on behalf of Guttman Energy, Inc. (Amundson, Martin)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 428 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by Getty Properties Corporation.(Brown, Michael) Modified on 10/18/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Marathon Petroleum Company LP.(Thomsen, Martha)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Western Refining Yorktown, Inc..(Thomsen, Martha)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Marathon Petroleum Corporation.(Thomsen, Martha)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Marathon Oil Corporation.(Thomsen, Martha)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation.(Thomsen, Martha)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Hess Corporation.(Thomsen, Martha)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER GRANTING #418 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #2 Complaint. Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., and BP Products North America Inc's. answers due on or before 10/25/2019. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/16/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER GRANTING #417 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Lukoil Americas Corporation, Lukoil North America LLC, and Lukoil Pan America, LLC's answers due on or before 11/8/2019. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/16/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 419 Marginal ORDER GRANTING #416 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Transmontaigne Product Services, LLC's answer due 12/17/2019. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/16/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 418 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer BP Defendants Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc.(Isbister, John)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 417 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Lukoil Americas Corporation, Lukoil North America LLC, Lukoil Pan America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woodward, Stanley)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 416 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Transmontaigne Product Services, LLC(Ellison, Dawn)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 415 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Allison Ellison on behalf of Apex Oil Company, Inc. (Ellison, Dawn)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 414 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #413 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/15/2019. (vals, Chambers)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 413 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc., Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. A, Kinder Morgan Transmix Company, LLC(Messenger, James)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 412 REVISED MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/4/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER re #401 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/7/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 410 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney Jerry Stouck (Ellison, Dawn)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 409 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney Jerry Stouck (Ellison, Dawn)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 408 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney Jerry Stouck (Ellison, Dawn)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Judge Ellen L. Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 407 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Allison Ellison on behalf of Wawa, Inc. (Ellison, Dawn)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 406 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Allison Ellison on behalf of Transmontaigne Product Services, LLC (Ellison, Dawn)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 405 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Allison Ellison on behalf of Sheetz, Inc. (Ellison, Dawn)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER granting #403 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint Exxon Mobil Corporation answer due 10/18/2019; ExxonMobile Oil Corporation answer due 10/18/2019; Mobile Corporation answer due 10/18/2019. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/16/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 403 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint,,,,,,, by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Melissa)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER denying #333 Motion to Dismiss; denying #334 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part #335 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying #336 MOTION for Other Relief Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss and Supplemental Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For More Definite Statement ; denying #338 MOTION for Other Relief Joinder in Certain Defendants Motion to Dismiss ; denying #342 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying #342 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting #343 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/4/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 401 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/4/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 400 PROTECTIVE/CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/13/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 399 MOTION for Protective Order by State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Short, Nathaniel)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 398 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #397 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Laura Robinson Kaufman terminated. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/29/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 397 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66 Company(Kaufman, Laura)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER granting #395 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gary C Adler terminated. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/23/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 395 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by 7-Eleven, Inc.(Walsh, Michael)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 394 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Carol Ondeck on behalf of ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66 Company (Ondeck, Katherine)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 393 NOTICE of Change of Address by Stanley E Woodward, Jr (Woodward, Stanley)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 392 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #391 Notice to Substitute Attorney filed by State of Maryland. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/8/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 391 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney (Cobb Williams, Stephanie)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 390 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #389 Notice to Substitute Attorney filed by Guttman Energy, Inc.. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/5/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 389 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney (Roach, Meagan)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 388 REPLY to Response to Motion re #343 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by PJSC Lukoil.(Woodward, Stanley)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 387 REPLY to Response to Motion re #342 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lukoil Pan America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Simon Fenner in Support)(Woodward, Stanley)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER granting #385 Parties Unopposed Motion to Modify Motions to Dismiss Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/6/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 385 MOTION for Extension of Time to Modify Motions to Dismiss Briefing Schedule (Unopposed) by Lukoil Pan America, LLC, PJSC Lukoil(Woodward, Stanley)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 384 Correspondence re: State of Maryland's Opposition to Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Short, Nathaniel)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 383 MARGINAL ORDER #382 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/22/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 382 NOTICE by United States of America Withdrawal of Counsel (Harvey, Judy)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 381 REPLY to Response to Motion re #335 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim CORRECTED Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Lisa A. Gerson in Further Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1)(Martinez, Melissa)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 380 (FILED IN ERROR PER COUNSEL)REPLY to Response to Motion re #335 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Lisa A. Gerson in Further Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1)(Martinez, Melissa) Modified on 2/21/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
February 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 379 REPLY to Response to Motion re #333 MOTION to Dismiss filed by 7-Eleven, Inc..(Walsh, Michael)
February 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 378 RESPONSE in Opposition re #334 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Duke Energy Merchants, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wedeking, James)
February 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 377 REPLY to Response to Motion re #333 MOTION to Dismiss filed by TOTAL Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Exhibit A)(Myers, Diane)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER GRANTING #375 Motion for Extension of Time and Page Limits for Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/12/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time and Page Limits for Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Melissa)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER granting #373 Consent MOTION to Continue Temporary Seal of Certain Documents. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/8/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 Consent MOTION to Continue Temporary Seal of Certain Documents by Lukoil Pan America, LLC, PJSC Lukoil (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woodward, Stanley)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER granting #321 MOTION for Leave to Commence Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Serving a Subpoena on the U.S. Energy Information Administration. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 1/17/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 371 Correspondence re: January 9, 10 & 11, 2019 Filings (Short, Nathaniel)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER granting #369 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 1/14/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 369 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents by State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kauff, Scott)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 368 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #342 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by State of Maryland.(Kauff, Scott)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 367 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #343 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by State of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Molly McGinley Han, #2 Exhibits 1-19, #3 Exhibits 20-43)(Kauff, Scott)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 RESPONSE in Opposition re #343 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by State of Maryland.(Kauff, Scott) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2019: #1 Declaration of Molly McGinley Han) (kw2s, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2019: #2 Exhibit 1-19) (kw2s, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2019: #3 Exhibit 20-43) (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 365 RESPONSE re #342 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by State of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bruce F. Burke)(Kauff, Scott) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2019: #2 Declaration of Molly McGinley Han) (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 364 NOTICE by ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66 Company Withdrawal of Appearance of Gabriel D. Kaim (Dillard, Stephen)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 363 NOTICE by Lukoil Americas Corporation, Lukoil North America LLC, Lukoil Pan America, LLC, PJSC Lukoil Withdrawing Connor Mullin as Counsel (Mullin, Connor)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 362 NOTICE by Lukoil Pan America, LLC re #342 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Declaration of Simon Fenner (Attachments: #1 Amended Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service)(Woodward, Stanley)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER granting #360 Motion to Modify Certain Deadlines Regarding Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/21/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 360 MOTION Unopposed Motion to Modify Certain Deadlines Regarding Motions to Dismiss by State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kauff, Scott)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 359 RESPONSE in Opposition re #335 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by State of Maryland.(Kauff, Scott)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 358 RESPONSE in Opposition re #334 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by State of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan Barnhart)(Kauff, Scott)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 357 RESPONSE in Opposition re #333 MOTION to Dismiss Regarding Personal Jurisdiction filed by State of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Molly McGinley Han, #2 Declaration of Bruce F. Burke)(Kauff, Scott)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 356 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #354 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lisa Gerson. Directing attorney Lisa Gerson to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 355 RESPONSE in Opposition re #336 MOTION for Other Relief Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss and Supplemental Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For More Definite Statement filed by State of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kauff, Scott)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lisa A. Gerson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7740766.) by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinez, Melissa)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting #352 MOTION to Modify Certain Deadlines Regarding Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/17/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MOTION to Modify Certain Deadlines Regarding Motions to Dismiss by State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Short, Nathaniel)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 351 MEMORANDUM OPINION(Revised). Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/21/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2018: #1 Order) (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER re: non-substantive corrections. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/21/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting #348 MOTION to Modify Certain Deadlines Regarding Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/14/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 348 MOTION to Modify Certain Deadlines Regarding Motions to Dismiss by State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kauff, Scott)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER denying #283 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/24/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 346 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/24/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER Granting #344 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of Chevron Corporation and Joint Stipulation filed by State of Maryland. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/19/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 344 NOTICE by State of Maryland of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of Chevron Corporation and Joint Stipulation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Short, Nathaniel)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 343 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by PJSC Lukoil (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Declaration of Anatoly Martynov, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Woodward, Stanley)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Lukoil Pan America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Declaration of Simon Fenner, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Woodward, Stanley)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 341 NOTICE by NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P. Change of Firm Name, Address, Telephone Numbers, and Email Addresses (Goodstein, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting #339 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File re: the Courts Order dated June 4, 2018 filed by Lukoil Pan America, LLC, Lukoil North America LLC, Lukoil Americas Corporation, PJSC Lukoil. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/26/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 339 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File re: the Courts Order dated June 4, 2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woodward, Stanley)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 338 MOTION for Other Relief Joinder in Certain Defendants Motion to Dismiss by Hartree Partners, LP(Gollogly, Ezra)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 337 NOTICE by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation re #335 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Corrected Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss) (Lias Booker, Ava)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 336 MOTION for Other Relief Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss and Supplemental Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For More Definite Statement by 7-Eleven, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Request for Hearing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Lias Booker, Ava)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 334 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Duke Energy Merchants, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wedeking, James)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 333 MOTION to Dismiss by TOTAL Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Kim Arterburn, #3 Declaration Craig R. Watel, #4 Request for Hearing, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Einik, Daniella)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER granting #331 Correspondence re: the Court's Order dated June 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/11/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 331 Correspondence re: the Court's Order dated June 4, 2018 (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order Regarding Motions to Dismiss Briefing Schedule)(Lias Booker, Ava)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 330 (FILED IN ERROR PER COUNSEL) Correspondence re: the Court's Order dated June 4, 2018 (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order Regarding Motions to Dismiss Briefing Schedule)(Lias Booker, Ava) Modified on 9/11/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER granting #328 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Chevron Corporation answer due 10/15/2018. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/11/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 328 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Chevron Corporation(Sale, Daniel)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 327 REPLY to Response to Motion re #321 MOTION for Leave to Commence Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Serving a Subpoena on the U.S. Energy Information Administration filed by State of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 N.Short Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Short, Nathaniel)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 326 QC NOTICE: #325 Response in Support of Motion, filed by State of Maryland was filed incorrectly. ***Please refile using the correct event under Responses and Replies - Reply to Response to Motion It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 325 (FILED IN ERROR)RESPONSE in Support re #321 MOTION for Leave to Commence Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Serving a Subpoena on the U.S. Energy Information Administration filed by State of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 N Short Declaration and Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Short, Nathaniel) Modified on 8/22/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 324 RESPONSE in Opposition re #321 MOTION for Leave to Commence Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Serving a Subpoena on the U.S. Energy Information Administration filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation.(Martinez, Melissa)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER granting #320 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Supporting the Constitutionality of Section 1503 of the Energy Policy Act. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/30/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/30/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MOTION for Leave to Commence Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Serving a Subpoena on the U.S. Energy Information Administration by State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kauff, Scott)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. Judge Marvin J. Garbis no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 320 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Supporting the Constitutionality of Section 1503 of the Energy Policy Act by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of the Constitutionality of Section 1503 of the Energy Policy Act, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting US Intervention for the Limited Purpose of Supporting the Constitutionality of Section 1503 of the Energy Policy Act)(Harvey, Judy)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 319 NOTICE of Appearance by Judy B Harvey on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Harvey, Judy)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER granting #317 NOTICE by State of Maryland of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Astra Oil Company, LLC Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1) and Joint Stipulation filed by State of Maryland. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 6/15/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 317 NOTICE by State of Maryland of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Astra Oil Company, LLC Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1) and Joint Stipulation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Short, Nathaniel)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 316 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #315 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Matthew Thurlow. Directing attorney Matthew Thurlow to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/15/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 315 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew D. Thurlow (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7389891.) by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66 Company(Kaufman, Laura)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 314 NOTICE by State of Maryland Notice of Filing Proof of Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons as to Defendants Energy Transfer Partners, L.P. & PJSC Lukoil (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons Energy Transfers, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Notice of Waiver of Service PJSC Lukoil)(Short, Nathaniel)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER granting #310 Notice to Substitute Attorney for Local Counsel filed by ConocoPhillips, Phillips 66 Company, ConocoPhillips Company. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 6/12/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 312 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Robinson Kaufman on behalf of ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66 Company (Kaufman, Laura)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 311 QC NOTICE: #310 Notice to Substitute Attorney filed by ConocoPhillips, Phillips 66 Company, ConocoPhillips Company was filed incorrectly. ***Each attorney must file their Notice of Appearance using their CM/ECF login in order to be added as counsel to a case. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 310 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney for Local Counsel (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Substitution of Local Counsel)(Dillard, Stephen)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MARGINAL ORDER granting #308 MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed Motion to Modify Certain Deadlines. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 6/4/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed Motion to Modify Certain Deadlines by Atlantic Richfield Company(Isbister, John)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting #306 the United States' Motion to Extend the Review Period. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 5/15/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeShields Minnis, Tarra)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 305 NOTICE by State of Maryland Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Levin, Sari)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 304 Request for Hearing Defendants Request For Hearing On Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (Isbister, John)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 303 REPLY to Response to Motion re #283 MOTION to Remand filed by State of Maryland.(Short, Nathaniel)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 302 NOTICE of Appearance by John S Guttmann on behalf of ETP Holdco Corporation, Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Sun Company, Inc., Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P., Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) (Guttmann, John)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 301 QC NOTICE: #300 Notice of change of firm name and email addresses filed by 7-Eleven, Inc. **Please note that counse is responsible for updating all information in their CM/ECF account under utilites- your account- maintain your account. (c/em to counsel via ad hoc 4/27/18) (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 NOTICE by 7-Eleven, Inc. of Change of Firm Name and Email Addresses (Griffin, Elizabeth)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 299 RESPONSE in Opposition re #283 MOTION to Remand Defendants Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Remand filed by Atlantic Richfield Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 Declartion, #4 Exhibit 3 Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 Declaration)(Isbister, John)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 298 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #294 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Melvin A Brosterman. Directing attorney Melvin A Brosterman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/30/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 297 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #293 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David Kahne. Directing attorney David Kahne to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/30/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 296 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #292 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Francis Healy. Directing attorney Francis Healy to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/30/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MARGINAL ORDER granting #291 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 3/28/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Melvin A. Brosterman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7235845.) by Hartree Partners, LP(Gollogly, Ezra)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 293 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David J. Kahne (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7235840.) by Hartree Partners, LP(Gollogly, Ezra)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Francis C. Healy (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7235829.) by Hartree Partners, LP(Gollogly, Ezra)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Atlantic Richfield Company(Isbister, John)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 290 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #288 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John Dema. Directing attorney John Dema to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 289 NOTICE by State of Maryland of Filing Proof of Service for Getty Petroleum Marketing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A)(Short, Nathaniel)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 288 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John K. Dema (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7226942.) by State of Maryland(Short, Nathaniel)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 287 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #277 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeffrey Laurence Leiter. Directing attorney Jeffrey Laurence Leiter to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/22/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #275 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Susan Dean. Directing attorney Susan Dean to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/22/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MARGINAL ORDER granting #274 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John C. McMeekin II. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 3/20/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 284 NOTICE by State of Maryland of Constitutional Question (Short, Nathaniel)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MOTION to Remand by State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of N Short, #3 Exhibit Ex A, #4 Exhibit Ex B, #5 Exhibit Ex C, #6 Exhibit Ex D, #7 Exhibit Ex E, #8 Exhibit Ex F, #9 Exhibit Ex G, #10 Exhibit Ex H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Short, Nathaniel)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 282 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #273 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Tyler Wren. Directing attorney Tyler Wren to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 281 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #272 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Axline. Directing attorney Michael Axline to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 280 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #270 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Messenger. Directing attorney James Messenger to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 279 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #269 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Danley. Directing attorney Christopher Danley to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 278 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #268 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joshua Frank. Directing attorney Joshua Frank to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey L. Leiter (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7208346.) by Holtzman Oil Corporation(Alfano, Alphonse)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 276 NOTICE by State of Maryland of Invocation of Waiver Procedure as to PJSC Lukoil (Short, Nathaniel)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Susan M. Dean (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7206381.) by Getty Properties Corporation(Brown, Michael)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John C. McMeekin II (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7206282.) by Getty Properties Corporation(Brown, Michael)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tyler E. Wren (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7204345.) by State of Maryland(Short, Nathaniel)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael Axline (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7203785.) by State of Maryland(Short, Nathaniel)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 271 NOTICE by State of Maryland of Invocation of Waiver Procedure as to Energy Transfer Partners, L.P. (Short, Nathaniel)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James Messenger (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7203426.) by El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc., Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. A, Kinder Morgan Transmix Company, LLC(Scotti, Brian)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher Danley (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7203165.) by Hess Corporation, Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Western Refining Yorktown, Inc.(Thomsen, Martha)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joshua B. Frank (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7203152.) by Hess Corporation, Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Western Refining Yorktown, Inc.(Thomsen, Martha)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #263 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Pardo. Directing attorney James Pardo to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/9/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 266 NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley E Woodward, Jr on behalf of Lukoil Americas Corporation, Lukoil North America LLC, Lukoil Pan America, LLC, PJSC Lukoil (Woodward, Stanley)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie D Cobb Williams on behalf of State of Maryland (Cobb Williams, Stephanie)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 264 NOTICE of Appearance by Sari Mandel Levin on behalf of State of Maryland (Levin, Sari)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James A. Pardo (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7190477.) by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation(Lias Booker, Ava)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 262 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #259 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Katherine Katchen. Directing attorney Katherine Katchen to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/5/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 261 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E. Kauff on behalf of State of Maryland (Kauff, Scott)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 260 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Paul Short on behalf of State of Maryland (Short, Nathaniel)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Katherine M. Katchen (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7186469.) by Lukoil Americas Corporation, Lukoil North America LLC, Lukoil Pan America, LLC, PJSC Lukoil(Mullin, Connor)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTICE of Appearance by Connor Mullin on behalf of Lukoil Americas Corporation, Lukoil North America LLC, Lukoil Pan America, LLC, PJSC Lukoil (Mullin, Connor)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 257 (FILED IN ERROR)QC NOTICE: #157 Notice (Other), filed by BP Products North America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., #156 Notice (Other), filed by BP Products North America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc. was filed incorrectly. Please provide proposed summons for each party. Use the event Notice(Other) and link to #156 and #157 . (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/1/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 RESPONSE re #10 Standing Order Concerning Removal All Joining Defendants' Joint Response filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carrier, William)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 255 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Cullen, Mr on behalf of Apex Oil Company, Inc. (Cullen, Michael)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 254 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #252 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephen Riccardulli. Directing attorney Stephen Riccardulli to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/28/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Apex Oil Company, Inc. (Cullen, Michael)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen J. Riccardulli by Guttman Energy, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Roach, Meagan)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 251 QC NOTICE: #235 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Guttman Energy, Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #212 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Erika Anderson. Directing attorney Erika Anderson to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/28/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 249 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #211 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Meghan Ball. Directing attorney Meghan Ball to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/28/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #147 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Chad W Higgins. Directing attorney Chad W Higgins to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/28/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #146 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mark E Tully. Attorney Mark E Tully will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 2/28/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Request for Reissue of Summons for Energy Transfer Partners, L.P. previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Western Refining Yorktown, Inc. previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on WAWA, Inc. previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 243 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Vitol S.A. previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Valero Refining and Marketing Company previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Valero Marketing and Supply Company previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Valero Energy Corporation previusly filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on TRMI-H LLC previoulsy filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Transmontaigne Product Services, LLC previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on TMR Company previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen J. Riccardulli (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7178662.) by Guttman Energy, Inc.(Roach, Meagan)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on The Premcor Refining Group, Inc. previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Texaco, Inc. previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Sunoco, Inc. previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals LP previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Sun Company, Inc. previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Shell Trading (US) Company previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 227 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #145 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel Farino. Directing attorney Daniel Farino to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #144 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Carlos Bollar. Directing attorney Carlos Bollar to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Shell Oil Products Company LLC previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 224 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #134 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Charles Correll. Directing attorney Charles Correll to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #133 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James J Maher. Directing attorney James J Maher to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 222 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #132 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeremiah Anderson. Directing attorney Jeremiah Anderson to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #116 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Diane Myers. Directing attorney Diane Myers to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #115 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Domingo. Directing attorney Christopher Domingo to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #113 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Traci Lovitt. Directing attorney Traci Lovitt to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #110 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Franklin Sanders. Attorney James Franklin Sanders will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 217 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Shell Oil Company previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Sheetz, Inc. previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Premcor USA Inc. previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Phillips 66 previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Nustar Terminals Operations Partnership LP previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Erika M. Anderson by Premcor USA Inc., The Premcor Refining Group Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company. The fee has already been paid.(Gollogly, Ezra)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Meghan E. Ball by Premcor USA Inc., The Premcor Refining Group Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company. The fee has already been paid.(Gollogly, Ezra)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #109 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Candace Blydenburgh. Directing attorney Candace Blydenburgh to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #108 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jonathan Paul Harmon. Attorney Jonathan Paul Harmon will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #99 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lisa Meyer. Directing attorney Lisa Meyer to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #96 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Pamela Hanebutt. Directing attorney Pamela Hanebutt to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #95 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nathan Eimer. Directing attorney Nathan Eimer to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #91 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jonathan Schaefer. Directing attorney Jonathan Schaefer to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #85 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Peter R Knight. Directing attorney Peter R Knight to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 QC NOTICE: #80 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by Premcor USA Inc., Valero Refining and Marketing Company, Valero Energy Corporation, The Premcor Refining Group Inc., Valero Marketing and Supply Company needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 QC NOTICE: #79 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by Premcor USA Inc., Valero Refining and Marketing Company, Valero Energy Corporation, The Premcor Refining Group Inc., Valero Marketing and Supply Company needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #72 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of J Andrew Langan. Attorney J Andrew Langan will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 200 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #71 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Benjamin O'Connor. Directing attorney Benjamin O'Connor to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #70 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Andrew R. Running. Directing attorney Andrew R. Running to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #69 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amanda Jacobowski. Directing attorney Amanda Jacobowski to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Motiva Enterprises LLC previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Mobil Corporation previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE by BP America Inc. Affidavit of Service on Marathon Petroleum Corporation previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE by BP America Inc. Affidavit of Service on Marathon Petroleum Company LP previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Marathon Oil Corporation previously filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Lukoil Americas Corporation previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Kinder Morgan Transmix Company LLC previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Kinder Morgan Operating LP previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Kinder Morgan GP Inc previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Holtzman Oil Corporation previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Hess Corporation previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Hartree Partners LP previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Guttman Energy previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Gulf Oil Limited Partnership previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Getty Properties Corporation previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on George E. Warren Corporation previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on ExxonMobil Oil Corporation previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on ExxonMobil Corporation previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on ETP Holdco Corporation previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Equilon Enterprises, LLC previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Energy Transfer Partners, L.P. previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Duke Energy Merchants, LLC previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Cumberland Farms, Inc. previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on ConocoPhillips Company previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on ConocoPhillips previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Citgo Refining and Chemical Company L.P. previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Citgo Petroleum Corporation previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Chevron U.S.A., Inc. previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Chevron Corporation previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on BP Products North America Inc. previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 NOTICE by BP Corporation North America Inc. Affidavit of Service on BP Corporation North America Inc. previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on BP AMOCO Chemical Company previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on BP America Inc. previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Atlantic Richfield Company previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Astra Oil Company Inc. previously filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on Apex Oil Company Inc. filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A Scotti on behalf of El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc., Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. A, Kinder Morgan Transmix Company, LLC (Scotti, Brian)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company Affidavit of Service on 7-Eleven Inc. filed in state court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc. Request to Reissue Summons for Vitol S.A. - Originally filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc. Request to Reissue Summons for Hess Oil Virgin Islands & Holtzman - Originally filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc. Notice of Appearance of John C. McMeekin for Getty Properties Corp originally filed in State Court (Carrier, William)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C Condron on behalf of Equilon Enterprises LLC (Condron, Peter)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C Condron on behalf of TMR Company (Condron, Peter)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C Condron on behalf of Motiva Enterprises LLC (Condron, Peter)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Exxon Mobil Corporation, Other Affiliate Mobil Corporation, Other Affiliate Exxonmobil Oil Corporation, Other Affiliate Ampolex (Cepu) Pte Ltd, Other Affiliate Ancon Insurance Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Barnett Gathering, LLC, Other Affiliate Ellora Energy, Inc., Other Affiliate Esso Australia Resources Pty Ltd, Other Affiliate Esso Deutschland GmbH, Other Affiliate Esso Erdgas Beteiligungsgesellschaft mbH, Other Affiliate Esso Exploration and Production Angola (Overseas) Limited, Other Affiliate Esso Exploration and Production Chad Inc., Other Affiliate Esso Exploration and Production Nigeria (Deepwater) Limited, Other Affiliate Esso Exploration and Production Nigeria (Offshore East) Limited, Other Affiliate Esso Exploration and Production Nigeria Limited, Other Affiliate Esso Exploration and Production UK Limited, Other Affiliate Esso Exploration Angola (Block 15) Limited, Other Affiliate Esso Exploration Angola (Block 17) Limited, Other Affiliate Esso Global Investments Ltd., Other Affiliate Esso Italiana S.r.l., Other Affiliate Esso Nederland B.V., Other Affiliate Esso Norge AS, Other Affiliate Esso Petroleum Company, Limited, Other Affiliate Exxon Azerbaijan Limited, Other Affiliate Exxon Chemical Arabia Inc., Other Affiliate Exxon Chemical Licensing LLC, Other Affiliate Exxon International Finance Company, Other Affiliate Exxon Luxembourg Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Exxon Mobile Bay Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Exxon Neftegas Limited, Other Affiliate Exxon Overseas Corporation, Other Affiliate Exxon Overseas Investment Corporation, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil (China) Investment Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil (Taicang) Petroleum Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Abu Dhabi Offshore Petroleum Company Limited, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Alaska Production Inc., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Asia Pacific Pte. Ltd., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Australia Pty Ltd., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Barzan Limited, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Canada Ltd., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Canada Properties, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Canada Resources Company, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Capital Netherlands B.V., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Cepu Limited, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Chemical France, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Chemical Holland B.V., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Chemical Limited, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Chemical Operations Private Limited, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Chemical Services (Shanghai) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil China Petroleum & Petrochemical Company Limited, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Development Company, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Egypt (S.A.E.), Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Exploration and Production Malaysia Inc., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Exploration and Production Norway AS, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Exploration and Production Romania Limited, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Exploration and Production Tanzania Limited, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Finance Company Limited, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Financial Services B.V., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil France Holding SAS, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Gas Marketing Europe Limited, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil General Finance Company, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Global Services Company, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Holding Company Holland LLC, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Holding Norway AS, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Hong Kong Limited, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil International Services SARL, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Iraq Limited, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Italiana Gas S.r.l., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Kazakhstan Inc., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Kazakhstan Ventures Inc., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Lubricants Trading Company, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Pensions-Verwaltungsgesellschaft mbH, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Petroleum & Chemical BVBA, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Petroleum & Chemical Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Petroleum Finance Company, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Pipeline Company, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil PNG Limited, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Producing Netherlands B.V., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Production Deutschland GmbH, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Production Norway Inc., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Qatargas Inc., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Qatargas (II) Limited, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Ras Laffan (III) Limited, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Rasgas Inc., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Russia Kara Sea Holdings B.V., Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Sales and Supply LLC, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Technology Finance Company, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Ventures Finance Company, Other Affiliate ExxonMobil Ventures Funding Ltd., Other Affiliate Golden Pass LNG Terminal Investments LLC, Other Affiliate Mobil Africa Sales Inc., Other Affiliate Mobil Australia Resources Company Pty Limited, Other Affiliate Mobil California Exploration & Producing Asset Company, Other Affiliate Mobil Caspian Pipeline Company, Other Affiliate Mobil Cerro Negro, Ltd., Other Affiliate Mobil Chemical Products International Inc., Other Affiliate Mobil Equatorial Guinea Inc., Other Affiliate Mobil Erdgas Verwaltungsgesellschaft mbH, Other Affiliate Mobil Erdgas-Erdoel GmbH, Other Affiliate Mobil Exploration & Producing Australia Pty Ltd., Other Affiliate Mobil Exploration Indonesia Inc., Other Affiliate Mobil International Petroleum Corporation, Other Affiliate Mobil Oil Australia Pty Ltd., Other Affiliate Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc., Other Affiliate Mobil Oil New Zealand Limited, Other Affiliate Mobil Producing Nigeria Unlimited, Other Affiliate Mobil Producing Texas & New Mexico Inc., Other Affiliate Mobil Services (Bahamas) Limited, Other Affiliate Mobil Yanbu Petrochemical Company Inc., Other Affiliate Mobil Yanbu Refining Company Inc., Other Affiliate Mountain Gathering, LLC, Other Affiliate Palmetto Transoceanic LLC, Other Affiliate Phillips Exploration, LLC, Other Affiliate SeaRiver Maritime, Inc., Other Affiliate Trend Gathering & Treating, LLC, Other Affiliate XH, LLC, Other Affiliate XTO Energy Inc. for Exxon Mobil Corporation.(Lias Booker, Ava)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Gulf Oil Limited Partnership identifying Corporate Parent ArcLight Energy Partners Fund VI, L.P. for Gulf Oil Limited Partnership.(Burgess, Brian)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Holtzman Oil Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Holtzman Oil Corporation for Holtzman Oil Corporation.(Alfano, Alphonse)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Alphonse Michael Alfano on behalf of Holtzman Oil Corporation (Alfano, Alphonse)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Chad W. Higgins (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7169483.) by Cumberland Farms, Inc., Gulf Oil Limited Partnership(Burgess, Brian)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark E. Tully (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7169302.) by Cumberland Farms, Inc., Gulf Oil Limited Partnership(Burgess, Brian)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel R. Farino (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7169450.) by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation(Lias Booker, Ava)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Carlos M. Bollar (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7169399.) by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation(Lias Booker, Ava)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Guttman Energy, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Chubb, a Division of Federal Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Iron Shore Specialty Insurance Company for Guttman Energy, Inc..(Roach, Meagan)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Astra Oil Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Worldwide Energy AG Switzerland, Other Affiliate AOT Holding Ltd. for Astra Oil Company, LLC.(Witherup, Margaret)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 QC NOTICE: #117 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Cumberland Farms, Inc. was filed incorrectly. ***Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Lukoil Pan America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Litasco SA, Other Affiliate PJSC Lukoil for Lukoil Pan America, LLC.(Mullin, Connor)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by PJSC Lukoil (Mullin, Connor)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Lukoil Americas Corporation identifying Corporate Parent PJSC Lukoil for Lukoil Americas Corporation.(Mullin, Connor)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 QC NOTICE: #89 Local Rule, Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Guttman Energy, Inc. was filed incorrectly.***Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Lukoil North America LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lukoil Americas Corporation, Other Affiliate PJSC Lukoil for Lukoil North America LLC.(Mullin, Connor)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 QC NOTICE: #84 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Astra Oil Company, LLC was filed incorrectly. ***Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles Correll (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7168116.) by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., TRMI-H LLC, Texaco Inc.(Sale, Daniel)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James Maher (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7168115.) by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., TRMI-H LLC, Texaco Inc.(Sale, Daniel)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeremiah Anderson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7168113.) by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., TRMI-H LLC, Texaco Inc.(Sale, Daniel)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Equity, L.P. for Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P..(Lanham, Jayni)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sunoco, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Equity, L.P. for Sunoco, Inc..(Lanham, Jayni)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Other Affiliate MCP Investment LLC, Other Affiliate Gravcap, Inc., Other Affiliate Green Bay Terminal Corporation, Other Affiliate LOOP LLC, Other Affiliate Port Everglades Environmental Corp., Other Affiliate Resource Environmental, L.L.C., Other Affiliate Blanchard Holdings Company LLC, Other Affiliate Bonded Oil Company, Other Affiliate Catlettsburg Refining, LLC, Other Affiliate Marathon Petroleum Company Canada, Ltd., Other Affiliate Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC, Other Affiliate Marathon Refining Logistics Services LLC, Other Affiliate Marathon Petroleum Service Company, Other Affiliate Marathon Petroleum Trading Canada LLC, Other Affiliate Marathon Petroleum Supply LLC, Other Affiliate Marathon Pipe Line Company, Other Affiliate Marathon PrePaid Card LLC, Other Affiliate Marathon Renewable Supply LLC, Other Affiliate MPC Trade Receivables Company LLC, Other Affiliate MW Logistic Services LLC, Other Affiliate Niles Properties LLC, Other Affiliate Speedway Petroleum Corporation, Other Affiliate Starvin Marvin, Inc. for Marathon Petroleum Company LP; Other Affiliate MPC Investment LLC, Other Affiliate Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Other Affiliate Oil Insurance Limited, Other Affiliate Marathon Carbon Management LLC, Other Affiliate MPC Investment Fund, Inc., Other Affiliate Buckeye Assurance Corp., Other Affiliate Hardin Assurance Ltd. for Marathon Petroleum Corporation; Other Affiliate Marathon Oil Company, Other Affiliate MOC Portfolio Delaware Inc. for Marathon Oil Corporation.(Thomsen, Martha)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) identifying Corporate Parent Sunoco, Inc., Corporate Parent Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Equity, L.P. for Sunoco, Inc. (R&M).(Lanham, Jayni)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ETP Holdco Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Equity, L.P. for ETP Holdco Corporation.(Lanham, Jayni)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Energy Transfer Partners, L.P. identifying Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Equity, L.P. for Energy Transfer Partners, L.P..(Lanham, Jayni)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Phillips 66 Company identifying Corporate Parent Phillips 66 for Phillips 66 Company.(Pardo, Michelle)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company (Pardo, Michelle)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Western Refining Yorktown, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Western Refining Southwest, Inc., Other Affiliate Western Refining Yorktown Holding Company, Other Affiliate York River Fuels, LLC, Other Affiliate Dial Oil Co., LLC, Other Affiliate Empire Oil Co., Other Affiliate Wingate-Gallup Pipeline, LLC, Other Affiliate Western Refining Conan Gathering Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Giant Stop-N-Go of New Mexico, LLC, Other Affiliate Ciniza Production Company, Other Affiliate San Juan Refining Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Giant Four Corners, LLC, Other Affiliate Western Refining Logistics GP, LLC, Other Affiliate Western Refining Retail, LLC, Other Affiliate Western Refining TRS II, LLC for Western Refining Yorktown, Inc..(Thomsen, Martha)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha S Thomsen on behalf of Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Thomsen, Martha)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE by TOTAL Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Einik, Daniella)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha S Thomsen on behalf of Western Refining Yorktown, Inc. (Thomsen, Martha)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by TOTAL Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TOTAL Delaware, Inc., Corporate Parent TOTAL Holdings USA, Inc., Corporate Parent TOTAL GESTION USA, Corporate Parent TOTAL S.A. for TOTAL Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc..(Einik, Daniella)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 (FILED IN ERROR)Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Gulf Oil Limited Partnership (Burgess, Brian) Modified on 2/22/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cumberland Farms, Inc. (Burgess, Brian) Modified on 2/22/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 2/22/2018 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Diane L. Myers (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7168020.) by TOTAL Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.(Einik, Daniella)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher H. Domingo (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7168013.) by TOTAL Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.(Einik, Daniella)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha S Thomsen on behalf of Hess Corporation, Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation (Thomsen, Martha)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Traci L. Lovitt (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7168009.) by TOTAL Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.(Einik, Daniella)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hess Corporation, Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Hess Corporation, Other Affiliate Amerada Petroleum Corporation, Other Affiliate Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Other Affiliate Air Hangar, Inc., Other Affiliate Amerada Hess Nigeria Limited, Other Affiliate Amerada Petroleum Corporation of Libya, Other Affiliate Carigali Hess Operating Company Sdn. Bhd., Other Affiliate Crown Landing LLC, Other Affiliate Hess (ACG) Finance Company Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (ACG) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Agreb) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Algeria New Ventures) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Bahamas) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Borneo Block CAI) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Egypt) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (GEA) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Ghana) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Indonesia-Deepwater) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Indonesia-I) Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Indonesia-I) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Indonesia-III) Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Indonesia-III) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Indonesia-IV) Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Indonesia-IV) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Indonesia-Semai V) Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Indonesia-Semai V) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Indonesia-South Sesulu) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Indonesia-Tatihu) Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Indonesia-V) Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Indonesia-VIII) Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Indonesia-VIII) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Indonesia-West Timor) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Kazakhstan) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Luxembourg) Exploration and Production Holding S.a.r.l., Other Affiliate Hess (Malaysia-SB 302) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Netherlands) Exploration and Production Holding B.V., Other Affiliate Hess (Netherlands) Holding B.V., Other Affiliate Hess (Netherlands) International Holdings B.V., Other Affiliate Hess (Netherlands) Investments B.V., Other Affiliate Hess (Netherlands) Oil and Gas B.V., Other Affiliate Hess (Netherlands) Oil and Gas Holdings C.V., Other Affiliate Hess (Netherlands) U.S. Oil and Gas Holdings B.V., Other Affiliate Hess (Oil & Gas) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Pony) Holdings Corp., Other Affiliate Hess (Suriname II) Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Suriname II) Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess (Vietnam-Block 16/1) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Abu Dhabi Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Abu Dhabi Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Algeria Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Algeria Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Asia Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Hess Australia (Beetaloo) Pty Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Australia (Canning) Pty Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Australia (Dampier) Pty Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Australia Exploration (New Ventures) Pty Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Australia Holdings Pty Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Australia New Ventures Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Bakken Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Hess Bakken Holdings II Corporation, Other Affiliate Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Bakken Investments III, LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Bakken Investments IV, LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Bakken Processing LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Baldpate-Penn State LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Baldpate-Penn State Sub-Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Bermuda Holding Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Borneo (CA 1) Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Brasil (BM-S-22) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Brasil Petroleo Ltda., Other Affiliate Hess Brazil Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess BraZil Investments Limited, Other Affiliate Hess California LLC, Other Affiliate Hess California Sub-Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Canada (Labrador) Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Canada (Newfoundland) Exploration Ltd, Other Affiliate Hess Canada B.V., Other Affiliate Hess Canada Exploration and Production ULC, Other Affiliate Hess Canada Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Canada Gas Ltd., Other Affiliate Hess Canada Oil and Gas ULC, Other Affiliate Hess Capital Corporation S.a.r.l., Other Affiliate Hess Capital Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Capital Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Capital Services Corporation, Other Affiliate Hess Capital Services Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Hess Capital Services LLC, Other Affiliate Hess China (Santanghu) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess China Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess China Oil and Gas Limited, Other Affiliate Hess CO2 Resources LLC, Other Affiliate Hess CO2 Resources Sub-Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Colombia Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Colombia Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Communications Corporation, Other Affiliate Hess Conger LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Conger Sub-Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Deepwater USA Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Deepwater USA LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Denmark ApS, Other Affiliate Hess Egypt Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Egypt West Mediterranean Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Energy Exploration LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Energy Inc., Other Affiliate Hess Energy Marketing Derivatives, LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Energy Resources Sales LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Energy Services Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Equatorial Guinea Investments Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Exploration & Production Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Exploration (Bravo) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Exploration (Briseis) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Exploration (Carnarvon) Pty Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Exploration (Chester) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Exploration (Glencoe) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Exploration (Glenloth) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Exploration (Lightfinger) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Exploration (Mentore) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Exploration (Nimblefoot) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Exploration (Toporoa) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Exploration and Production Malaysia, B.V., Other Affiliate Hess Exploration Ireland Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Exploration Services Inc., Other Affiliate Hess Finance, Other Affiliate Hess Gabon Investments Limited, Other Affiliate Hess GEA Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Ghana (Paradise) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Ghana Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Ghana Investments I Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Ghana Investments II Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Ghana West Keta Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Ghana West Keta Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Global Employment Company LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Global Trading Limited, Other Affiliate Hess GOM Deepwater LLC, Other Affiliate Hess GOM Deepwater Sub-Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Hess GOM Exploration LLC, Other Affiliate Hess GOM Exploration Sub-Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Gulf of Mexico Ventures, LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Guyana (Block B) Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Guyana (Liza) Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Guyana (Kaieteur) Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Guyana (Pacora) Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Guyana (Payara) Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Guyana (Ranger) Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Guyana (Skipjack) Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Guyana (Snoek) Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Guyana (Sorubim) Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Guyana (Turbot) Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Guyana Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Holdings Algeria Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Holdings Indonesia West Timor Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Holdings S.a.r.l., Other Affiliate Hess Holdings EG Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Holdings UK Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Holdings West Africa Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Hungary Finance Kit, Other Affiliate Hess Infrastructure Partners GP LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Infrastructure Partners Finance Corporation, Other Affiliate Hess Infrastructure Partners LP, Other Affiliate Hess International Finance Limited, Other Affiliate Hess International Finance LLC, Other Affiliate Hess International Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Hess International Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess International Limited, Other Affiliate Hess International Oil Corporation, Other Affiliate Hess International Sales LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Investments North Dakota LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Kurdistan (Dinarta) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Kurdistan (Shakrok) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Libya (Waha) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Libya Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Libya Holdings B.V., Other Affiliate Hess Libya Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Libya Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Llano LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Llano Sub-Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Hess LM4 Plant LLC, Other Affiliate Hess LNG Crown Landing LLC, Other Affiliate Hess LNG Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Hess LNG Limited, Other Affiliate Hess LNG LLC, Other Affiliate Hess LNG Trading LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Luxembourg S.a.r.l., Other Affiliate Hess Magreb Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Malaysia (Alamanda) Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Malaysia and Thailand Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Mentor Storage Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Mentor Storage, LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Mexico Investments B.V., Other Affiliate Hess Mexico Oil and Gas, S. De R.L. De C.V., Other Affiliate Hess Mexico Operating Company LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Mexico Service LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Mexico South GOM Exploration Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Microgen LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Middle East Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Middle East New Ventures Limited, Other Affiliate Hess Midstream Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Midstream New Ventures LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Midstream Partners GP LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Midstream Partners GP LP, Other Affiliate Hess Midstream Partners LP, Other Affiliate Hess Midstream Partners Operations LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Namibia Corporation, Other Affiliate Hess Netherlands LLC, Other Affiliate Hess Netherlands Partnership Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Hess New Business Limite
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniella Adar Einik on behalf of TOTAL Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. (Einik, Daniella)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James F. Sanders (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7167973.) by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation(Lias Booker, Ava)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Candace Ali Blydenburgh (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7167966.) by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation(Lias Booker, Ava)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan P. Harmon (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7167948.) by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation(Lias Booker, Ava)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Wawa, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent WAWA Inc. for Wawa, Inc..(Stouck, Jerry)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Transmontaigne Product Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Transmontaigne Product Services, LLC for Transmontaigne Product Services, LLC.(Stouck, Jerry)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sheetz, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sheetz, Inc. for Sheetz, Inc..(Stouck, Jerry)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C Condron on behalf of Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Trading (US) Company (Condron, Peter)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Kinder Morgan Transmix Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. "A", Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan, Inc., Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan GP, Inc. for Kinder Morgan Transmix Company, LLC.(Scotti, Brian)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. A identifying Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan, Inc., Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan GP, Inc. for Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. A.(Scotti, Brian)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan, Inc. for Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc..(Scotti, Brian)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company identifying Corporate Parent El Paso CGP Company, L.L.C., Corporate Parent Kinder Morgan, Inc. for El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company.(Scotti, Brian)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lisa S. Meyer (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7167766.) by CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P.(Hovermill, Joseph)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Stouck on behalf of Wawa, Inc. (Stouck, Jerry)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Stouck on behalf of Transmontaigne Product Services, LLC (Stouck, Jerry)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Pamela R. Hanebutt (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7167733.) by CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P.(Hovermill, Joseph)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nathan P. Eimer (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7167706.) by CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Hovermill, Joseph)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Stouck on behalf of Sheetz, Inc. (Stouck, Jerry)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P. identifying Other Affiliate CITGO Petroleum Corporation, Other Affiliate CITGO Investment Company for CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P..(Hovermill, Joseph)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CITGO Petroleum Corporation identifying Corporate Parent PDV Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent CITGO Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent Petroleos de Venezuela S.A. for CITGO Petroleum Corporation.(Hovermill, Joseph)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan H. Schaefer (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7167620.) by Astra Oil Company, LLC(Witherup, Margaret)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph William Hovermill on behalf of CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P. (Hovermill, Joseph)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3, Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Guttman Energy, Inc. (Roach, Meagan) Modified on 2/22/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Peter Creticos on behalf of CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P. (Creticos, Alexander)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Meagan Elizabeth Roach on behalf of Guttman Energy, Inc. (Roach, Meagan)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Lanham Beavers on behalf of CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P. (Beavers, Joseph)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Peter R. Knight (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7167533.) by Astra Oil Company, LLC(Witherup, Margaret)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 (FILED IN ERROR)Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Astra Oil Company, LLC (Witherup, Margaret) Modified on 2/22/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hartree Partners, LP (Gollogly, Ezra)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M Witherup on behalf of Astra Oil Company, LLC (Witherup, Margaret)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Ezra Gollogly on behalf of Hartree Partners, LP (Gollogly, Ezra)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Erika M. Anderson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7167478.) by Premcor USA Inc., The Premcor Refining Group Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company(Gollogly, Ezra)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Meghan E. Ball (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7167457.) by Premcor USA Inc., The Premcor Refining Group Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company(Gollogly, Ezra)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Premcor USA Inc., The Premcor Refining Group Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company identifying Corporate Parent Valero Energy Corporation for Valero Refining and Marketing Company.(Gollogly, Ezra)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Premcor USA Inc., The Premcor Refining Group Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company (Gollogly, Ezra)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Premcor USA Inc., The Premcor Refining Group Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company identifying Corporate Parent Valero Energy Corporation for Valero Marketing and Supply Company.(Gollogly, Ezra)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Premcor USA Inc., The Premcor Refining Group Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company identifying Corporate Parent Valero Energy Corporation for The Premcor Refining Group Inc..(Gollogly, Ezra)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Premcor USA Inc., The Premcor Refining Group Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company identifying Corporate Parent Valero Energy Corporation for Premcor USA Inc..(Gollogly, Ezra)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Ezra Gollogly on behalf of Premcor USA Inc., The Premcor Refining Group Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company (Gollogly, Ezra)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Andrew Langan by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Carrier, William)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin O'Connor by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Carrier, William)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew R. Running by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Carrier, William)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amanda Jacobowski by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Carrier, William)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Burgess on behalf of Cumberland Farms, Inc., Gulf Oil Limited Partnership (Burgess, Brian)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Duke Energy Merchants, LLC (Wedeking, James)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by James R Wedeking on behalf of Duke Energy Merchants, LLC (Wedeking, James)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by George E. Warren Corporation (Donovan, Daniel)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Donovan on behalf of George E. Warren Corporation (Donovan, Daniel)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by TRMI-H LLC identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for TRMI-H LLC.(Sale, Daniel)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Texaco Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Texaco Inc..(Sale, Daniel)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Chevron U.S.A. Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Chevron U.S.A. Inc..(Sale, Daniel)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Chevron Corporation (Sale, Daniel)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C Sale on behalf of TRMI-H LLC (Sale, Daniel)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C Sale on behalf of Texaco Inc. (Sale, Daniel)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C Sale on behalf of Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Sale, Daniel)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Anne Lynch. Directing attorney Anne Lynch to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brian L Zagon. Directing attorney Brian L Zagon to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Courtney Jones Kieffer. Directing attorney Courtney Jones Kieffer to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Elizabeth Griffin. Directing attorney Elizabeth Griffin to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael A Walsh. Directing attorney Michael A Walsh to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Gabriel Kaim. Directing attorney Gabriel Kaim to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jessica G Farley. Directing attorney Jessica G Farley to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephen C Dillard. Directing attorney Stephen C Dillard to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by 7-Eleven, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SEJ Asset Management & Investment Company for 7-Eleven, Inc..(Adler, Gary)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 QC NOTICE: #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by BP Products North America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 QC NOTICE: #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by BP Products North America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 QC NOTICE: #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by BP Products North America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 QC NOTICE: #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by BP Products North America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 QC NOTICE: #41 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Shell Trading (US) Company, #42 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by TMR Company, #37 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC, #38 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Motiva Enterprises LLC, #40 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Shell Oil Products Company LLC, #39 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Shell Oil Company was filed incorrectly.***Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 (FILED IN ERROR)Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by TMR Company (Condron, Peter) Modified on 2/21/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 (FILED IN ERROR)Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Shell Trading (US) Company (Condron, Peter) Modified on 2/21/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 (FILED IN ERROR)Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Shell Oil Products Company LLC (Condron, Peter) Modified on 2/21/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 (FILED IN ERROR)Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Shell Oil Company (Condron, Peter) Modified on 2/21/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 (FILED IN ERROR)Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Motiva Enterprises LLC (Condron, Peter) Modified on 2/21/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 (FILED IN ERROR)Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Equilon Enterprises LLC (Condron, Peter) Modified on 2/21/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anne E. Lynch (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7165017.) by NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P.(Goodstein, Michael)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian L. Zagon (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7164992.) by NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P.(Goodstein, Michael)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P. identifying Corporate Parent NuStar Terminals Operations Partnerships, L.P., Other Affiliate NuStar Terminal Services, Inc., Other Affiliate NuStar Pipeline Operating Partnership, Other Affiliate NuStar Energy, L.P., Other Affiliate NuStar GP Holdings, LLC for NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P..(Goodstein, Michael)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P. identifying Corporate Parent NuStar Terminals Operations Partnerships, L.P., Other Affiliate NuStar Terminal Services, Inc., Other Affiliate NuStar Pipeline Operating Partnership, Other Affiliate NuStar Energy, L.P., Other Affiliate NuStar GP Holdings, LLC for NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P..(Goodstein, Michael) Modified on 2/20/2018 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D Goodstein on behalf of NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P. (Goodstein, Michael)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary C Adler on behalf of 7-Eleven, Inc. (Adler, Gary)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Courtney Jones Kieffer (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7164344.) by 7-Eleven, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Adler, Gary)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth F. Griffin (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7164324.) by 7-Eleven, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Adler, Gary)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael A. Walsh (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7164290.) by 7-Eleven, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Adler, Gary)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa O Martinez on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation (Martinez, Melissa)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Ava E Lias Booker on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation (Lias Booker, Ava)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gabriel D. Kaim (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7164173.) by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66 Company(Pardo, Michelle)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jessica G. Farley (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7164158.) by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66 Company(Pardo, Michelle)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen C. Dillard (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7164128.) by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66 Company(Pardo, Michelle)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Ciszak Pardo on behalf of ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66 Company (Pardo, Michelle)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Marginal ORDER APPROVING #16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #2 Complaint. Atlantic Richfield Company answer due 4/2/2018. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 2/20/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Andrew Langan (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7163022.) by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc.(Carrier, William)
February 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin O'Connor (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7163021.) by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc.(Carrier, William)
February 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amanda Jacobowski (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7163017.) by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc.(Carrier, William)
February 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew R. Running (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7162984.) by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc.(Carrier, William)
February 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Atlantic Richfield Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Consenting Defendants)(Carrier, William) Modified on 2/20/2018 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by BP Products North America Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP Corporation North America Inc., Corporate Parent BP Holdings North America Limited, Corporate Parent BP Company North America, Inc., Corporate Parent BP p.l.c., Corporate Parent BP America, Inc., Corporate Parent BP America Limited, Corporate Parent The Standard Oil Company for BP Products North America Inc..(Isbister, John)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by BP Corporation North America Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP America, Inc., Corporate Parent BP Holdings North America Limited, Corporate Parent BP p.l.c., Corporate Parent BP America Limited for BP Corporation North America Inc..(Isbister, John)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by BP Amoco Chemical Company identifying Corporate Parent BP America, Inc., Corporate Parent BP Corporation North America Inc., Corporate Parent BP Holdings North America Limited, Corporate Parent BP Company North America, Inc., Corporate Parent BP p.l.c., Corporate Parent BP America Limited for BP Amoco Chemical Company.(Isbister, John)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by BP America Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c., Corporate Parent BP Holdings North America Limited, Corporate Parent BP America Limited for BP America Inc..(Isbister, John)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Richfield Company identifying Corporate Parent BP America, Inc., Corporate Parent BP p.l.c., Corporate Parent BP Holdings North America Limited, Corporate Parent BP America Limited for Atlantic Richfield Company.(Isbister, John)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 2/15/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Defendant's Rule 103.5 (a) Cettification by Atlantic Richfield Company (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Atlantic Richfield Company (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-8) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY MARYLAND. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued 30 days as to Atlantic Richfield Company.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against 7-Eleven, Inc., Apex Oil Company, Inc., Astra Oil Company, LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc., CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Cumberland Farms, Inc., Duke Energy Merchants, LLC, ETP Holdco Corporation, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Equilon Enterprises LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, George E. Warren Corporation, Getty Petroleum Marketing Inc., Getty Properties Corp., Gulf Oil Limited Partnership, Guttman Energy, Inc., Hartree Partners, LP, Hess Corporation, Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Holtzman Oil Corporation, Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc., Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. A, Kinder Morgan Transmix Company, LLC, Lukoil Americas Corporation, Lukoil North America LLC, Lukoil Pan America, LLC, Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Mobile Corporation, Motiva Enterprises LLC, NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P., PJSC Lukoil, Phillips 66 Company, Premcor USA Inc., Sheetz, Inc., Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Trading (US) Company, Sun Company, Inc., Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P., Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), TMR Company, TOTAL Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc., TRMI-H LLC, Texaco Inc., The Premcor Refining Group Inc., Transmontaigne Product Services, LLC, Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company, Vitol S.A., Wawa, Inc., Western Refining Yorktown, Inc., filed by State of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City Maryland, case number 24-C-17-6343. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637104038), filed by Atlantic Richfield Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2018: #2 Exhibit 2) (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Maryland v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumberland Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Mark E Tully
Represented By: Ashley Moore Drake
Represented By: Brian Burgess
Represented By: Chad W Higgins
Represented By: Tierney Smith
Represented By: Timothy Bazzle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Products Company LLC
Represented By: Peter C Condron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Corporation
Represented By: Jeremiah J Anderson
Represented By: James J Maher
Represented By: Charles Correll
Represented By: Daniel C Sale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Company, Inc.
Represented By: Hilary Tess Jacobs
Represented By: John S Guttmann
Represented By: Daniel A. Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PJSC Lukoil
Represented By: Katherine Katchen
Represented By: Connor Mullin
Represented By: Stanley E Woodward, Jr
Represented By: Lide Evans Paterno
Represented By: Lide E. Paterno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P.
Represented By: Alexander Peter Creticos
Represented By: Susan M Razzano
Represented By: Lisa S Meyer
Represented By: Pamela R Hanebutt
Represented By: Nathan P Eimer
Represented By: Joseph Lanham Beavers
Represented By: Joseph William Hovermill
Represented By: Emily Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getty Petroleum Marketing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Premcor Refining Group Inc.
Represented By: Ezra Gollogly
Represented By: Erika M Anderson
Represented By: Meghan E Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Amoco Chemical Company
Represented By: William W Carrier, III
Represented By: J Andrew Langan
Represented By: Andrew R. Running
Represented By: Benjamin O'Connor
Represented By: John Bucher Isbister
Represented By: Amanda A Jacobowski
Represented By: Anne J Hudson
Represented By: Thomas Leahy
Represented By: Thomas James Leahy
Represented By: Kelli M. Mulder
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Inc.
Represented By: Jeremiah J Anderson
Represented By: James J Maher
Represented By: Charles Correll
Represented By: Daniel C Sale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Inc.
Represented By: William W Carrier, III
Represented By: J Andrew Langan
Represented By: Andrew R. Running
Represented By: Benjamin O'Connor
Represented By: John Bucher Isbister
Represented By: Amanda A Jacobowski
Represented By: Anne J Hudson
Represented By: Thomas Leahy
Represented By: Thomas James Leahy
Represented By: Erin M Reynolds
Represented By: Kelli M. Mulder
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan Transmix Company, LLC
Represented By: Brian A Scotti
Represented By: James Messenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Refining Yorktown, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Danley
Represented By: Martha S Thomsen
Represented By: Joshua Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P.
Represented By: Brian L Zagon
Represented By: Anne E Lynch
Represented By: Michael D Goodstein
Represented By: Ani M Esenyan
Represented By: Xena Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company
Represented By: Brian A Scotti
Represented By: James Messenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheetz, Inc.
Represented By: Dawn Allison Ellison
Represented By: Jerry Stouck
Represented By: Caleb J Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lukoil Americas Corporation
Represented By: Katherine Katchen
Represented By: Connor Mullin
Represented By: Stanley E Woodward, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Lee Sorkin
Represented By: Anne M Evans
Represented By: Lide Evans Paterno
Represented By: Lide E. Paterno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P.
Represented By: Hilary Tess Jacobs
Represented By: John S Guttmann
Represented By: Daniel A. Eisenberg
Represented By: Graham C. Zorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitol S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Danley
Represented By: Martha S Thomsen
Represented By: Joshua Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Katherine Carol Ondeck
Represented By: Michelle Ciszak Pardo
Represented By: Matthew R Thurlow
Represented By: Jessica G Farley
Represented By: Gabriel Kaim
Represented By: Stephen C Dillard
Represented By: Laura Robinson Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOTAL Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher H Domingo
Represented By: Traci Lovitt
Represented By: Daniella Adar Einik
Represented By: Diane Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Danley
Represented By: Martha S Thomsen
Represented By: Joshua Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wawa, Inc.
Represented By: Dawn Allison Ellison
Represented By: Jerry Stouck
Represented By: Caleb J Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lukoil Pan America, LLC
Represented By: Katherine Katchen
Represented By: Connor Mullin
Represented By: Stanley E Woodward, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Lee Sorkin
Represented By: Anne M Evans
Represented By: Lide Evans Paterno
Represented By: Lide E. Paterno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile Corporation
Represented By: Daniel R Farino
Represented By: James Franklin Sanders
Represented By: Lisa Gerson
Represented By: Melissa O Martinez
Represented By: Nathan Sanders
Represented By: Candace Ali Blydenburgh
Represented By: James Pardo
Represented By: Carlos Bollar
Represented By: Jonathan Paul Harmon
Represented By: Ava E Lias Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getty Properties Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Fin