Hyperheal Hyperbarics, Inc. v. Shapiro

Plaintiff: Hyperheal Hyperbarics, Inc.
Defendant: Eric Shapiro
Case Number: 1:2018cv01679
Filed: June 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: Richard D. Bennett
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER/ ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; denying 49 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot 60 Motion for Leave to File Surreply; adopting Report and Recommendations re 82 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/22/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's 55 Motion to extend discovery as set forth. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 3/4/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM ORDER re: 49 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Hyperheal Hyperbarics, Inc. shall be referred to a Magistrate judge, who will issue proposed findings of fact and recommendations to the District judge. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/15/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/6/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyperheal Hyperbarics, Inc. v. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyperheal Hyperbarics, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Andrew Campsen
Represented By: Stephen H Kaufman
Represented By: Donald J Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Shapiro
Represented By: John Michael Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?