Charles Schwab Futures, Inc. v. Eastern Savings Bank, FSB
Petitioner: Charles Schwab Futures, Inc. f/k/a Optionsxpress, Inc. and Charles Schwab Futures, Inc.
Respondent: Eastern Savings Bank, FSB
Interested Party: Jonathan I. Feldman
Case Number: 1:2018cv02153
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:7
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Schwab Futures, Inc.. Eastern Savings Bank, FSB served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018.(Corchiarino, Christopher)
July 17, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Eastern Savings Bank, FSB, Jonathan I. Feldman.(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2018 CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 0416-7448788(Corchiarino, Christopher)
July 17, 2018 The case of Charles Schwab Futures, Inc. v. Eastern Savings Bank, FSB, has been opened in the District of Maryland. The case number is CCB-18-2153. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within 48 hours. To pay online, select the event Civil Case Filing Fee which is found under Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents. Otherwise, forward a check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and note the assigned case number on the check or cover letter. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Charles Schwab Futures, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Summons to Eastern Savings Bank, FSB and Jonathan I. Feldman (Corchiarino, Christopher)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Charles Schwab Futures, Inc. f/k/a Optionsxpress, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate optionsXpress Holdings, Inc. for Charles Schwab Futures, Inc. f/k/a Optionsxpress, Inc..(Corchiarino, Christopher)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Compel Response to Subpoena in Connection With Financial Industry Regulatory Authority Arbitration against Eastern Savings Bank, FSB, filed by Charles Schwab Futures, Inc. f/k/a Optionsxpress, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Corchiarino, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles Schwab Futures, Inc. v. Eastern Savings Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eastern Savings Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Schwab Futures, Inc. f/k/a Optionsxpress, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M Corchiarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Schwab Futures, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M Corchiarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jonathan I. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?