Tang v. The University of Baltimore

Plaintiff: Hong Tang
Defendant: The University of Baltimore
Case Number: 1:2018cv02200
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983vp
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to The University of Baltimore.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing the Clerk to take all necessary steps to prepare and issue summons. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 9/5/2018. (c/m 9/06/18 bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 Supplement to #1 Complaint filed by Hong Tang (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting Plaintiff 28 days to file a Supplement to the Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/25/2018. (c/m 7/25/18 bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The University of Baltimore ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637032679.), filed by Hong Tang. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(heps, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tang v. The University of Baltimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Baltimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hong Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?