Mayor and City Council of Baltimore v. BP P.L.C., et al
Plaintiff: Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore
Defendant: Chevron Corp., Phillips 66 Company, Consol Energy Inc., BP America, Inc., Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Citgo Petroleum Corp., Consol Marine Terminals LLC, Crown Central LLC, Hess Corp., Marathon Petroleum Corporation, ConocoPhillips Company, BP P.L.C., ConocoPhillips, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., BP Products North America Inc., Phillips 66, Louisiana Land & Exploration Co., Crown Central Petroleum Corporation, CNX Resources Corporation, Exxonmobil Oil Corporation, Crown Central New Holdings LLC, Exxon Mobil Corp., Marathon Oil Corporation, Shell Oil Company, Speedway LLC and Marathon Oil Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv02357
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 111 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Sher, Victor)
September 11, 2018 Filing 110 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #107 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Steven Bauer. Directing attorney Steven Bauer to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2018 Filing 109 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #106 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Margaret Tough. Directing attorney Margaret Tough to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2018 Filing 108 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Phillips 66 (Su, Jonathan)
September 10, 2018 Filing 107 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven Mark Bauer (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7551530.) by Phillips 66(Su, Jonathan)
September 10, 2018 Filing 106 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Margaret A. Tough (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7551523.) by Phillips 66(Su, Jonathan)
September 10, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Chunwei Su on behalf of Phillips 66 (Su, Jonathan)
August 31, 2018 Filing 104 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #98 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Raphael Janove. Directing attorney Raphael Janove to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/31/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2018 Filing 103 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #97 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lisa S Meyer. Directing attorney Lisa S Meyer to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/31/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2018 Filing 102 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #96 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Pamela R Hanebutt. Directing attorney Pamela R Hanebutt to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/31/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2018 Filing 101 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #95 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nathan P Eimer. Directing attorney Nathan P Eimer to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/31/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2018 Filing 100 Local Rule 103.5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cronin, Tonya)
August 29, 2018 Filing 99 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Citgo Petroleum Corp. identifying Corporate Parent CITGO Petroleum Corporation, Corporate Parent Petroleos de Venezuela S.A., Other Affiliate PDV Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate CITGO Holding, Inc. for Citgo Petroleum Corp..(Weaver, Warren)
August 29, 2018 Filing 98 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Raphael Janove (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7532119.) by Citgo Petroleum Corp.(Weaver, Warren)
August 29, 2018 Filing 97 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lisa S. Meyer (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7532111.) by Citgo Petroleum Corp.(Weaver, Warren)
August 29, 2018 Filing 96 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Pamela R. Hanebutt (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7532103.) by Citgo Petroleum Corp.(Weaver, Warren)
August 29, 2018 Filing 95 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nathan P. Eimer (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7532054.) by Citgo Petroleum Corp.(Weaver, Warren)
August 29, 2018 Filing 94 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #91 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Shawn Regan. Directing attorney Shawn Regan to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/29/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2018 Filing 93 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #90 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ann Marie Mortimer. Directing attorney Ann Marie Mortimer to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/29/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2018 Filing 92 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #89 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Shannon Broome. Directing attorney Shannon Broome to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/29/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2018 Filing 91 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shawn Patrick Regan (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7525886.) by Speedway LLC(Koyama, Perie)
August 27, 2018 Filing 90 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ann Marie Mortimer (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7525874.) by Speedway LLC(Koyama, Perie)
August 27, 2018 Filing 89 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shannon S. Broome (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7525847.) by Speedway LLC(Koyama, Perie)
August 27, 2018 Filing 88 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Speedway LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Other Affiliate MPC Investment LLC for Speedway LLC.(Koyama, Perie)
August 27, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Perie Reiko Koyama on behalf of Speedway LLC (Koyama, Perie)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #85 Motion to Increase Page Limits for Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/24/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2018 Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Remand by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Increase Page Limits, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Edling, Matthew)
August 22, 2018 Filing 84 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Philip H. Curtis. Directing attorney Philip H. Curtis to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 83 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #68 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Matthew T. Heartney. Directing attorney Matthew T. Heartney to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 82 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #67 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jonathan Hughes. Directing attorney Jonathan Hughes to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 81 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #66 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John D Lombardo. Directing attorney John D Lombardo to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 80 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #65 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nancy Milburn. Directing attorney Nancy Milburn to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 79 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #59 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Matthew Edling. Directing attorney Matthew Edling to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 78 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #58 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Victor Sher. Directing attorney Victor Sher to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 77 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jonathan R Siegel. Directing attorney Jonathan R Siegel to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 76 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ben Germana. Directing attorney Ben Germana to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 75 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John Savarese. Directing attorney John Savarese to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 74 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #54 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sean Grimsley. Directing attorney Sean Grimsley to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 73 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jameson Jones. Directing attorney Jameson Jones to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 72 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Theodore V Wells, Jr. Directing attorney Theodore V Wells, Jr to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 71 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel Toal. Directing attorney Daniel Toal to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 70 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #50 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jaren Janghorbani. Directing attorney Jaren Janghorbani to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/22/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Philip H. Curtis (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7518779.) by BP America, Inc., BP P.L.C., BP Products North America Inc.(Isbister, John)
August 22, 2018 Filing 68 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew T. Heartney (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7518766.) by BP America, Inc., BP P.L.C., BP Products North America Inc.(Isbister, John)
August 22, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan W. Hughes (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7518757.) by BP America, Inc., BP P.L.C., BP Products North America Inc.(Isbister, John)
August 22, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John D. Lombardo (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7518751.) by BP America, Inc., BP P.L.C., BP Products North America Inc.(Isbister, John)
August 22, 2018 Filing 65 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nancy G. Milburn (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7518668.) by BP America, Inc., BP P.L.C., BP Products North America Inc.(Isbister, John)
August 22, 2018 Filing 64 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by BP America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP America Limited, Other Affiliate BP p.l.c., Other Affiliate BP Holdings North America Limited for BP America, Inc..(Isbister, John)
August 22, 2018 Filing 63 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by BP Products North America Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Standard Oil Company, Other Affiliate BP Corporation North America Inc., Other Affiliate BP p.l.c., Other Affiliate BP Holdings North America Limited, Other Affiliate BP Company North America Inc., Other Affiliate BP America Inc., Other Affiliate BP America Limited for BP Products North America Inc..(Isbister, John)
August 22, 2018 Filing 62 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by BP P.L.C. (Isbister, John)
August 22, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime Walker Luse on behalf of BP America, Inc., BP P.L.C. (Luse, Jaime)
August 22, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by John Bucher Isbister on behalf of BP America, Inc., BP P.L.C. (Isbister, John)
August 21, 2018 Filing 59 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew K. Edling by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore. The fee has already been paid.(Martinez, Elizabeth)
August 21, 2018 Filing 58 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Victor M. Sher by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore. The fee has already been paid.(Martinez, Elizabeth)
August 17, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan R. Siegel (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7510724.) by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company(Brown, Michael)
August 17, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ben M. Germana (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7510721.) by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company(Brown, Michael)
August 17, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John F. Savarese (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7510714.) by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company(Brown, Michael)
August 17, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sean C. Grimsley (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7508861.) by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Louisiana Land & Exploration Co.(Brown, Michael)
August 17, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jameson R. Jones (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7508837.) by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Louisiana Land & Exploration Co.(Brown, Michael)
August 16, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Theodore V. Wells, Jr. (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7507252.) by Exxon Mobil Corp., Exxonmobil Oil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Craig)
August 16, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel J. Toal (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7507243.) by Exxon Mobil Corp., Exxonmobil Oil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Craig)
August 16, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jaren Janghorbani (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7507216.) by Exxon Mobil Corp., Exxonmobil Oil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Craig)
August 16, 2018 Filing 49 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Exxon Mobil Corp., Exxonmobil Oil Corporation (Thompson, Craig)
August 16, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig A Thompson on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., Exxonmobil Oil Corporation (Thompson, Craig)
August 16, 2018 Filing 47 [FILED IN ERROR - per atty] MOTION for Leave to Appear Entry of Appearanceof Craig A. Thompson by Exxon Mobil Corp., Exxonmobil Oil Corporation(Thompson, Craig) Modified on 8/16/2018 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
August 16, 2018 Filing 46 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by BP Products North America Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP Corporation North America Inc., Corporate Parent BP p.l.c., Corporate Parent BP Company North America Inc., Corporate Parent BP America Inc. for BP Products North America Inc..(Isbister, John)
August 16, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Nicole Lipkowitz on behalf of Crown Central LLC, Crown Central New Holdings LLC (Lipkowitz, Michelle)
August 16, 2018 Filing 44 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Consol Energy Inc., Consol Marine Terminals LLC identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc., Corporate Parent BlackRock Fund Advisors for Consol Energy Inc.; Corporate Parent CONSOL Energy Sales Company LLC for Consol Marine Terminals LLC.(Roman, Tracy)
August 16, 2018 Filing 43 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kathleen Taylor Sooy. Directing attorney Kathleen Taylor Sooy to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/16/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 42 COMPLAINT against BP America, Inc., BP P.L.C., BP Products North America Inc., CNX Resources Corporation, Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Citgo Petroleum Corp., ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Consol Energy Inc., Consol Marine Terminals LLC, Crown Central LLC, Crown Central New Holdings LLC, Crown Central Petroleum Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corp., Exxonmobil Oil Corporation, Hess Corp., Louisiana Land & Exploration Co., Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Company, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Speedway LLC, filed by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 41 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CNX Resources Corporation (Roman, Tracy)
August 16, 2018 Filing 40 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Crown Central LLC, Crown Central New Holdings LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rosemore Holdings, Inc. for Crown Central LLC, Crown Central New Holdings LLC.(Prevas, Thomas)
August 16, 2018 Filing 39 QC NOTICE: #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 38 QC NOTICE: #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 37 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by CNX Resources Corporation, Consol Energy Inc., Consol Marine Terminals LLC.(Roman, Tracy)
August 16, 2018 Filing 36 QC NOTICE: #30 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Crown Central New Holdings LLC, Crown Central LLC was filed incorrectly. **Corporate affiliates must be added when prompted by the system. Refile and enter parents/affiliates for the appropriate party. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2018 Filing 35 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ConocoPhillips Company identifying Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips for ConocoPhillips Company.(Brown, Michael)
August 15, 2018 Filing 34 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ConocoPhillips (Brown, Michael)
August 15, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn C Schlie on behalf of ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company (Schlie, Lynn)
August 15, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Leianne S McEvoy on behalf of ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company (McEvoy, Leianne)
August 15, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Alan Brown on behalf of ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company (Brown, Michael)
August 15, 2018 Filing 30 [FILED IN ERROR] Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Crown Central LLC, Crown Central New Holdings LLC (Prevas, Thomas) Modified on 8/16/2018 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
August 15, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas K Prevas on behalf of Crown Central LLC, Crown Central New Holdings LLC (Prevas, Thomas)
August 14, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A. Inc..(Cronin, Tonya)
August 14, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime Walker Luse on behalf of BP Products North America Inc. (Luse, Jaime)
August 14, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by John Bucher Isbister on behalf of BP Products North America Inc. (Isbister, John)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER regarding #20 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Extensions of Time and to Set Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/14/2018. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kathleen Taylor Sooy (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7500861.) by CNX Resources Corporation, Consol Energy Inc., Consol Marine Terminals LLC(Roman, Tracy)
August 14, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy A Roman on behalf of CNX Resources Corporation, Consol Energy Inc., Consol Marine Terminals LLC (Roman, Tracy)
August 14, 2018 Filing 22 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Shell Oil Company identifying Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell plc, Corporate Parent Shell Petroleum Inc. for Shell Oil Company.(Webster, James)
August 14, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by James M Webster, III on behalf of Shell Oil Company (Webster, James)
August 13, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION by Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A. Inc.(Cronin, Tonya)
August 10, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew K. Edling (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7496592.) by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore(Martinez, Elizabeth)
August 10, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Victor M. Sher (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7496512.) by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore(Martinez, Elizabeth)
August 10, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ryan Martinez on behalf of Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore (Martinez, Elizabeth)
August 9, 2018 Filing 16 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore (Sangree, Suzanne)
August 9, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne Sangree on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sangree, Suzanne)
August 9, 2018 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Louisiana Land & Exploration Co. identifying Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips Company, Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips, Corporate Parent Burlington Resources Trading LLC, Corporate Parent Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Company LP, Corporate Parent BROG GP LLC, Corporate Parent BROG LP LLC, Corporate Parent Burlington Resources LLC for Louisiana Land & Exploration Co..(Brown, Michael)
August 8, 2018 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joshua Lipshutz. Directing attorney Joshua Lipshutz to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/8/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2018 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Theodore Boutrous. Directing attorney Theodore Boutrous to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/8/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2018 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Anne Champion. Directing attorney Anne Champion to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/8/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2018 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A. Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Chevron U.S.A. Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Chevron Investments, Inc., Other Affiliate Texaco, Inc. for Chevron U.S.A. Inc..(Cronin, Tonya)
August 7, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joshua Lipshutz (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7488561.) by Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cronin, Tonya)
August 7, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Theodore Boutrous, Jr. (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7488552.) by Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cronin, Tonya)
August 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anne Champion (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7488536.) by Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A. Inc.(Cronin, Tonya)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/2/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Aron U Raskas on behalf of Chevron Corp. (Raskas, Aron)
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Biran on behalf of Chevron Corp. (Biran, Jonathan)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tonya Kelly Cronin on behalf of Chevron Corp. (Cronin, Tonya)
July 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal by Chevron Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cronin, Tonya) (Exhibit A - Complaint rec'd 8/2/2018 and FILED SEPARATELY)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-18-004219. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7477289), filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronin, Tonya) Modified on 8/2/2018 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore v. BP P.L.C., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Corp.
Represented By: Tonya Kelly Cronin
Represented By: Joshua S Lipshutz
Represented By: Aron U Raskas
Represented By: Jonathan Biran
Represented By: Theodore J Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Anne Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66 Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consol Energy Inc.
Represented By: Tracy A Roman
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America, Inc.
Represented By: John Bucher Isbister
Represented By: John D Lombardo
Represented By: Nancy G Milburn
Represented By: Jonathan W Hughes
Represented By: Jaime Walker Luse
Represented By: Philip H. Curtis
Represented By: Matthew T. Heartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Dutch Shell PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citgo Petroleum Corp.
Represented By: Raphael Janove
Represented By: Lisa S Meyer
Represented By: Warren N Weaver
Represented By: Pamela R Hanebutt
Represented By: Nathan P Eimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consol Marine Terminals LLC
Represented By: Tracy A Roman
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Central LLC
Represented By: Michelle Nicole Lipkowitz
Represented By: Thomas K Prevas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Michael Alan Brown
Represented By: Leianne S McEvoy
Represented By: Lynn C Schlie
Represented By: Jonathan R Siegel
Represented By: Ben M Germana
Represented By: Jameson R Jones
Represented By: Sean C Grimsley
Represented By: John F Savarese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP P.L.C.
Represented By: John Bucher Isbister
Represented By: John D Lombardo
Represented By: Nancy G Milburn
Represented By: Jonathan W Hughes
Represented By: Jaime Walker Luse
Represented By: Philip H. Curtis
Represented By: Matthew T. Heartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips
Represented By: Michael Alan Brown
Represented By: Leianne S McEvoy
Represented By: Lynn C Schlie
Represented By: Jonathan R Siegel
Represented By: Ben M Germana
Represented By: Jameson R Jones
Represented By: Sean C Grimsley
Represented By: John F Savarese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Tonya Kelly Cronin
Represented By: Joshua S Lipshutz
Represented By: Theodore J Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Anne Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America Inc.
Represented By: John Bucher Isbister
Represented By: John D Lombardo
Represented By: Nancy G Milburn
Represented By: Jonathan W Hughes
Represented By: Jaime Walker Luse
Represented By: Philip H. Curtis
Represented By: Matthew T. Heartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66
Represented By: Margaret A Tough
Represented By: Jonathan Chunwei Su
Represented By: Steven M Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Land & Exploration Co.
Represented By: Jameson R Jones
Represented By: Sean C Grimsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Central Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNX Resources Corporation
Represented By: Tracy A Roman
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxonmobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Toal
Represented By: Craig A Thompson
Represented By: Jaren Janghorbani
Represented By: Theodore V Wells, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Central New Holdings LLC
Represented By: Michelle Nicole Lipkowitz
Represented By: Thomas K Prevas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corp.
Represented By: Daniel Toal
Represented By: Craig A Thompson
Represented By: Jaren Janghorbani
Represented By: Theodore V Wells, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: James M Webster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Ann Marie Mortimer
Represented By: Shannon S Broome
Represented By: Shawn P Regan
Represented By: Perie Reiko Koyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore
Represented By: Elizabeth Ryan Martinez
Represented By: Matthew K Edling
Represented By: Andre M Davis
Represented By: Victor M Sher
Represented By: Suzanne Sangree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?